Cariou v. Prince Featured Case

How far can an appropriation artist go?

Plaintiff - Appellee: Patrick Cariou
Defendant - Appellant: Richard Prince, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Lawrence Gagosian
 
Case Number: 11-1197
Filed: March 28, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: PROPERTY RIGHTS-Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 253 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Permanent Link to the appendix cited in the opinion, ATTACHED.[918519] [11-1197]
April 25, 2013 252 NEW CASE MANAGER, Anna Greenidge, ASSIGNED.[918514] [11-1197]
April 25, 2013 251 Featured Case OPINION, Concurring in part & Dissenting in part, by judge J. WALLACE, FILED.[918511] [11-1197]
April 25, 2013 250 Featured Case OPINION, reversing in part and vacating in part the judgment of the district court and remanding for further proceedings, by BDP, PWH, J. WALLACE, FILED.[918500] [11-1197]
December 28, 2012 247 ATTORNEY, Eric Maurer, for Appellant Richard Prince, TERMINATED.[803818] [11-1197]
December 20, 2012 246 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[799484] [11-1197]
July 3, 2012 244 ATTORNEY, Seth E. Spitzer, for Patrick Cariou, TERMINATED.[654325] [11-1197]
July 3, 2012 243 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, RECEIVED. Service date 07/03/2012 by CM/ECF.[654227] [11-1197]
June 29, 2012 242 ATTORNEY, Anthony T. Falzone, for Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., TERMINATED.[650877] [11-1197]
June 28, 2012 241 LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 06/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[650743] [11-1197]
June 8, 2012 240 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[632878] [11-1197]
June 7, 2012 239 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[632874] [11-1197]
June 5, 2012 238 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[628620] [11-1197]
June 5, 2012 236 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[628614] [11-1197]
June 5, 2012 234 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[628611] [11-1197]
May 29, 2012 235 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[628612] [11-1197]
May 24, 2012 233 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[628608] [11-1197]
May 22, 2012 237 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[628618] [11-1197]
May 21, 2012 232 CASE, before BDP, PWH*, C.JJ., WALLACE, C.J., 9TH Cir., HEARD.[615085] [11-1197]
May 3, 2012 231 MOTION ORDER, denying motion for oral argument [225] filed by Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. [599054][231] [11-1197]
April 17, 2012 228 OPPOSITION TO MOTION for oral argument [225], on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 04/17/2012 by CM/ECF. [582934][228] [11-1197]
April 16, 2012 225 MOTION, for oral argument, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [581659] [11-1197]
April 16, 2012 224 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 04/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [581360] [11-1197]
April 16, 2012 223 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [581335] [11-1197]
April 16, 2012 222 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 04/16/2012 by CM/ECF. [580810] [11-1197]
April 16, 2012 221 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[580689] [11-1197]
April 13, 2012 220 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/21/2012, SET.[579209] [11-1197]
March 26, 2012 217 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, RECEIVED. Service date 03/26/2012 by CM/ECF.[562662] [11-1197]
March 26, 2012 216 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/21/2012, PROPOSED.[562421] [11-1197]
March 21, 2012 214 ARGUMENT, as early as the week of 05/21/2012, READY.[558880] [11-1197]
March 20, 2012 211 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, RECEIVED. Service date 03/20/2012 by CM/ECF.[556391] [11-1197]
March 12, 2012 210 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/14/2012, PANEL A, PROPOSED.[549084] [11-1197]
March 5, 2012 208 CURED DEFECTIVE CORRECTED BRIEF, [206], [207], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED.[543193] [11-1197]
March 1, 2012 207 AMICUS REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/01/2012 by CM/ECF.[540408] [11-1197]--[Edited 03/05/2012 by HT]
March 1, 2012 206 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, CORRECTED BRIEF, [205], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED.[539629] [11-1197]
February 29, 2012 205 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/29/2012 by CM/ECF. [539279] [11-1197]
February 29, 2012 204 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file a reply amicus curiae brief [195] filed by Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., by CFD, FILED. [538950][204] [11-1197]
February 23, 2012 198 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file amicus curiae brief [195], on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 02/23/2012 by CM/ECF. [533919][198] [11-1197]
February 22, 2012 195 MOTION, to file reply amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2012 by CM/ECF. [532679] [11-1197]--[Edited 02/23/2012 by HT]
February 22, 2012 194 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2012 by CM/ECF, US mail. [532661] [11-1197]--[Edited 02/23/2012 by HT]
February 8, 2012 192 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Joshua I Schiller for Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 02/08/2012 by CM/ECF. [521201] [11-1197]
February 8, 2012 191 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Anthony T. Falzone, Esq. for Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/08/2012 by CM/ECF. [521149] [11-1197]--[Edited 02/08/2012 by HT]
February 8, 2012 190 ATTORNEY, Seth Eliot Spitzer for Appellee Patrick Cariou, in case 11-1197, [189], ADDED.[521120] [11-1197]
February 8, 2012 189 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 02/08/2012 by CM/ECF. [521014] [11-1197]
February 7, 2012 188 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Hollis Anne Gonerka Bart for Appellant Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Lawrence Gagosian, FILED. Service date 02/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [520059] [11-1197]
February 6, 2012 186 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [161] filed by Amicus Curiae Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, Inc., by DC, FILED. [518463][186] [11-1197]
February 3, 2012 184 AMENDED ORDER, dated 02/03/2012, allowing all Appellants to file a Reply Brief on 02/22/2012, FILED.[517470] [11-1197]
February 2, 2012 181 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Dale Cendali, Esq. for Amicus Curiae Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/02/2012 by CM/ECF. [516359] [11-1197]
February 2, 2012 180 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, FILED.[516042] [11-1197]
February 2, 2012 178 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, FILED. Service date 02/01/2012 by CM/ECF. [515802] [11-1197]--[Edited 02/02/2012 by HT]
February 2, 2012 177 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [175], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, FILED.[515706] [11-1197]--[Edited 02/02/2012 by HT]
February 1, 2012 175 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, FILED. Service date 02/01/2012 by CM/ECF. [515427] [11-1197]--[Edited 02/02/2012 by HT]
February 1, 2012 174 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 02/01/2012 by CM/ECF.[515398] [11-1197]
February 1, 2012 172 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [154] filed by Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. [515192][172] [11-1197]--[Edited 02/01/2012 by HT]
January 31, 2012 168 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to extend time [161], on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 01/31/2012 by CM/ECF. [513777][168] [11-1197]
January 31, 2012 167 ATTORNEY, Michael Francis Williams for Movant Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc., & Picture Archive Coucil of America, Inc., in case 11-1197, [165], ADDED.[513687] [11-1197]
January 31, 2012 166 ATTORNEY, Claudia E. Ray for Movant Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. & Picture Archive Coucil of America, Inc., in case 11-1197, [164], ADDED.[513682] [11-1197]
January 31, 2012 165 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/31/2012 by CM/ECF. [513297] [11-1197]
January 31, 2012 164 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/31/2012 by CM/ECF. [513279] [11-1197]
January 31, 2012 161 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Movant Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/31/2012 by CM/ECF. [512948] [11-1197]
January 31, 2012 159 NEW PARTY, Movant Ameican Society of Media Photographers, Inc. and Picture Archive Coucil of America, Inc., ADDED.[512759] [11-1197]
January 30, 2012 158 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., & Pictures Archive Council of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/30/2012 by CM/ECF. [512507] [11-1197]--[Edited 01/31/2012 by HT]
January 30, 2012 155 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to extend time, [153], [154], on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED.[511055] [11-1197]
January 27, 2012 154 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 01/27/2012 by CM/ECF. [510962] [11-1197]
January 27, 2012 153 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to extend time, [152], on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED.[510838] [11-1197]
January 27, 2012 152 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 01/27/2012 by CM/ECF. [510735] [11-1197]
January 26, 2012 149 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Daniel J. Brooks for Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 01/26/2012 by CM/ECF. [509056] [11-1197]
January 25, 2012 148 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 01/25/2012 by CM/ECF. [507130] [11-1197]
November 3, 2011 143 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [136], [140], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visula Arts, Inc., FILED.[438234] [11-1197]
November 3, 2011 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/03/2011 by CM/ECF. [438223] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 3, 2011 141 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF, [136], [139], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED.[438135] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 3, 2011 140 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [138], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED.[438125] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 3, 2011 139 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of, The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/03/2011 by CM/ECF. [438092] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 3, 2011 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/03/2011 by CM/ECF. [438081] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 3, 2011 137 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [133], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED.[437040] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 3, 2011 136 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [132], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED.[437025] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 3, 2011 135 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Andy Wahol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., ADDED.[437019] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 3, 2011 134 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Art Museums and Association of Art Museum Directors, ADDED.[436977] [11-1197]
November 2, 2011 133 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of, The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [436816] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 2, 2011 132 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [436814] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 2, 2011 131 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [436813] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 2, 2011 130 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [436711] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 2, 2011 127 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF, [124], [130], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Google, Inc., FILED.[436458] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 2, 2011 125 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Art Museums and Association of Art Museum Directors, FILED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [436315] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/02/2011 by HT]
November 2, 2011 124 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [120], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Google, Inc., FILED.[436304] [11-1197]
November 2, 2011 123 ATTORNEY, Joseph C. Gratz for Amicus Curiae Google, Inc., in case 11-1197, [119], ADDED.[436302] [11-1197]
November 2, 2011 122 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Google, Inc., ADDED.[436292] [11-1197]
November 2, 2011 120 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [436152] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/02/2011 by HT]
November 2, 2011 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amicus Curiae Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [436142] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/02/2011 by HT]
November 2, 2011 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amicus Curiae Art Museums and Association of Art Museum Directors, FILED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [436126] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/02/2011 by HT]--[Edited 11/03/2011 by HT]
November 1, 2011 117 EXHIBIT, volume(s) 2 of 2, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by US mail.[434504] [11-1197]--[Edited 11/01/2011 by HT]
November 1, 2011 116 EXHIBIT, volume(s) 1 of 2, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by US mail.[434500] [11-1197]
October 31, 2011 115 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Patrick Cariou Brief due date as 01/25/2012, FILED.[433223] [11-1197]
October 31, 2011 114 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to waive a requirement [102] filed by Appellant Richard Prince, by RCW, FILED. [433217][114] [11-1197]
October 28, 2011 110 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, informing Court of proposed due date 01/25/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 10/28/2011 by CM/ECF.[432976] [11-1197]
October 28, 2011 104 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to waive a requirement, [103], [102], on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED.[431791] [11-1197]
October 28, 2011 103 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to waive a requirement, [101], on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED.[431779] [11-1197]
October 27, 2011 102 MOTION, to waive a requirement, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/27/2011 by CM/ECF. [431588] [11-1197]
October 27, 2011 101 MOTION, to waive a requirement, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/27/2011 by CM/ECF. [431580] [11-1197]
October 26, 2011 100 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by US mail, CM/ECF. [430310] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/28/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 99 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 9, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by CM/ECF, US mail. [430308] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 98 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 8, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by CM/ECF, US mail. [430306] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 97 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 7, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by CM/ECF, US mail. [430304] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 96 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 6, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by US mail, CM/ECF. [430302] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 95 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 5, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by US mail, CM/ECF. [430301] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 94 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 4, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by US mail, CM/ECF. [430300] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 93 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 3, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by email, CM/ECF. [430299] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 92 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 2, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by email, CM/ECF. [430293] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
October 26, 2011 91 JOINT APPENDIX, Vol. 1, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 10/26/2011 by CM/ECF, email. [430290] [11-1197]--[Edited 10/27/2011 by HT]
September 14, 2011 89 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to dismiss [51] filed by Appellee Patrick Cariou, by GC, RCW, GEL, FILED. [390931][89] [11-1197]
September 12, 2011 87 CAPTION, correct order of the parties, AMENDED.[387754] [11-1197]
August 25, 2011 85 ARGUMENT/SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[375401] [11-1197]
June 10, 2011 73 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [68], on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 06/10/2011 by CM/ECF.[312175][73] [11-1197]
June 2, 2011 70 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT , OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [67], on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED.[305094] [11-1197]
June 2, 2011 68 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to dismiss [51], on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/01/2011 by CM/ECF. [304722][68] [11-1197]
June 2, 2011 67 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [66], on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED.[304491] [11-1197]
June 1, 2011 66 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to dismiss [51], on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/01/2011 by CM/ECF. [304366][66] [11-1197]
June 1, 2011 65 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellant Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/01/2011 by CM/ECF.[304364] [11-1197]
May 31, 2011 62 1st Supplemental RECORD ON APPEAL, FILED ( 2 vols).[302114] [11-1197]
May 27, 2011 61 1st SUPPLEMENTAL INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[301342] [11-1197]
May 19, 2011 51 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 05/19/2011 by CM/ECF. [294588] [11-1197]
May 16, 2011 50 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 05/16/2011 by CM/ECF.[290310] [11-1197]
May 13, 2011 49 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Richard Prince's Notice of Appearance as Additional counsel, [22], [27] from the docket, FILED.[289665] [11-1197]
May 2, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER, dated 05/02/2011, Vacating the defective document cured notice of 05/02/2011 and Striking documents 27 and 29 from the docket for failure to cure defective filings, FILED.[278130] [11-1197]
May 2, 2011 39 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [30], on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED.[277572] [11-1197]
April 25, 2011 38 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc., & Richard Prince, Brief due date as 06/30/2011; Joint Appendix due date as 06/30/2011, and Joint Appendix due date as 06/30/2011, FILED.[272080] [11-1197]--[Edited 05/02/2011 by HT]--[Edited 05/09/2011 by HT]
April 22, 2011 35 ATTORNEY, Chaya Weinberg-Brodt for Appellant Gagosian Gallery, Inc., & Lawrence Gagosian, in case 11-1197, [33], ADDED.[271174] [11-1197]
April 22, 2011 34 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc., & Richard Prince, informing Court of proposed due date 06/30/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 04/22/2011 by CM/ECF, email.[270918] [11-1197]--[Edited 05/09/2011 by HT]
April 22, 2011 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/22/2011 by CM/ECF. [270904] [11-1197]--[Edited 04/22/2011 by HT]
April 15, 2011 32 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 04/15/2011 by CM/ECF.[264968] [11-1197]
April 14, 2011 31 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [29], on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED.[263212] [11-1197]
April 14, 2011 30 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [27], on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED.[263208] [11-1197]
April 13, 2011 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF. [261924] [11-1197]
April 13, 2011 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Patrick Cariou, FILED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF.[261446] [11-1197]
April 13, 2011 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF. [261380] [11-1197]
April 12, 2011 26 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [22], on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED.[260267] [11-1197]
April 12, 2011 25 ATTORNEY, Eric Maurer for Appellant Richard Prince, in case 11-1197, [19], ADDED.[260260] [11-1197]
April 12, 2011 24 ATTORNEY, Joshua I Schiller for Appellant Richard Prince, in case 11-1197, [18], ADDED.[260251] [11-1197]
April 12, 2011 23 NEW CASE MANAGER, Hezekiah James Toft, ASSIGNED.[260237] [11-1197]
April 12, 2011 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 04/12/2011 by CM/ECF. [260154] [11-1197]
April 12, 2011 21 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/02/2011, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[259845] [11-1197]
April 11, 2011 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 04/11/2011 by CM/ECF. [259015] [11-1197]
April 11, 2011 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 04/11/2011 by CM/ECF. [258995] [11-1197]
April 11, 2011 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Richard Prince, FILED. Service date 04/11/2011 by CM/ECF.[258980] [11-1197]
April 8, 2011 12 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/08/2011 by CM/ECF, email.[258401] [11-1197]
April 8, 2011 11 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/08/2011 by email, CM/ECF.[258399] [11-1197]
April 8, 2011 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian and Gagosian Gallery, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/08/2011 by CM/ECF, email.[258162] [11-1197]
March 30, 2011 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, George F. Carpinello for Appellant Richard Prince, Jonathan David Schiller for Appellant Richard Prince and Eric Alwin Boden for Appellee Patrick Cariou, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[248085] [11-1197]
March 28, 2011 6 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, district court docket entry re: receipt # E 933143, FILED.[248092] [11-1197]
March 28, 2011 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[248068] [11-1197]
March 28, 2011 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/18/2011, RECEIVED.[248066] [11-1197]
March 28, 2011 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Gagosian, Gagosian Gallery, Inc. and Richard Prince, FILED. [248059] [11-1197]
Search for this case: Cariou v. Prince
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Patrick Cariou
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Richard Prince
Represented By: Jonathan David Schiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Gagosian Gallery, Inc.
Represented By: Hollis Anne Gonerka Bart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Lawrence Gagosian
Represented By: Hollis Anne Gonerka Bart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]