Campbell et al v. City of Milpitas et al

Defendant: G. Lee, City of Milpitas, G. Solis and R. Gordon
Plaintiff: Sherisa Anderson and Shannon Campbell
Case Number: 5:2013cv03817
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS. The parties are ordered to appear on 1/28/2014 at 1:30 p.m. to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions, including monetary sanctions or dismissal of this action, on the partie s, or any of them, for willful disobedience of a court order. The parties may request that this Order to Show Cause be vacated and the parties relieved of the obligation to appear if one of the two documents referenced above is filed on or before 12:00 p.m. on 1/24/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/22/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 27, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Since the parties have filed one of the requisite documents, the Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions is DISCHARGED. The hearing scheduled for 1/28/2014, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/27/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
February 12, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The above-entitled case is referred to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal for a settlement conference to occur no later than 90 days from the date this order is filed. Counsel are advised to contact Judge Grewal's chambers to arrange a date and time for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
June 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER - JURY TRIAL. Based on the parties' Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 6/27/2014 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Anticipated Motion Hearing re Summary Judgment set for 10/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Motion to be filed by the current deadline for filing dispositive motions. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in Limine and Exchange of Exhibits due by 12/5/2014. Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Proposed Jury Verdict Forms due 12/9/2014. Final Pretrial Confere nce set for 12/19/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 1/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2015, 1/14/2015, 1/20/2015, 1/21/2015, 1/22/201 5, 1/26/2015, 1/27/2015, 1/28/2015 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Deliberations set for 1/29/2015, 1/30/2015 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The court advises the parties that this is the final case schedule. All parties are expected to comply as directed above. This schedule will not be amended further absent the presentation of good cause necessitating such an amendment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
July 22, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Extend Deadlines for Expert Disclosure. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/22/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
September 11, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Defendants shall file written opposition to 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order, if any, on or before 9/19/2014. The opposition brief shall n ot exceed 10 pages in length. No reply brief shall be filed or considered. The Motion will then be deemed submitted for decision and the court will issue an order based on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/11/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 24, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RECUSAL ORDER. I, the undersigned Judge of the court, finding myself disqualified from presiding over the above-entitled action, hereby recuse myself from this case and request that it be reassigned pursuant to the applicable provisions of this Districts Assignment Plan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND SETTING HEARING ON 37 , 45 CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/24/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
October 9, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 59 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/9/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
November 4, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 79 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. City of Milpitas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Lee
Represented By: Claire Choo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milpitas
Represented By: Claire Choo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Solis
Represented By: Claire Choo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gordon
Represented By: Claire Choo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherisa Anderson
Represented By: G. Whitney Leigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Campbell
Represented By: G. Whitney Leigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]