Khoa Dang Nguyen v. The General Insurance

Plaintiff: Khoa Dang Nguyen
Defendant: The General Insurance
 
Case Number: 5:2014cv01567
Filed: April 4, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. 1.Plaintiff must complete and then bring to the clerks office at least two copies of the form Summons in a Civil Action (Form AO 440) 2.Plaintiff must serve Defendant no later than 8/2/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2014. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2014: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING 8/8/2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
September 2, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 9/5/2014 is VACATED, and Plaintiff's motion 16 is TERMINATED. Plaintiff must re-serve Defendant through an authorized method of service and must file proof of such of service on or before 9/16/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/2/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2014: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/10/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
April 16, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 16, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2014: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofrS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT CASE BE REASSIGNED WITH REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 10, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 17, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 6/27/2014, demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed by filing an amended complaint, the court will dismiss the action without prejudice. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Khoa Dang Nguyen v. The General Insurance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khoa Dang Nguyen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The General Insurance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]