Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Millennial Media, Inc.

Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Defendant: Millennial Media Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv04206
Filed: September 17, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 100 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE re 96 Notice (Other) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/8/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
December 26, 2013 112 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 111 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Millennial Media Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
June 11, 2014 126 Featured Case ORDER granting 113 Motion to Stay signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on June 11, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 23, 2014 128 Featured Case ORDER to show cause re consolidation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/14. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
October 8, 2013 97 Featured Case ORDER granting 92 plaintiff's request for withdrawal of Texas counsel. Attorney Charles Ainsworth terminated as counsel of record for Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/8/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 98 Featured Case ORDER granting 93 request for withdrawal of counsel. Ann M. Mooney and Scott A. Cole terminated as counsel of record for Cooley LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/8/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 99 Featured Case ORDER re 95 request for withdrawal of counsel. Lori R. Mason terminated as counsel of record for Cooley LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/8/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Millennial Media, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Seth A Safier
Represented By: Anthony Jude Patek
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Todd Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennial Media Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Nathan K Cummings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]