Rankine et al v. Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. et al

Counter_defendant: Joyce M. Rankine and Lawrence S. Stanton
Plaintiff: Joyce M. Rankine and Lawrence S. Stanton
Defendant: Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. and DOES 1 through 10
Counter_claimant: Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02065
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgement 91 . The Court Grants Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment in its entirety. Accordingly, judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff Rankine against Defendant RBC in the amo unt of six hundred thousand dollars ($600,000) plus 6.5% annual interest; and in favor of Plaintiff Stanton against Defendant RBC in the amount of one hundred and fifty thousand dollars ($150,000) plus 6.5% annual interest. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/5/2013. (vam)
November 5, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court Grants Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Judgment shall be entered accordingly.(vam)
January 2, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Order Permitting Additional Briefing, granting Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim, and denying as moot Plaintiff's 13 Motion for More Definite Statement. Dft is granted 21 days from the date this Order is filed to file First Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/2/2013. (jah)
May 9, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 43 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/9/2013. (jah)
August 5, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc's 73 Motion to Quash Subpoena; denying 73 Motion to Modify the Subpoena to Modify the Subpoena; denying 75 Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena; denying 75 Amended Motion to Modify the Subpoena to Modify the Subpoena. Dft Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. (RBC) is directed to serve a copy of this Order on The Boeing Company by 8/9/2013. The Boeing Company is directed to produce all documents responsive to the s ubpoena by 8/26/2013. Because Court finds no merit in RBC's motion to quash, Court awards atty's fees in the amount of $1,104.00 against RBC for the costs Plaintiffs incurred in opposing RBC's unsuccessful motion to quash. RBC must pay award to Plaintiffs by 8/19/2013 and must file a notice of payment by 8/23/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/5/2013. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rankine et al v. Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Joyce M. Rankine
Represented By: Clayton J. Hix
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Lawrence S. Stanton
Represented By: Clayton J. Hix
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce M. Rankine
Represented By: Clayton J. Hix
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence S. Stanton
Represented By: Clayton J. Hix
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: James G Bohm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: James G Bohm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]