Perez v. IRS

Defendant: IRS
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Ochoa Perez
Case Number: 3:2012cv02026
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Dismissing Action without Prejudice; (2) Denying as Moot 8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Denying as Moot 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Granting 11 Motion to Amend/Correct Notice of Document Discrepancies. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a second amended complaint on or before April 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/14/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
July 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Dismissing Action without Leave to Amend; (2) Denying as Moot Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and (3) Denying as Moot Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. Nos. 14 , 16 , 18 ). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/29/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
September 17, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Dismissing Action without Prejudice; (2) Denying as Moot 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; (3) Denying as Moot 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint no later than November 1, 2012. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/17/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Ochoa Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.