Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Colorado Internet Services, LLC et al

Defendant: Erik Jeffries, Colorado Internet Services, LLC and Does 1-10, inclusive
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv04193
Filed: September 10, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDINGORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
December 5, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 11 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
February 27, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Entry of Permanent Injunction Against Defendants Colorado Internet Services, LLC d/b/a One Office Software and Erik Jeffries filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
March 12, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 26 30 31 Defendants' Motions to Sever and Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Colorado Internet Services, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Jeffries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Internet Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Quang Pham
Represented By: Christopher Dain Johnson
Represented By: Marcus Freeman Chaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]