Maria Perez v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: MARIA PEREZ
Defendant - Appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 12-2088
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
March 27, 2013 Maria Perez v. Commissioner Social Security

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 3010959925 Opinion or Order of the Court NONCOMPLIANCE ORDER sent to Attorney Patricia M. Franklin, Esq. for Appellant Maria Perez requesting electronic version of Civil Information Statement, Coporate Disclosure Statement, Concise Summary of Case. Counsel is further directed to file an entry of appearance form or the case will closed without further notice. Compliance due 07/20/2012.
July 19, 2012 3010962438 Opinion or Order of the Court NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Maria Perez requesting Concise Summary of the Case. Document attaches is the Notice of Appeal, not a Concise Summary of the Case. Compliance due 07/23/2012.
December 18, 2012 3011111900 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Friday, 03/22/2013.
March 7, 2013 3011188562 Opinion or Order of the Court Submit Notification for Friday, 03/22/2013.
March 27, 2013 3011209558 Opinion or Order of the Court NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: MCKEE, Chief Judge, SMITH and GREENAWAY JR., Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 10. Judge: GREENAWAY JR. Authoring.
July 19, 2012 3110962737 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Maria Perez due on or before 08/28/2012. Appendix due on or before 08/28/2012.
March 27, 2013 3111209561 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant.
Search for this case: Maria Perez v. Commissioner Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: MARIA PEREZ
Represented By: Patricia M. Franklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: John M. Kelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]