Robin Carter v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: ROBIN L. CARTER
Defendant - Appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 12-2581
Filed: June 5, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
January 18, 2013 Robin Carter v. Commissioner Social Security

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2012 3011050973 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Monday, 01/14/2013.
January 2, 2013 3011121533 Opinion or Order of the Court Submit Notification for Monday, 01/14/2013.
January 18, 2013 3011140904 Opinion or Order of the Court NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: SMITH, Authoring Judge, CHAGARES and BARRY, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 6.
July 16, 2012 3110957234 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Robin L. Carter due on or before 08/27/2012. Appendix due on or before 08/27/2012.
January 18, 2013 3111140923 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Affirmed. Each party to bear its costs.
March 11, 2013 3111190494 Opinion or Order of the Court MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Robin Carter v. Commissioner Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: ROBIN L. CARTER
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Dina W. Griffin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]