Stephen Jackson v. Comm Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: STEPHEN JACKSON
Defendant - Appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 10-4058
Filed: October 15, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2011 3010479606 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Thursday, 06/23/2011.
June 3, 2011 3010551511 Opinion or Order of the Court Submit Notification for Thursday, 06/23/2011.
June 24, 2011 3010573873 Opinion or Order of the Court NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: BARRY, AMBRO and VAN ANTWERPEN, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 2. Judge: AMBRO Authoring. Because the District Court did not err in determining that the ALJ's decision was supported by substantial evidence, we affirm.
June 24, 2011 3110573877 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs will not be taxed.
August 15, 2011 3110625061 Opinion or Order of the Court MANDATE ISSUED., filed.
Search for this case: Stephen Jackson v. Comm Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: STEPHEN JACKSON
Represented By: David J. Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Patricia A. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]