Seer Systems Inc. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Seer Systems Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv05252
Filed: November 14, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2014 CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable Vince Chhabria, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/17/14. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 11, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 26 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 8, 2014 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER -- STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS filed by Apple Inc.. (Yap, Alex) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
February 28, 2014 25 NOTICE of Mediation Date by Seer Systems Inc. re 23 Case Management Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Private ADR, Case Referred to Private ADR,,, (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 2/28/2014) Modified on 2/28/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2014 24 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/20/2014 before Judge Wiliam Alsup (Date Filed: 2/20/2014). Jury Selection set for 4/13/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 23 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Case referred to Private ADR. Discovery due by 12/19/2014. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 1/22/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/20/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 14, 2014 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Seer Systems Inc. filed by Seer Systems Inc.. (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Seer Systems Inc.. (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rahebi, Bita) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Seer Systems Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stanley Jungleib for Seer Systems Inc., Seer Systems Inc.. (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 10, 2014 17 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Demand for Jury Trial bySeer Systems Inc.. (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 5, 2014 16 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 17, 2014 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita) (Filed on 1/17/2014) Modified on 1/17/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2014 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 13 APPLE INC.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Seer Systems Inc. byApple Inc.. (Rahebi, Bita) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
December 16, 2013 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Apple Inc.. (Rahebi, Bita) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 3, 2013 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seer Systems Inc. re 10 Summons Issued (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
November 25, 2013 10 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 9 Proposed Summons. (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 8 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 7 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 19, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Signed by The Executive Committee on 11/19/2013. (gmS, ) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: All matters presently set before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 14, 2013 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Seer Systems Inc... (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 12, 2013 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order, # 3 Standing Order, # 4 Standing Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013) Modified on 11/14/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.). Filed bySeer Systems Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013) Modified on 11/14/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2013: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Seer Systems Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seer Systems Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Michael Weyand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]