Marrapese et al v. University of California Board of Regents et al

Defendant: University of California Board of Regents and UCSD Medical Center
Plaintiff: Richard J. Marrapese, Jr. and Richard J. Marrapese, Sr.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00947
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Second Amended Complaint is dismissed and this action in its entirety is dismissed without prejudice to plaintiff's refiling it in a court of competent jurisdiction, but without leave to amend in this Court. The Clerk is directed to close the docket. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/6/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
April 24, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and dismissing case without prejudice. Within 28 calendar days of the date this order is issued, Marrapese, Jr. may first pay the filing fee and then file an amended complaint correcting the defects this order has identified. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/22/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
May 23, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING Amended Complaint. Because it doesn't appear the Court has jurisdiction over the claims raised in the amended complaint, it is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint no later than June 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/22/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marrapese et al v. University of California Board of Regents et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California Board of Regents
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCSD Medical Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Marrapese, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Marrapese, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]