Manuel Rios v. Comm Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: MANUEL RIOS
Defendant - Appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
 
Case Number: 10-4517
Filed: December 3, 2010
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2011 3010410077 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Manuel Rios due on or before 02/23/2011. Appendix due on or before 02/23/2011.
June 10, 2011 3010558503 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Tuesday, 09/13/2011.
August 16, 2011 3010627337 Opinion or Order of the Court Submit Notification for Tuesday, 09/13/2011.
September 14, 2011 3010653052 Opinion or Order of the Court NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: SLOVITER, SCIRICA and SMITH, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 6. Judge: SCIRICA Authoring.
September 14, 2011 3110653061 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, Affirmed.No costs taxed.
November 7, 2011 3110710413 Opinion or Order of the Court MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Manuel Rios v. Comm Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: MANUEL RIOS
Represented By: Loren Finesmith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Eda Giusti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]