Mirkarimi v. Nevada Property 1 LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sasan Mirkarimi
Defendant: Nevada Property 1 LLC and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2012cv02160
Filed: August 31, 2012
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Denying 15 Motion to Dismiss; and Denying 15 Motion to strike class action allegations without prejudice. Defendant has twenty (20) days from the filing of this order to answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/15/2013. (rlu)
October 22, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 75 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. It is Ordered that Plaintiff's motion to compel is Granted. Defendant shall produce all documents responsive to Plaintiff's outstanding Requests for Production for wh ich Defendant agreed to produce documents, including RFP Nos. 5, 18-20, 35, 36, 44, 47, 48, 50, 122-124, 128, and 133-136, and shall provide supplemental responses to Interrogatories Nos. 17 and 25, and RFP No. 128 on or before October 31, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 10/22/2014. (rlu)
November 18, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Discovery Orders. It is Ordered that Plaintiff's motion for leave to conduct additional discovery is Granted, in part. Plaintiff may take up to 5 additional depositions. Plaintiff may also propound up to 15 additional interrogatories. Defendant shall respond to the interrogatories within 15 days from the date of service of the interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 11/18/14.(rlu)
November 21, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resolving 78 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. It is Ordered that the temporary stay on communications with putative class members is lifted. It is further Ordered that before Plaintiff may mail any questionnaire to the putative class members, Plaintiff must submit the proposed questionnaire to the Court for an in camera review. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 11/21/14. (rlu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirkarimi v. Nevada Property 1 LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sasan Mirkarimi
Represented By: Zachariah Paul Dostart
Represented By: James F Clapp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Property 1 LLC
Represented By: Angela C Agrusa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]