Rishi Negi v. Attorney General United State

Petitioner: RISHI NEGI
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
 
Case Number: 13-1811
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Presiding Judge: Unassigned - CIV
 
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 3011206126 Featured Case ORDER (Clerk) directing the Executive Office of Immigration Review to file the adminstrative record.
March 25, 2013 3011206757 Featured Case NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Respondent Attorney General United States of America requesting entry of appearance form from Linda Cheng, Esq. must be filed using the form for the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit not the form for the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Compliance due 04/08/2013.
April 9, 2013 3111222168 Featured Case BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Petitioner Rishi Negi due on or before 05/20/2013. Appendix due on or before 05/20/2013.
Search for this case: Rishi Negi v. Attorney General United State
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RISHI NEGI
Represented By: Rishi Negi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric H. Holder
Represented By: Thomas W. Hussey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]