Voss v. Sutardja et al

Plaintiff: Lee Voss
Defendant: Sehat Sutardja, Juergen Gromer, John G. Kassakian, Arturo Krueger, Randhir Thakur, Pantas Sutardja, Weili Dai and Marvell Technology Group, Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2014cv01581
Filed: April 4, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Motion to Relate Case. 13-cv-02523 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 22, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (32) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:14-cv-01581-LHK. 14-cv-03214 is related to this case and the other related case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
August 6, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/6/2014. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
January 20, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court **POSTED IN ERROR. Please refer to ECF No. 69 for the corrected document.** (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015) Modified on 1/20/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/20/2015. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 26, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 53 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
February 23, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR A RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/23/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 24, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 71 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/24/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voss v. Sutardja et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Voss
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sehat Sutardja
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juergen Gromer
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Kassakian
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Krueger
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randhir Thakur
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantas Sutardja
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weili Dai
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Technology Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.