Cambridge University Press, et al v. J.L. Albert, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, SAGE PUBLICATIONS, INC. and OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, INC.
Defendant - Appellee: MARK P. BECKER, in his official capacity as President of Georgia State University, J. L. ALBERT, in his official capacity as Georgia State University Associate Provost for Information System and Technology, KENNETH R. BERNARD, JR., in his official capacity as member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia., ROBERT F. HATCHER, in his official capacity as Vice Chair of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia and W. MANSFIELD JENNINGS, JR., in his official capacity as member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Case Number: 12-14676
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2013 Oral Argument CD sent to Lindsey A. Harrison for Bondurant Mixson & Elmore. [12-14676, 12-15147]
December 16, 2013 124 Oral argument CD requested by Lindsey A. Harrison for Bondurant Mixson & Elmore. [12-14676, 12-15147]
November 19, 2013 Oral argument held. Oral Argument participants were Robert Bruce Rich for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
August 29, 2013 Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., Risa Palm and Nancy Seamans hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/19/2013. Stephen M. Schaetzel - 404-645-7724 will present argument. (ECF: Anthony Askew)
August 29, 2013 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Tuesday, 11/19/2013 Argument Location: Atlanta Courtroom: Atlanta 339. [12-14676, 12-15147]
August 29, 2013 Attorney Edward B. Krugman for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676, 12-15147 hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/19/2013. R. Bruce Rich (212) 310-8000 will present argument. [12-14676, 12-15147] (ECF: Edward Krugman)
August 29, 2013 119 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 11/18/2013 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF.
July 2, 2013 118 Assigned to tentative calendar number 6 in Atlanta during the week of November 18, 2013. [12-12119, 12-12993, 12-14402, 12-11042, 12-14676, 12-15147, 12-13673, 12-15374, 12-15832, 12-11126, 11-12674, 12-15744, 12-14302]
May 30, 2013 Additional copies of expanded record excerpts received from Anthony B. Askew for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., Risa Palm and Nancy Seamans in 12-14676 and forwarded to the record room. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 21, 2013 Supplemental Expanded Record Excerpts [1 VOLUMES - 5 sets] filed by Jonathan Bloom for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676. Service date: 05/20/2013 email - Attorney for Amicus Curium: Ablin, Chapman, Dove, Joseph, Lerner, Meloy, Pequignot, Rasenberger, Schultz, Steinman, Stoltz, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Eskow, Krugman, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party: Tenny; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Aistars; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Larson; Attorney for Appellees: Lynn, Moffitt, Volkert, Warenzak. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 21, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 20, 2013 114 Reply Brief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Service date: 05/20/2013 email - Attorney for Amicus Curium: Ablin, Aistars, Chapman, Dove, Joseph, Lerner, Meloy, Pequignot, Rasenberger, Schultz, Steinman, Stoltz, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellees: Askew, Bates, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Moffitt, Quicker, Schaetzel, Volkert, Whiting-Pack. (ECF: John Rains)
May 16, 2013 Additional copies of expanded record excerpts received from John H. Rains, IV for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676 and forwarded to the record room. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 3, 2013 Corrections to brief received on 05/03/2013 from Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars in 12-14676, 12-15147. All deficiencies have been corrected. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 3, 2013 111 Corrected Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars. Service date: 05/03/2013 email - Attorney for Amicus Curium: Ablin, Aistars, Chapman, Dove, Joseph, Lerner, Meloy, Pequignot, Rasenberger, Schultz, Steinman, Stoltz, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Krugman, Larson, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Lynn, Miller, Moffitt, Quicker, Schaetzel, Volkert, Warenzak, Whiting-Pack. (ECF: Jason Schultz)
May 2, 2013 110 Notice of deficient Amicus brief filed by Attorney Jason Michael Schultz for Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars in 12-14676, 12-15147.Deficiencies: Missing the source of its authority to file. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 2, 2013 109 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Karyn Kay Ablin for American Council on Education, et al.. (ECF: Karyn Ablin)
May 2, 2013 MOTION MOOT: Motion for leave to file amicus brief is MOOT [6776447-2] in 12-14676 due letter filed on 02/22/2013. Motion filed by Not Party USA in 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 1, 2013 107 Certificate of Readiness filed as to Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676, 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 1, 2013 Record on Appeal filed. Exhibit Box, 8 volumes; Exhibit Envelope, 1 volumes
April 30, 2013 105 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Karyn Kay Ablin is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6856394-2] [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 30, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Karyn Kay Ablin for Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al. in 12-14676. [6856394-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 29, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 29, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae American Association of University Professors; International Communication Association; Peter Decherney; Tsitsi Jaji; Society for Cinema and Media Studies; Modernist Studies Association in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 29, 2013 101 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bruce Gary Joseph for American Council on Education, et al.. (ECF: Bruce Joseph)
April 29, 2013 100 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Bruce Gary Joseph is GRANTED by Supervisor/ACN. [6854697-2] [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae The Association of Southeastern Research Librabries, Inc. in 12-14676, 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, and Association of Research in Support of Affirmance in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al. in 12-14676, 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Bruce Gary Joseph for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Bruce Gary Joseph for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Ada Meloy for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Ada Meloy for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 25, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Karyn Kay Ablin for party(s) Association Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Karyn Kay Ablin for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 25, 2013 93 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Jason M. Schultz, Attorney for Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars. Service date: 04/25/2013 email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curium: Dove, Lerner, Rasenberger, Steinman, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Krugman, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party: Tenny. (ECF: Jason Schultz)
April 25, 2013 92 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Andrew Pequignot for The Association of Southeastern Research Libraries. Service date: 04/25/2013 US mail - District Judge Evans; Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Aistars; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Larson; Attorney for Appellees: Lynn, Moffitt, Volkert, Warenzak; email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curium: Dove, Lerner, Rasenberger, Steinman, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Krugman, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party: Tenny. (ECF: W. Pequignot)
April 25, 2013 91 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Mitchell L. Stoltz representing Amici Curiae American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, and Association of Research Libraries. Service date: 04/25/2013 email - District Judge Evans; Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curium: Aistars, Dove, Lerner, Rasenberger, Steinman, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Krugman, Larson, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Lynn, Miller, Moffitt, Quicker, Schaetzel, Volkert, Warenzak, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party: Tenny. (ECF: Mtichell Stoltz)
April 25, 2013 90 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Floyd Chapman for American Council on Education, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, and American Association of Community Colleges. Service date: 04/25/2013 email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curium: Dove, Lerner, Rasenberger, Steinman, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Krugman, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party: Tenny; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Krugman, Larson, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Askew, Bates, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Quicker, Schaetzel, Volkert. (ECF: Floyd Chapman)
April 25, 2013 89 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by JACK I. LERNER for AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS ET AL.. Service date: 04/25/2013 email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curium: Dove, Lerner, Rasenberger, Steinman, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Krugman, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party: Tenny. (ECF: Jack Lerner)
April 25, 2013 88 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by American Association of State Colleges and Universities; and American Association of Community Colleges (ECF: Floyd Chapman)
April 25, 2013 87 Featured Case ORDER: Motion for extension to file reply brief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. is GRANTED. [6847781-2] in 12-14676 Reply brief due on 05/20/2013. RB [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 25, 2013 86 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ada Meloy for ACE and NAICU (ECF: Ada Meloy)
April 24, 2013 85 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Floyd B. Chapman for American Council on Education, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities (ECF: Floyd Chapman)
April 23, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Bruce Gary Joseph for Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al. in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6854697-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 22, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., Risa Palm and Nancy Seamans in 12-15147. [12-15147, 12-14676]
April 22, 2013 82 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jack I. Lerner for Society for Cinema and Media Studies; Modernist Studies Association (ECF: Jack Lerner)
April 22, 2013 81 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason M Schultz for Amici Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars (ECF: Jason Schultz)
April 22, 2013 80 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by W. Andrew Pequignot for The Association of Southeastern Research Libraries, Inc. (ECF: W. Pequignot)
April 22, 2013 79 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mitchell L. Stoltz representing Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation (ECF: Mtichell Stoltz)
April 19, 2013 Supplemental Expanded Record Excerpts [8 VOLUMES - 2 sets (vol #8 sealed)] filed by Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., Risa Palm and Nancy Seamans. Service date: 04/18/2013 US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Krugman, Larson, Rains, Rich, Singer.--[Edited 04/24/2013 by MM]
April 19, 2013 77 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jack I. Lerner for American Association of University Professors; International Communication Association; Peter Decherney; Tsitsi Jaji (ECF: Jack Lerner)
April 19, 2013 76 MOTION for extension of time to file reply brief to 05/20/2013 filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [6847781-1] (ECF: John Rains)
April 18, 2013 75 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., Risa Palm and Nancy Seamans. Service date: 04/18/2013 email - Attorney for Amicus Curium: Aistars, Dove, Rasenberger, Steinman, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Krugman, Larson, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Askew, Bates, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Moffitt, Quicker, Schaetzel, Volkert, Whiting-Pack. (ECF: Anthony Askew)
April 11, 2013 74 RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for extension to file reply brief [6840638-2], Motion for extension to file reply brief [6833867-2] received from Jonathan Bloom for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Edward B. Krugman for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Todd D. Larson for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Robert Bruce Rich for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and Randi Wolkenbreit Singer for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676 is returned unfiled. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 3, 2013 MOTION for extension of time to file reply brief to 05/20/2013 filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [6833867-1]--[Edited 04/03/2013 by ECM] (ECF: John Rains)
February 22, 2013 72 Notice of Filing regarding Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Daniel Tenny (notification that United States will not file brief). Service date: 02/22/2013 email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curium: Dove, Rasenberger, Steinman, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Krugman, Rains, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack.--[Edited 03/14/2013 by JKS] (ECF: Daniel Tenny)
February 6, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Text and Academic Authors Association in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 5, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium Jon Baumgarten, Ralph Oman and Marybeth Peters.
February 5, 2013 69 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Sandra Aistars for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, Attorney Ronald G. Dove Jr. for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, Attorney Lindsey Tonsager for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 5, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Ronald G. Dove, Jr. is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6785236-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Lindsey Tonsager is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6785218-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Sandra Aistars is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6785204-2] in 12-14676 [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 5, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Mary Eleanor Rasenberger for party(s) Amicus Curiae Text and Academic Authors Association, in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Mary Eleanor Rasenberger for party(s) Amicus Curiae Text and Academic Authors Association, in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 4, 2013 66 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Mary E. Rasenberger for Amici Curiae Text and Academic Authors Association and the Authors Guild. Service date: 02/04/2013 US mail - District Judge Evans; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Krugman, Larson, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Askew, Eskow, Harbin, Lynn, Miller, Moffitt, Quicker, Schaetzel, Volkert, Warenzak; Attorney for Not Parties: Aistars, Tonsager; email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curium: Rasenberger, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Krugman, Rains; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Parties: Dove, Steinman.--[Edited 02/12/2013 by JSC] (ECF: Mary Rasenberger)
February 4, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae The Association of American University Presses, Inc. in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 4, 2013 64 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Linda Steinman for The Association of American University Presses, Inc.. Service date: 02/07/2013 US mail - District Judge Evans; Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Aistars; Attorney for Appellant: Larson; Attorney for Appellees: Lynn, Warenzak; email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curium: Dove, Rasenberger, Steinman, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Krugman, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Moffitt, Quicker, Schaetzel, Volkert, Whiting-Pack.--[Edited 02/12/2013 by JSC] (ECF: Linda Steinman)
February 4, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Copyright Alliance in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 4, 2013 62 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Ronald G. Dove Jr., for Amicus Curiae Copyright Alliance. Service date: 02/02/2013 US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Krugman, Larson, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Askew, Bates, Eskow, Harbin, Miller, Quicker, Schaetzel, Volkert.--[Edited 02/06/2013 by JSC] (ECF: Ronald Dove)
February 4, 2013 61 RESPONSE to Motion for leave to file amicus brief [6776447-2] filed by Attorney Walter Hill Levie, III for Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Walter Levie)
February 4, 2013 60 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mary E. Rasenberger for Amici Curiae Text and Academic Authors Association and the Authors Guild (ECF: Mary Rasenberger)
February 4, 2013 59 Amicus Brief filed by Lois F. Wasoff Representing Marybeth Peters, Ralph Oman and Jon Baumgarten. Service date: 02/04/2013 US mail - District Judge Evans; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Larson, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Lynn, Miller, Moffitt, Volkert, Warenzak; Attorney for Not Parties: Aistars, Dove, Tonsager; email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Krugman, Rains; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party: Steinman. (ECF: Lois Wasoff)
February 4, 2013 DOCKETED IN ERROR *** Amicus Brief filed by Leave of Court by Amicus Curium Jon Baumgarten, Ralph Oman and Marybeth Peters. Service date: 02/04/2013 US mail - District Judge Evans; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Larson, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Lynn, Miller, Moffitt, Volkert, Warenzak; Attorney for Not Parties: Aistars, Dove, Tonsager; email - Originating Clerk/Ag Hatten; Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Krugman, Rains; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Eskow, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party. Steinman.--[Edited 02/05/2013 by SPT] (ECF: Lois Wasoff)
February 4, 2013 57 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lois F. Wasoff for Marybeth Peters, Ralph Oman and Jon Baumgarten. (ECF: Lois Wasoff)
February 4, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Sandra Aistars for party(s) Not Party Copyright Alliance, in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Sandra Aistars for party(s) Not Party Copyright Alliance, in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 4, 2013 55 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda Steinman for The Association of American University Presses, Inc. (ECF: Linda Steinman)
February 1, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellee brief filed by Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. is GRANTED. [6770774-2] in 12-14676 Appellees brief due on 04/18/2013. FMH [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 31, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Ronald G. Dove, Jr. for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6785236-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 31, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Lindsey Tonsager for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6785218-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 31, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Sandra Aistars for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6785204-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 29, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Lois F. Wasoff is GRANTED by Supervisor/JPL. [6778254-2] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 29, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Lois F. Wasoff for Amicus Curium Marybeth Peters, Ralph Oman and Jon Baumgarten in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6778254-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 28, 2013 Expanded Record Excerpts filed [31 VOLUMES - 2 sets] by Anthony B. Askew for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Jonathan Bloom for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Edward B. Krugman for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Todd D. Larson for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., R. Bruce Rich for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and Randi Wolkenbreit Singer for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676, Jonathan Bloom for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Lisa Royce Eskow for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Edward B. Krugman for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Todd D. Larson for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., R. Bruce Rich for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and Randi Wolkenbreit Singer for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-15147. Service date: 01/28/2013 US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Askew; Attorney for Appellees: Gentry, Levie, Schaetzel, Volkert. [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 28, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 28, 2013 46 Appellant's brief filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Service date: 01/28/2013 [12-14676] Attorney for Appellant: Askew - hand delivery, clerk; Attorney for Appellant: Bloom - clerk; Attorney for Appellant: Krugman - clerk; Attorney for Appellant: Larson - clerk; Attorney for Appellant: Rains - clerk; Attorney for Appellant: Rich - clerk; Attorney for Appellant: Singer - clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Ashby - clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Bates - US mail, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Eskow - clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Gentry - clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Harbin - US mail, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Levie - clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Lynn - clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Miller - US mail, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Moffitt - US mail, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Quicker - US mail, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Schaetzel - hand delivery, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Volkert - hand delivery, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Warenzak - clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Whiting-Pack - clerk. (ECF: John Rains)
January 25, 2013 45 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Daniel Tenny for United States. [6776447-1] (ECF: Daniel Tenny)
January 25, 2013 44 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel Tenny for United States (ECF: Daniel Tenny)
January 18, 2013 43 MOTION for extension of time to file appellees brief to 04/18/2013, for extension of time to file reply brief to 05/21/2013 filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [6770774-1] (ECF: Stephen Schaetzel)
December 18, 2012 Public Communication: APPELLANT'S BRIEFS ARE DUE JANUARY 28, 2013 AND ALLOWED UP TO 18,000 WORDS - SEE ORDER FILED ON 12/18/12. [12-14676, 12-15147]
December 18, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. is DENIED. [6689964-2]; Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. is GRANTED. [6689964-3] RB, CRW and AJ
December 3, 2012 40 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Natasha H. Moffitt for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr..
November 15, 2012 39 DOCKETED IN ERROR JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. and J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. to be addressed in briefs.--[Edited 11/15/2012 by JKS]
October 22, 2012 38 RESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. in 12-14676 [6689964-2], Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. in 12-14676 [6689964-3] filed by Attorney John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. (ECF: John Rains)
October 17, 2012 37 According to our records, Natasha Horne Moffitt for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and return the required application for admission.
October 17, 2012 36 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Todd D. Larson for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc..
October 17, 2012 35 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Todd D. Larson is GRANTED by Supervisor/AG. [6693641-2]
October 12, 2012 34 MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction., to consolidate appeals 12-14676 and 12-15147 filed by Appellees J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. Motion is Opposed [6689964-1] (ECF: Stephen Schaetzel)
October 11, 2012 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Todd D. Larson for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. [6693641-1]
October 11, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to file excess pages filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. is GRANTED. [6682902-2] EEC
October 10, 2012 31 RESPONSE to Motion to file excess pages filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676 [6682902-2] filed by Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Stephen Schaetzel)
October 10, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Lisa Royce Eskow for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Robert F. Hatcher Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-14676.
October 10, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Walter Hill Levie III for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Robert F. Hatcher Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-14676.
October 10, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Denise E. Whiting-Pack for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Robert F. Hatcher Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-14676.
October 10, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Robin L. Gentry for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Robert F. Hatcher Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-14676.
October 10, 2012 E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Mary Josephine Leddy Volkert for Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. in 12-14676 processed.
October 9, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Anthony B. Askew for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Anthony B. Askew for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Robert F. Hatcher Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
October 9, 2012 24 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Randi Wolkenbreit Singer for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc..
October 9, 2012 23 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katrina M. Quicker for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr..
October 9, 2012 E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. in 12-14676, Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee Robert F. Hatcher in 12-14676, Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr. in 12-14676, Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee Mark P. Becker in 12-14676, Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee J. L. Albert in 12-14676 processed.
October 9, 2012 ENTERED IN ERROR***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Natasha Horne Moffitt for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. --[Edited 10/17/2012 by JSC] (ECF: Mary Bates)
October 9, 2012 20 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John W. Harbin for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Mary Bates)
October 9, 2012 19 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mary Katherine Bates for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Mary Bates)
October 9, 2012 18 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lisa R. Eskow for the Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. (ECF: John Rains)
October 9, 2012 17 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Walter Hill Levie, III for Appellee (ECF: Walter Levie)
October 9, 2012 16 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Whiting-Pack, Denise E. (ECF: Denise Whiting-Pack)
October 9, 2012 15 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mary Josephine Leddy Volkert for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Denise Whiting-Pack)
October 9, 2012 14 Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellees J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Stephen Schaetzel)
October 9, 2012 13 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robin L. Gentry for Mark P. Becker, et al. (ECF: Robin Gentry)
October 9, 2012 12 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen M. Schaetzel for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Stephen Schaetzel)
October 9, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. is GRANTED. [6679240-2] Appellants brief due on 11/21/2012. CRW
October 9, 2012 10 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anthony B. Askew for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Anthony Askew)
October 4, 2012 9 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan Bloom for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. (ECF: John Rains)
October 3, 2012 8 MOTION for excess pages filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Motion is Opposed [6682902-1] (ECF: John Rains)
September 28, 2012 7 MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 11/21/2012 at 04:00 pm. filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed [6679240-1] (ECF: John Rains)
September 26, 2012 6 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc..
September 26, 2012 5 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc..
September 24, 2012 4 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file.
September 24, 2012 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward B. Krugman for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc..
September 24, 2012 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John H. Rains, IV for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc..
September 12, 2012 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Cambridge University Press on 09/10/2012. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Appellant brief due 40 days from 09/12/2012. No hearings to be transcribed.
Search for this case: Cambridge University Press, et al v. J.L. Albert, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS
Represented By: Jonathan Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: SAGE PUBLICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MARK P. BECKER, in his official capacity as President of Georgia State University
Represented By: Anthony B. Askew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: J. L. ALBERT, in his official capacity as Georgia State University Associate Provost for Information System and Technology
Represented By: Anthony B. Askew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: KENNETH R. BERNARD, JR., in his official capacity as member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia.
Represented By: Anthony B. Askew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ROBERT F. HATCHER, in his official capacity as Vice Chair of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Represented By: Anthony B. Askew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: W. MANSFIELD JENNINGS, JR., in his official capacity as member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Represented By: Anthony B. Askew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]