Roman v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rendell Roman
Case Number: 5:2013cv05437
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2014 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Rendell Roman (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
January 30, 2014 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 14, 2014 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 3, 2014 15 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 3, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 14 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/3/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 2, 2014 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: All matters presently set before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Walsh, David) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rendell Roman.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shah, James) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 18, 2013 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice, by 1/2/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Walsh, David) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 10, 2013 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rendell Roman (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 4, 2013 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James C Shah (Shah, James) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 25, 2013 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 5 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rendell Roman (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 2 Proposed Summons. (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 1 COMPLAINT Rendell Roman, Individually And On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8183060.). Filed byRendell Roman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/22/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Walsh, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rendell Roman
Represented By: Rosemary Farrales Luzon
Represented By: James C Shah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]