Marta Diaz v. Comm Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: MARTA RIVERA DIAZ
Defendant - Appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
 
Case Number: 10-4540
Filed: December 8, 2010
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2011 3010411952 Featured Case BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Marta Rivera Diaz due on or before 02/28/2011. Appendix due on or before 02/28/2011.
March 4, 2011 3010458124 Featured Case NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Marta Rivera Diaz regarding the hard copy of the brief and appendix received on 02/28/2011. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 03/09/2011.
March 24, 2011 3010478659 Featured Case NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Marta Rivera Diaz regarding the appendix filed on 03/22/2011. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 03/29/2011.
May 10, 2011 3010527610 Featured Case Calendared for Friday, 07/15/2011.
June 29, 2011 3010580033 Featured Case Submit Notification for Friday, 07/15/2011.
July 27, 2011 3010606848 Featured Case NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: SLOVITER, FUENTES and FISHER, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 6. Judge: FISHER Authoring.
July 27, 2011 3110606852 Featured Case JUDGMENT, ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the order of the District Court entered October 6, 2010, be and the same is Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant.
September 19, 2011 3110657215 Featured Case MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Marta Diaz v. Comm Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: MARTA RIVERA DIAZ
Represented By: James Langton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Michelle L. Christ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]