The Marine Group, LLC et al v. Marine Travelift, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The Marine Group, LLC and National Union Fire Insurance Co. Of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Defendant: Marine Travelift, Inc., Olson Fabrication, Inc., All-Lift Systems, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00846
Filed: April 21, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2012 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 127 Motion to Compel Discovery and (2) Granting in part and denying in part 135 Ex Parte application to continue scheduling dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/6/12. (ecs)
July 6, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 112 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Exactech's Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/6/2012. (rlu)
October 29, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Determining Discovery Dispute and Granting in part and Denying in part 169 Joint Motion Regarding Deposition of Marine Travelift, Inc. and Exactech, Inc. Expert Bradley Closson. Plaintiff's request for in excess of seven hours to depose Mr. Closson is Denied. Plaintiff may conduct a continued deposition of Mr. Closson limited to one hour and 40 minutes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/26/2012. (rlu)
January 30, 2013 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 155 157 158 159 Motions for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. The settlements reached between Plaintiffs and Defendants All-Lift, Southern Weaving, JIT, and Seymour are found to be in good faith within the meaning of Ca l. Civ. Proc. Code § 877.6, and the Non-Settling Defendants are barred from pursing any claims against these Settling Defendants for equitable comparative contribution or comparative indemnity based on comparative negligence or comparative fault. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/30/2013. (rlu)
August 3, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER REGULATING DISCOVERY AND OTHER PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 11/23/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2011 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Mandatory Settlement Conferences shall be conducted on 11/4/2010 at 02:00 PM and on 6/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/2/2010.(jer)
September 20, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 59 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Accordingly, under the liberal pleading standards of Rule 15, the Court exercises its discretion to Grant Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint to add as defendants ExacTech, Just in Time, and Southern Weaving. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/19/11. (ecs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Marine Group, LLC et al v. Marine Travelift, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Marine Group, LLC
Represented By: Russell Patrick Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Co. Of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Russell Patrick Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Travelift, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R Lord
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olson Fabrication, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Workman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-Lift Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R Lord
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]