WhatsApp Inc. v. Intercarrier Communications, LLC

Defendant: Intercarrier Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: WhatsApp Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv04272
Filed: September 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by WhatsApp Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
November 4, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Deadline For Further Joint Case Management Statement filed by WhatsApp Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by WhatsApp Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
January 22, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by WhatsApp Inc. filed by WhatsApp Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
February 4, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ADDENDUM TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
April 2, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by WhatsApp Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 2, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 10, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by WhatsApp Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 28, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO EXCHANGE CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE filed by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
August 7, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 7, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 8, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to August 18, 2014, for ICC's Reply Claim Construction Brief (Unopposed) filed by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 22, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Withdraw Expert Claim Construction Declarations filed by WhatsApp Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
October 2, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Provide Supplemental Claim-Construction Briefing Regarding Claim 3 filed by WhatsApp Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 16, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 6,985,748 AND 8,483,729 re 67 Brief filed by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WhatsApp Inc. v. Intercarrier Communications, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercarrier Communications, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WhatsApp Inc.
Represented By: Shoney Ann Hixson Blake
Represented By: Richard Gregory Frenkel
Represented By: Michael A. Ladra
Represented By: Lisa Kim Anh Nguyen
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]