Daniels et al v. Comunity Lending, Inc et al

Defendant: New Century Mortgage, Bank of America Home Loans, The, Comunity Lending, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Countrywide Home Loans, Bank of New York, The, Bank of America, N.A., Recontrust Company, N.A. and Ginnie Mae
Plaintiff: Diane Daniels and Ellington Daniels
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00488
Filed: February 28, 2013
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. (Doc. 10 ). The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to the Moving Defendants. No later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs may file a motion for leave to file a first amended complaint, accompanied by a proposed first amended complaint. The Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is DENIED. (Doc. 23 ). The Motion for Judge's Signature of Lis Pendens is DENIED. (Doc. 25 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/5/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.)(mdc)(jrd)
January 6, 2014 60 Featured Case ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss is granted. (Doc. 45 ). The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to the moving Defendants (Bank of New York Mellon; Bank of America, N.A., sued as "The Bank of America Home Loans"; Countrywide Home Loans , Inc.; ReconTrust Company, N.A.; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.). No later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs may file a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, accompanied by a proposed second amended complaint. The Motion for Reconsideration of the 11/4/2013 Order setting aside the Clerk's entry of default and denying the motion for default judgment is denied. (Doc. 54 ). As to the three non-moving Defendants (i.e., ComUnity Lendin g, Inc., New Century Mortgage, and Ginnie Mae), the Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons as to the First Amended Complaint and provide Plaintiffs with the summons, certified copies of both this Order and the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 34 ), and a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/6/2014. (IFP package, including this Order, mailed to docket address: P.O. Box 740536, San Diego, CA 92174.)(mdc)(jrd)
March 27, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER: The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. (Doc. 6 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/27/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Daniels et al v. Comunity Lending, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comunity Lending, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginnie Mae
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellington Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]