Eusse, Jr. v. Vitela et al

Defendant: Martin Carpio, Evaristo Duarte, Marco Vitela and Roger N. Nelson, Jr.
Plaintiff: James Eusse, Jr.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00916
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation ( 18 , 21 , 23 ). Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is granted, and Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall file his second amended complaint on or before July 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/25/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
April 23, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Denying 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Dismissing Case without Prejudice. Plaintiff is granted an additional forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order to either: (1) pay the entire $350 filing fee, or (2) file a new Motion to Proceed IFP. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/23/2013.(Sent IFP form to Plaintiff)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
July 17, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER: (1) Granting 5 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and (2) Sua Sponte Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim. The Secretary of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, or his designee, shall collect from Plaintiff 's prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Cl erk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10. Plaintiff is granted forty-five (45) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/16/2013.(Sent § 1983 form to Plaintiff)(cc: Jeffrey Beard)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
November 1, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER: Denying without Prejudice 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/1/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Eusse, Jr. v. Vitela et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Carpio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evaristo Duarte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Vitela
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger N. Nelson, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eusse, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]