Gregoria Amaya v. Rose International Market, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gregoria Amaya
Defendant: Rose International Market, Inc., Saied Mehranfar and Javad M. Mehranfar
Case Number: 5:2014cv03331
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff complied with this order and has demonstrated good cause to preclude dismissal. See Docket Item No. 9 . Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/15/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
February 24, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CONSENT/DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. On February 24, 2015, Defendants Javad Mehranfar, Saied Mehranfar, and Rose International Market, Inc. filed a document indicating their voluntary consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this action. See Docket Item No. 17 . In order to determine the position of both parties on this issue, the court orders Plaintiff to file a similar document indicating either her consent or declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge on or before March 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
January 6, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The 120-day period for service provided by Rule 4(m) expired on November 20, 2014. Accordingly, the court issues the instant Order to Show Cause ("OSC") requiring that Plaintiff, no later than January 13, 2015, eith er: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on defendants; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Plaintiff is notified that the court will dismiss this action if Plaintiff fails to comply with this OSC or otherwise fails to show good cause as directed above. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/6/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregoria Amaya v. Rose International Market, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregoria Amaya
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose International Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saied Mehranfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javad M. Mehranfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.