McGee v. Chamberlin et al

Defendant: Daniel Paramo, Mohammed K. Arab, N. Barreras, Ku, Travis H. Calvin, M.D., John Doe, Chamberlin, Matthews Cates, Domingo Uribe and Does 1-20
Plaintiff: Demitris McGee
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01020
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER: (1) Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ) And (2) Dismssing Complaint For Failing To State A Claim Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(e)(2) & 1915A(b): The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each ti me the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff is GRANTED forty five (45) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. H ayes on 5/14/2013. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR; per Order, a printed copy also was sent to Secretary of CDCR in Sacramento; all non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 1983 First Amended Complaint form also was sent to Plaintiff.) (mdc)
September 23, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing First Amended Complaint For Failing To State A Claim Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(e)(2) And 1915A(b): Defendants John Doe, M.D., John Doe, Opthamologist, John Doe, M.D., Ear Nose and Throat, Daniel Paramo, Matthew Cate and Dom ingo Uribe are dismissed from this action. Plaintiff is granted forty five (45) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/20/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 1983 Second Amended Complaint also was mailed to Plaintiff.) (mdc)
March 13, 2014 9 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING Second Amended Complaint For Failing To State A Claim Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(e)(2) And 1915A(b): Because the Court finds amendment of Plaintiff's claims would be futile at this time, leave to amend is denied. The Clerk of Court shall close the file. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/13/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McGee v. Chamberlin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Paramo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed K. Arab
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Barreras
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ku
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis H. Calvin, M.D.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamberlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews Cates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Uribe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demitris McGee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]