Bingham v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Defendant: TD Service Financial Corporation and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Bingham
Case Number: 5:2013cv04040
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Directing Parties to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/16/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 22, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/22/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 28, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Reassigning Case to a Magistrate Judge for All Purposes. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/28/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
July 17, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 43 Ocwen Loan Servicing's Request to Submit Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/17/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
September 3, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice. Court retains jurisdiction to enforce settlement. The clerk shall close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/3/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 17, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/17/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bingham v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Service Financial Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Nicole Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bingham
Represented By: Jeremy Jon Alberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]