Petzilla, Inc. v. Anser Innovation LLC

Defendant: Anser Innovation LLC
Plaintiff: Petzilla, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2014cv01354
Filed: March 24, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Order on Motion to Expedite. Motion Hearing reset for 6/5/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 20, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 17 Plaintiff's motion for leave to take jurisdictional discovery (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
June 25, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Anser Innovation LLC, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
August 4, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting [35-3] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; and 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (to Anser's Motion to Dismiss). Petzilla's Opposition/Response due by 8/11/2014. Anser's Reply due by 8/18/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 25, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Petzilla, Inc. v. Anser Innovation LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anser Innovation LLC
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petzilla, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas Spiros Gikkas(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jon Y. Ikegami(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kieun Sung-Ikegami(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]