Laura Russo v. Comm Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: LAURA J. RUSSO
Defendant - Appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
 
Case Number: 10-2772
Filed: June 15, 2010
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2011 3010400712 Featured Case Calendared for Monday, 03/21/2011.
March 7, 2011 3010459851 Featured Case Submit Notification for Monday, 03/21/2011.
April 6, 2011 3010491575 Featured Case NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: FUENTES, SMITH and VAN ANTWERPEN, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 15. Judge: VAN ANTWERPEN Authoring.
April 6, 2011 3110491544 Featured Case JUDGMENT, ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the judgment of the District Court entered on May 10, 2010 is Affirmed.
May 31, 2011 3110546592 Featured Case MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Laura Russo v. Comm Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: LAURA J. RUSSO
Represented By: Gary L. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Patricia A. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]