Michael O'Connor v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: MICHAEL DANIEL O'CONNOR
Defendant - Appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
 
Case Number: 11-2383
Filed: May 27, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: D.I.W.C./D.I.W.W.

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
March 12, 2012 Michael O'Connor v. Commissioner Social Security

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2011 3010619129 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Michael Daniel O'Connor due on or before 09/19/2011. Appendix due on or before 09/19/2011.
November 1, 2011 3010704610 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Tuesday, 01/24/2012.
January 11, 2012 3010773441 Opinion or Order of the Court Submit Notification for Tuesday, 01/24/2012.
March 12, 2012 3010834313 Opinion or Order of the Court NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: FISHER, GREENAWAY, JR., Circuit Judges and *JONES, District Judge. Total Pages: 13. Judge: JONES Authoring. *(The Honorable John E. Jones, III, District Judge for the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, sitting by designation).
March 12, 2012 3110834330 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, Ordered and Adjudged by this Court that the order of the District Court entered March 30, 2011, be and the same is hereby Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant.
May 7, 2012 3110890923 Opinion or Order of the Court MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Michael O'Connor v. Commissioner Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: MICHAEL DANIEL O'CONNOR
Represented By: Agnes S. Wladyka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Christopher J. Brackett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]