Tran v. Gore et al

Defendant: Jane Does, John DOES, Wilson, ., Brown, William D Gore, E Schroeder, Pile and Jane Doe
Plaintiff: Hoang Minh Tran
Case Number: 3:2010cv02682
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 25 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/24/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
November 7, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant's 26 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Discovery and Request for Sanctions. Defendants' motion to compel is Granted. Defendants' request for monetary sanctions is Denied. Plaintiff is required to respond to all of Defendants' discovery requests by 11/30/2012. The Court warns Plaintiff that failure to comply with this Order and failure to respond to all of the written discovery by 11/30/2012, may result in the imposition of monetary sanctions, evidentiary sanctions, and/or the dismissal of his case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/7/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
November 14, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant Gill's 19 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; and Dismissing Defendants for Failure to Amend and/or Prosecute. Plaintiff is Granted thirty (30) days in which to file and serve a Second Amended Compl aint which addresses the deficiencies of pleading identified in this Order. If Plaintiff does not file and serve a Second Amended Complaint within that time, this case shall proceed on Plaintiff's 7 First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/14/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
May 23, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1); (3) Dismissing Defendants Gore and Schroeder Pursuant 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) & 1915A; and ( 4)Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint or Proceed on Surviving Claims. Plaintiff has forty five (45) days from the date this Order is Filed to either: (1) file an Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted abo ve; or (2) notify the Court of his intention to proceed with the claims that the Court has determined survive the sua sponte screening process. Following Plaintiff's choice, the Court will issue the appropriate Order. Copy of Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/23/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
March 8, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Reasonable Accommodation Under the ADA; Denying Plaintiff's 38 Request for a Competency Hearing; Denying Allan Tracy Gilmore's 51 Motion for Appointment of Next Friend or Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/8/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
December 9, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing defendants and directing U.S. marshal to effect service of first amended complaint. Defendants Gore and Schroeder are Dismissed from this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) & 1915A. The Clerk shall issue a summons as to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint upon the remaining Defendants and shall forward it to Plaintiff along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each Defendant. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/9/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Gore et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson, .
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Gore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Schroeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoang Minh Tran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]