Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Accoladian Resources, LLC et al

Defendant: Accoladian Resources, LLC and Vern Cameron
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
 
Case Number: 5:2014cv00388
Filed: January 27, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 19 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/3/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
June 12, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-9. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 12, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
July 28, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [denying 31 Motion to Dismiss; denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]. Hearing is vacated. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
August 8, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST RE BANKRUPTCY NOTICE. Response due August 15 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 8, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 18, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 18, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Accoladian Resources, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accoladian Resources, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vern Cameron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Represented By: Annie S. Wang(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]