Paredes Nino et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al

Plaintiff: Mayra Paredes Nino, Jose A. Yanez Paredes and Jose Rolando Yanez Paredes
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Border Patrol, United States of America and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2013cv00469
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The United States' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 27 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' request for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint is granted. Plaintiffs shall file any second amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/13/2014. (mdc)(jrd)
October 6, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The United States' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 34 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' First Claim for violation of the law of nations is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' requests for injunctive relief and declaratory relief are dismissed. Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees against the United States is dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/6/2014. (mdc)
March 6, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 43 ) is granted in part and denied in part, and only with respect to Plaintiff Nino's standing. Plaintiffs may file a motion for leave to amend the Second Amended Complaint, accompanied by a proposed third amended complaint, no later than thirty (30) days from the date this Order is filed. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 43 ) shall remain pending on issues related to the foreign country exception. The parties are granted ninety days of jurisdictional discovery from the date this Order is filed in order to address factual issues relevant to jurisdiction in light of the foreign country exception t o the FTCA. No later than 6/22/2015, Defendant shall file a supplemental brief addressing the application of the foreign country exception with any supporting evidence. No later than 7/6/2015, Plaintiffs shall file an opposition brief with any suppor ting evidence. No later than 7/13/2015, Defendant may file a reply brief limited to legal argument. The Ex Parte Application Requesting Permission to Submit Evidence in Defendant's Reply Brief Responding to Plaintiffs' Opposition Evidence (Doc. 50 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/6/2015. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paredes Nino et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Paredes Nino
Represented By: Eric M Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Yanez Paredes
Represented By: Eric M Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rolando Yanez Paredes
Represented By: Eric M Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Border Patrol
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]