Rosetta Stone LTD v. Google, Incorporated Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: ROSETTA STONE LTD
Defendant - Appellee: GOOGLE, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 10-2007
Filed: September 1, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
April 9, 2012 Summary Rosetta Stone Ltd. v. Google, Inc.

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 193 BRIEFS/APPENDIX (paper) released to Lantagne. Paper documents released: [ Joint Appendix Vols. 1-2]. [10-2007] (AC)
April 9, 2012 192 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 10-2007 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed in part, vacated in part, and remanded. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00736-GBL-TCB. Entered on Docket Date: 04/09/2012. [998828484] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [10-2007] (DHB)
April 9, 2012 191 Featured Case PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00736-GBL-TCB Paper copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [998828478]. [10-2007] (DHB)
October 5, 2011 190 Oral argument cd sent to Google Incorporated. [10-2007] (JLC)
October 5, 2011 189 REQUEST for oral argument CD by Google, Incorporated. [10-2007] (JLC)
September 22, 2011 188 ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable William B. Traxler, Jr., Barbara Milano Keenan and Clyde H. Hamilton. Attorneys arguing case: Mr. Clifford M. Sloan for Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD and Margret Mary Caruso for Appellee Google, Incorporated. Courtroom Deputy: Beth Walton. [998684098] [10-2007] (BW)
September 20, 2011 187 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Paul M. Kerlin for Rosetta Stone LTD.[998682676] [10-2007] Paul Kerlin
July 18, 2011 186 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Google, Incorporated. Counsel arguing: Margret M. Caruso Answering argument time: 20 [998634432] [10-2007] Margret Caruso
July 15, 2011 185 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD. Counsel arguing: Clifford M. Sloan Opening argument time: 15 Rebuttal argument time: 5 [998633435] [10-2007] Clifford Sloan
July 13, 2011 184 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 09/22/2011. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. [10-2007] (JLC)
June 14, 2011 182 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 9/20/11 - 9/23/11 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 06/27/2011 [10-2007] (JLC)
April 12, 2011 181 COURT ORDER filed [998566283] denying Motion for rehearing en banc [174] Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
April 5, 2011 180 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lucy Dalglish for The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press.[998561657] [10-2007] (LDJ)
April 5, 2011 179 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Potential Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998561655] [10-2007] (LDJ)
April 5, 2011 177 [Edited 05/03/2011 by LDJ]. Reason for Edit: Document Struck. (The 4/12/11 court order took no action on the motion for leave to file so the entry for the brief has been removed). [10-2007] Lucy Dalglish
April 5, 2011 176 MOTION by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). added to case.. Date and method of service: 04/05/2011 ecf [998561499] [10-2007] Lucy Dalglish
March 30, 2011 175 CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR TO AWAITING CALENDAR. [998556374] [10-2007] (JLE)
March 29, 2011 174 PETITION for rehearing en banc (FRAP 35) by Intervenors Eric Goldman, Public Citizen and Martin Schwimmer. [10-2007] Paul Levy
March 23, 2011 173 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD. [998551915]. [10-2007] Clifford Sloan
March 23, 2011 172 Docket correction requested from Mr. Clifford M. Sloan for Rosetta Stone LTD. Re: [171], Supplemental Authorities. Access to Supplemental Authorities has been restricted to case participants... [10-2007] (LDJ)
March 21, 2011 171 [Edited 03/23/2011 by LDJ]. Reason for Edit: Incorrect Entry Struck. [998550056]. [10-2007] Clifford Sloan
March 17, 2011 170 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellee Google, Incorporated. [998547794]. [10-2007] Margret Caruso
March 17, 2011 169 Docket correction requested from Margret Mary Caruso for Google, Incorporated. Re: [168], letter. Access to letter has been restricted to case participants. [10-2007] (LDJ)
March 16, 2011 168 [Edited 03/18/2011 by LDJ]. Reason for Edit: Incorrect Entry Struck. [998546658] [10-2007] Margret Caruso
March 15, 2011 167 COURT ORDER filed [998545651] denying motion to schedule oral argument on the motion to unseal [161]; granting motion to unseal the joint appendix only with respect to the documents appellee has agreed to in its response to the motion to unseal and denying the motion to unseal the joint appendix as to those documents that appellee seeks to have remain under seal. [136]; granting motion to intervene for the limited purpose of seeking to unseal the joint appendix [135], striking the previously-filed joint appendix and directing appellee to file a corrected joint appendix. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
February 22, 2011 166 REPLY filed by Google, Incorporated to Response [163], Response [165], Motion to schedule oral argument [161]. [10-2007] Margret Caruso
February 18, 2011 165 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by Rosetta Stone LTD to Motion to schedule oral argument [161]. [10-2007] Clifford Sloan
February 18, 2011 164 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 5/10/11 - 5/13/11 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 02/28/2011 [10-2007] (JLE)
February 16, 2011 163 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by Public Citizen Eric Goldman, Intervenor Martin Schwimmer, Intervenor Public Citizen, Invervenor to notice requesting response [162], Motion to schedule oral argument [161], letter [160], reply [159], Response [158], Response [154], Motion to unseal [136], Motion to intervene [135]. [10-2007] Paul Levy
February 16, 2011 162 NOTICE ISSUED to Rosetta Stone LTD and Eric Goldman, Public Citizen and Martin Schwimmer requesting response to Motion to schedule oral argument [161] Response due: 03/01/2011.[998525822] [10-2007] (LDJ)
February 15, 2011 161 MOTION filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated to schedule oral argument. Argument Date or Session:.. Date and method of service: 02/15/2011 ecf [998525738] [10-2007] Margret Caruso
February 14, 2011 160 Letter filed re: [136], Motion to unseal filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated. [998524527] [10-2007] Margret Caruso
February 7, 2011 159 REPLY filed by Public Citizen to Response [158], Motion to unseal [136]. [10-2007] Paul Levy
January 31, 2011 158 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by Google, Incorporated to Motion to unseal [136], Motion to intervene [135]. [10-2007] Margret Caruso
January 24, 2011 157 CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR TO AWAITING CALENDAR. [998508702] [10-2007] (JLC)
January 18, 2011 156 Featured Case ORDER filed [998505103] extending filing time for response until 1/31/11; granting Motion to reconsider [155] Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
January 18, 2011 155 MOTION filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated to reconsider Motion to approve/authorize [152], order [153],Clerk order to extend filing time [153]. Date and method of service: 01/18/2011 ecf [998505092] [10-2007] (MMC)
January 14, 2011 154 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by Rosetta Stone LTD to Motion to intervene [135], Motion to unseal [136]. [10-2007] (CMS)
January 14, 2011 153 Featured Case ORDER filed [998503723] extending filing time for response until January 25, 2011 Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (MFT)
January 14, 2011 152 MOTION filed by Amicus Curiae Public Citizen and Appellee Google, Incorporated to approve/authorize The Extension of Time For Google Inc. to Respond to Motion to Intervene and Motion to Unseal and Disclosure of Agreed Upon Documents. Date and method of service: 01/14/2011 ecf [998503499] [10-2007] (MMC)
December 30, 2010 151 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 3/22/11 - 3/25/11 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 01/10/2011 [10-2007] (JLC)
December 28, 2010 150 CORRECTED BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Google, Incorporated correcting and superseding Brief [103]. Number of pages [77]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/29/2010. [998492856] [10-2007] (TAF)
December 28, 2010 149 BRIEF filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Corrected. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/28/2010. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998492445] [10-2007] (MMC)
December 22, 2010 148 Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellee Public Knowledge. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998490001] [10-2007] (HF)
December 22, 2010 147 COURT ORDER filed [998489681] granting Motion to unseal appellee's brief and striking the redacted and sealed versions of the brief. Corrected brief (electronic and paper) due 01/03/10. [110] Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 20, 2010 146 RULE 46 NOTICE issued to Mr. Harold Feld for EEF and Public Knowledge filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Counsel will be ordered to show cause why default should not be referred to Standing Disciplinary panel if default is not cured within 15 days. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 20, 2010 145 Featured Case ORDER filed [998487896] granting Motion to extend filing time to file responses to the motions to intervene and to unseal. [144] Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 17, 2010 144 Joint MOTION filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD and Appellee Google, Incorporated to extend filing time for response until January 17, 2011. Date and method of service: 12/17/2010 ecf [998487607] [10-2007] (MMC)
December 16, 2010 143 Featured Case ORDER filed [998486389] granting Motion to file addendum/attachment to amicus brief. [142] Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 15, 2010 142 MOTION filed by Amicus Curiae Public Citizen file addendum/attachment to.. Date and method of service: 12/15/2010 ecf [998486155] [10-2007] (PAL)
December 14, 2010 140 NOTICE ISSUED to Rosetta Stone LTD and Google, Incorporated requesting responses to Motion to unseal [136] Responses due: 12/27/2010. [998484504] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 14, 2010 139 NOTICE ISSUED to Rosetta Stone LTD and Google, Incorporated requesting responses to Motion to intervene [135] Responses due: 12/27/2010.[998484495] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 14, 2010 138 Docket correction requested from Public Citizen. Re: [134], attachment. Document must be filed as a motion for leave to file attachment. Access to attachment has been restricted to case participants. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 13, 2010 141 REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD. Number of pages: [40]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 12/14/2010. [998484660] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 13, 2010 137 BRIEF filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Reply. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/13/2010. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998484225] [10-2007] (CMS)
December 13, 2010 136 MOTION filed by Public Citizen, Eric Goldman and Martin Schwimmer to unseal brief and appendix. Additional information:Unseal Volumes Three through Fifteen of the Joint Appendix and the Reply Brief (if any part is filed under seal). Date and method of service: 12/13/2010 ecf [998484148] [10-2007] (PAL)
December 13, 2010 135 MOTION filed by Public Citizen, Eric Goldman, and Martin Schwimmer, proposed intervenors to intervene. Date and method of service: 12/13/2010 ecf [998484145] [10-2007] (PAL)
December 13, 2010 134 [Edited 12/16/2010 by LDJ]. Reason for Edit: Incorrect Entry Struck. [10-2007] (PAL)
December 13, 2010 133 Letter filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD indicating that corrected sealed Volume VI of the appendix should be exchanged for the copy filed on 10/25/10. [998483807] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 130 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Yahoo! Incorporated and eBay, Incorporated. Number of pages: [33]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/07/2010.[998480136] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 129 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellee eBay, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998480128] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 128 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellee Yahoo! Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998480124] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 127 Featured Case ORDER filed [998480117] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) by eBay Inc. and Yahoo! Inc. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 126 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Potential Amici Curiae Yahoo! Incorporated and eBay, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/07/2010. [998480097] [10-2007] (MJL)
December 7, 2010 125 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Amici Supporting Appellee EEF and Public Knowledge re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge on 12/17/2010 [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 124 Featured Case ORDER filed [998479984] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) by Public Knowledge and Electronic Frontier Foundation. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 123 Docket correction requested from Public Citizen. Re: [113],amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 122 Featured Case ORDER filed [998479905] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) by Public Citizen. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 121 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Curiae Public Citizen. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998479900] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 120 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Potential Amici Curiae Yahoo! Incorporated and eBay, Incorporated re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from Yahoo! Incorporated and eBay, Incorporated on 12/17/2010. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 7, 2010 119 NOTICE ISSUED to Yahoo! Incorporated and eBay, Incorporated requesting motion. Motion due 12/17/2010. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 6, 2010 132 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Public Citizen. Number of pages: [45]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/09/2010.[998482252] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 6, 2010 131 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of EEF and Public Knowledge. Number of pages: [35]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/08/2010.[998481246] [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 6, 2010 116 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Curiae The UK Intellectual Property Law Society. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998479374] [10-2007] (CT)
December 6, 2010 115 [Edited 12/07/2010 by LDJ]. Reason for Edit: Document Struck. [10-2007] (MJL)
December 6, 2010 114 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Public Knowledge, Amicus Supporting Appellee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/06/2010. [998479284] [10-2007] (HF)
December 6, 2010 113 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Public Citizen, Amicus Curiae (with consent of the parties) Urging Affirmance in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/06/2010. [998479227] [10-2007] (PAL)
December 3, 2010 112 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Volunteers of America in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/01/2010. [998478347] [10-2007] (KWM)
December 2, 2010 111 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT (FRAP 12) filed by Amicus Curiae The UK Intellectual Property Law Society. [10-2007] (CT)
December 2, 2010 110 CONSENT/STIPULATION filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD and Appellee Google, Incorporated to unseal brief. [10-2007] (MMC)
December 1, 2010 109 Featured Case ORDER filed [998475715] sealing response brief. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
December 1, 2010 105 RULE 46 NOTICE issued to Mr. Karl William Means for Volunteers of America, Mr. Thomas Garner Southard for Volunteers of America and Mr. Alan Barry Sternstein for Volunteers of America failure to file corrected amicus brief. Counsel will be ordered to show cause why default should not be referred to Standing Disciplinary panel if default is not cured within 15 days. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 30, 2010 108 Redacted RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Google, Incorporated. Number of pages: [78]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 12/01/2010. [998475713] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 30, 2010 107 SEALED BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Google, Incorporated. Type of Brief: Response Number of pages: [78]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/01/2010. Filed Ex parte: N. [998475712] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 29, 2010 106 CORRECTED BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD correcting and superseding sealed Brief [20], Brief [21]. Number of pages [73]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/01/2010. [998475660] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 29, 2010 104 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY filed (Local Rule 25(c)) by Google, Incorporated. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Brief of Appellee. [10-2007] (MMC)
November 29, 2010 103 Redacted BRIEF filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/30/2010. Is this a redacted brief?Yes If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? Yes [998474042] [10-2007] (MMC)
November 29, 2010 102 SEALED BRIEF FILED by Appellee Google, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered: 11/30/2010.. Filed Ex parte: N. [10-2007] (MMC)
November 29, 2010 100 BRIEF filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Corrected. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/29/2010. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998473602] [10-2007] (CMS)
November 29, 2010 99 [Edited 11/29/2010 by LDJ]. Reason for Edit: Duplicate Entry Struck. (CMS)
November 24, 2010 98 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Amicus Curiae The UK Intellectual Property Law Society for filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1). Disclosure statement due from The UK Intellectual Property Law Society on 12/06/2010 [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 24, 2010 97 Featured Case ORDER filed [998472171] granting motion of The UK Intellectual Property Law Society for leave to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 24, 2010 96 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by The UK Intellectual Property Law Society in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/22/2010. [998472018] [10-2007] (CT)
November 23, 2010 101 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of The UK Intellectual Property Law Society. Number of pages: [28]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/29/2010.[998473643] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 17, 2010 95 COURT ORDER filed [998467968] granting Motion to unseal appellant's brief and striking the redacted and sealed versions of the brief. Corrected brief (electronic and paper) due 11/29/10. [77] Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 16, 2010 94 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Amici Supporting Appellant 1-800 Contacts, Incorporated, ConvaTec, Incorporated, Guru Denim, Incorporated, Monster Cable Products, Incorporated and PetMed Express, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/01/2010. [998466923] [10-2007] (BN)
November 16, 2010 93 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Volunteers of America. Number of pages: [34]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/16/2010.[998465916] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 16, 2010 92 Docket correction requested from Volunteers of America. Re: [78],amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 16, 2010 91 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Volunteers of America. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998465909] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 16, 2010 90 Featured Case ORDER filed [998465901] granting Motion of Volunteers of America, Inc. to file amicus curiae brief [35] Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 15, 2010 89 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of 1-800 Contacts, Incorporated, ConvaTec, Incorporated, Guru Denim, Incorporated, Monster Cable Products, Incorporated and PetMed Express, Inc.. Number of pages: [43]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/15/2010.[998465366] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 15, 2010 88 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant 1-800 Contacts, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998465363] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 15, 2010 87 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant PetMed Express, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998465361] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 15, 2010 86 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Monster Cable Products, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998465360] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 15, 2010 85 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Guru Denim, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998465359] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 15, 2010 84 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant ConvaTec, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998465358] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 15, 2010 83 Docket correction requested from 1-800 Contacts, Incorporated, ConvaTec, Incorporated, Guru Denim, Incorporated, Monster Cable Products, Incorporated and PetMed Express, Inc.. Re: [33],amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 15, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER filed [998465323] granting Motion of ConvaTec Incorporated, Guru Denim, Incorporated, Monster Cable Products, Incorporated, PetMed Express, Inc. and 1-800 Contacts, Incorporated to file amici curiae brief [32] Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 12, 2010 81 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by Google, Incorporated to amicus curiae Brief [78], Motion to file amicus curiae brief [35]. [10-2007] (JDF)
November 12, 2010 80 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by Google, Incorporated to amicus curiae Brief [33], Motion to file amicus curiae brief [32]. [10-2007] (JDF)
November 5, 2010 78 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Potential Amicus Curiae Volunteers of America. Amicus Brief refiled per Docket Correction Request dated November 2, 2010; Appearance of Counsel by Karl Wm. Means and Thomas G. Southard; in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/01/2010. [998460895] [10-2007] (KWM)
November 4, 2010 77 CONSENT/STIPULATION filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD and Appellee Google, Incorporated to unseal brief. [10-2007] (CMS)
November 3, 2010 79 CORRECTED APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD correcting and superseding appendix filed on 10/25/10 (sealed volumes 9-14 replaced). Total number of volumes (including sealed volumes): 15. Total number of sealed volumes: 13. Total number of pages in all volumes: 7,395. Entered on Docket Date: 11/08/2010. [998461535] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 73 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Longchamp USA, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459206] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 72 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant S.A.S. Jean Cassegrain. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459205] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 71 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Harrah's Entertainment, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459204] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 70 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459202] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 69 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Coach, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459201] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 68 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Chanel, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459200] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 67 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Business Software Alliance. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459198] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 66 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant United Continental Holdings, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459196] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 65 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459195] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 64 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Tumi, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459193] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 63 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant TiVo, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459190] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 62 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Tiffany & Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459187] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 61 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Swarovski North America, Ltd.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459186] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 60 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant The Sunrider Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459184] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 59 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Sunkist Growers, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459181] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 58 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Rolls-Royce North America, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459180] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 57 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Professional Golfers' Association of America, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459179] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 56 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Oakley, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998459178] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 55 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant National Football League. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459176] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 54 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant The Association for Competitive Technology. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998459173] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 3, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER filed [998459158] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) by The Association for Competitive Technology, et al. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 51 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by David H. Bernstein for International Trademark Association.[998458467] [10-2007] (DHB)
November 2, 2010 50 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Ford Motor Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998457829] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 49 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Harmon International Industries, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998457827] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 48 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Viacom, Inc.,. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998457821] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 47 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Carfax, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998457815] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 46 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant Blues Destiny Records, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998457800] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 45 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Supporting Appellant The Media Institute. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998457797] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER filed [998457726] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) by Carfax, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Harmon International Industries, Inc., The Media Institute, Viacom, Inc. and Blues Destiny Records, LLC. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 43 Featured Case ORDER filed [998457653] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) by International Trademark Association. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 42 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Amicus Curiae International Trademark Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998457646] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 41 Docket correction requested from Volunteers of America. Re: [36], Brief. Access to Brief has been restricted to case participants. [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 40 NOTICE ISSUED to Google, Incorporated requesting response to Motion to file amicus curiae brief [35] Response due: 11/12/2010. [998457508] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 2, 2010 39 NOTICE ISSUED to Google, Incorporated requesting response to Motion to file amicus curiae brief. [32] Response due: 11/12/2010.[998457439] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 1, 2010 76 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Business Software Alliance, Chanel, Incorporated, Coach, Incorporated, Government Employees Insurance Company, Harrah's Entertainment, Incorporated, Longchamp USA, Incorporated, National Football League, Oakley, Incorporated, Professional Golfers' Association of America, Incorporated, Rolls-Royce North America, Incorporated, S.A.S. Jean Cassegrain, Sunkist Growers, Incorporated, Swarovski North America, Ltd., The Association for Competitive Technology, The Sunrider Corporation, TiVo, Incorporated, Tiffany & Company, Tumi, Incorporated and United Continental Holdings, Incorporated. Number of pages: [59]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/03/2010.[998459275] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 1, 2010 75 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of International Trademark Association. Number of pages: [42]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/03/2010.[998459272] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 1, 2010 74 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Blues Destiny Records, LLC, Carfax, Incorporated, Ford Motor Company, Harmon International Industries, Incorporated, The Media Institute and Viacom, Inc.,. Number of pages: 41. Entered on Docket Date: 11/03/2010.[998459264] [10-2007] (LDJ)
November 1, 2010 38 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by International Trademark Association (Amicus Curiae) in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/01/2010. [998457418] [10-2007] (DHB)
November 1, 2010 37 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTDRandall Miller in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/01/2010. [998457410] [10-2007] (RKM)
November 1, 2010 36 [Edited 11/08/2010 by LDJ]. Reason for Edit: Incorrect Entry Struck. [10-2007] (ABS)
November 1, 2010 35 MOTION filed by Volunteers of America --to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 11/01/2010 ecf [998457407] [10-2007]--[Edited 11/02/2010 by BW] (ABS)
November 1, 2010 34 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Amici curiae Carfax, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Harman International Industries, Incorporated, The Media Institute, Viacom Inc. and Blues Destiny Records, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/01/2010. [998457373] [10-2007] (MBP)
November 1, 2010 33 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF filed by Amici ConvaTec, Inc., Guru Denim, Inc., Monster Cable Products, Inc., PetMed Express, Inc., and 1-800 Contacts, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/01/2010. [998457369] [10-2007] (BN)
November 1, 2010 32 MOTION filed by Amici ConvaTec, Inc., Guru Denim, Inc., Monster Cable Products, Inc., PetMed Express, Inc., and 1-800 Contacts, Inc. to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). added to case.. Date and method of service: 11/01/2010 ecf [998457362] [10-2007] Proporsed amici brief has been deleted as attachment to motion as it is filed separately.--[Edited 11/02/2010 by LDJ] (BN)
October 26, 2010 31 Featured Case ORDER filed [998452867] sealing opening brief. Copies to all parties. [10-2007]--[Edited 10/26/2010 by LDJ] (LDJ)
October 26, 2010 30 Featured Case ORDER filed [998452863] sealing Vols. 3-15 of joint appendix. Copies to all parties. [10-2007] (LDJ)
October 26, 2010 26 Docket correction requested from Rosetta Stone LTD. Re: appendix. [10-2007] (LDJ)
October 25, 2010 29 Redacted OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD. Number of pages: [73]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 10/26/2010. [998452855] [10-2007] (LDJ)
October 25, 2010 28 SEALED BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD. Type of Brief: Opening. Number of pages: [73]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/26/2010. Filed Ex parte: N. [998452853] [10-2007] (LDJ)
October 25, 2010 27 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Rosetta Stone LTD. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 15. Total number of pages in all volumes: 7,396. Total number of sealed volumes: 13. Entered on Docket Date: 10/26/2010. [998452850] [10-2007] (LDJ)
October 25, 2010 24 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY filed (Local Rule 25(c)) by Rosetta Stone LTD. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Volumes III - XV of the Joint Appendix. [10-2007] (CMS)
October 25, 2010 23 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY filed (Local Rule 25(c)) by Rosetta Stone LTD. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Opening Brief of Appellant. [10-2007] (CMS)
October 25, 2010 22 NOTICE OF PAPER FILING filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD. Type of paper document filed: appendix. Description: Joint Appendix with Volumes III - XV filed Under Seal. Date paper copies mailed, dispatched or delivered to court: 10/25/2010. Method of filing paper copies: hand delivery [10-2007] (CMS)
October 25, 2010 21 Redacted BRIEF filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/25/2010.. Is this a redacted brief?Yes. If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? Yes. [998452574] Disclosure Statement added by Clerk [10-2007]--[Edited 10/26/2010 by MFT] (CMS)
October 25, 2010 20 SEALED BRIEF FILED by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered: 10/25/2010.. Filed Ex parte: N. [10-2007] Disclosure Statement added by Clerk--[Edited 10/26/2010 by MFT] (CMS)
September 29, 2010 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Austin D. Tarango for Google, Incorporated.[998435652] [10-2007] (ADT)
September 28, 2010 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Henry Lien for Google, Incorporated.[998434830] [10-2007] (HL)
September 28, 2010 17 DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Local Rule 12(b)) filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated. Name of lead counsel: Margaret M. Caruso, Esquire of the firm Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP. [10-2007] (JDF)
September 28, 2010 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Cheryl A. Galvin for Google, Incorporated.[998434622] [10-2007] (CG)
September 28, 2010 15 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Appellee Google, Incorporated re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 10/08/2010 from Cheryl Galvin, Henry Lien and Austin Dean Tarango, Attorney [10-2007] (LDJ)
September 27, 2010 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Margaret M. Caruso for Google, Incorporated.[998433738] [10-2007] (MMC)
September 20, 2010 13 Notice issued regarding filing of appearance of counsel form by non-ECF filer (Margaret Caruso). [10-2007] (LDJ)
September 17, 2010 13 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [10-2007] (LP)
September 17, 2010 12 DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Local Rule 12(b)) filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD. Name of lead counsel: Clifford M. Sloan. [10-2007] (CMS)
September 16, 2010 11 Notice issued regarding filing of appearance of counsel forms by non-ECF filers (Cheryl Gavin, Henry Lien, Austin Tarango). [10-2007] (LDJ)
September 15, 2010 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998425785] [10-2007] (JDF)
September 15, 2010 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jonathan D. Frieden for Google, Incorporated.[998425783] [10-2007] (JDF)
September 14, 2010 8 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/25/2010. Response Brief due 11/26/2010 [10-2007] (LDJ)
September 14, 2010 7 DOCKETING STATEMENT filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD. [10-2007] (CMS)
September 14, 2010 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Appellant Rosetta Stone LTD. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998424397] [10-2007] (CMS)
September 14, 2010 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jennifer L. Spaziano for Rosetta Stone LTD.[998424380] [10-2007] (JLS)
September 14, 2010 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mitchell S. Ettinger for Rosetta Stone LTD.[998424340] [10-2007] (MSE)
September 14, 2010 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Clifford M. Sloan for Rosetta Stone LTD.[998424310] [10-2007] (CMS)
September 1, 2010 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued. Re: [1],case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days.. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00736-GBL-TCB. [10-2007] (LDJ)
September 1, 2010 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00736-GBL-TCB. Case manager: LJernigan. Date notice of appeal filed: 08/31/2010 [10-2007] (LDJ)
Search for this case: Rosetta Stone LTD v. Google, Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: ROSETTA STONE LTD
Represented By: Warren T. Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: GOOGLE, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Cobb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]