In re: Amy Unknown

Petitioner: In re: AMY UNKNOWN
Defendant - Respondent: DOYLE RANDALL PAROLINE
Plaintiff - Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 09-41238
Filed: December 17, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
March 22, 2011 In re: Amy Unknown
January 27, 2012 In Re: Amy Unknown
October 1, 2012 In Re: Amy Unknown
November 19, 2012 In Re: Amy Unknown
June 10, 2014 In Re: Amy Unknown

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2012 502005093 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7193980-2] [09-41238, 09-41254]
June 10, 2014 502658314 Opinion or Order of the Court EN BANC PUBLISHED OPINION ORDER On Remand From The Supreme Court of the United States FILED. (ISSUED AS AND FOR THE MANDATE) (ALSO FILED IN 09-31215) [09-41238 Vacated and Remanded 09-41254 Vacated and Remanded ] Judge: EMG [09-41238, 09-41254]
March 22, 2011 511420228 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [09-41238 Reversed (GRANTED & REMANDED) 09-41254 Reversed & Remanded ] Judge: EHJ , Judge: EGJ , Judge: EMG Judges EGJ and EMG concur, except inPart II, which they consier advisory. Mandate pull date is 05/13/2011; granting petition for rehearing filed by Petitioner Ms. Amy Unknown [6445979-2] in 09-41238; [6431948-2] in 09-41238; granting & remanding petition for writ of mandamus filed by Petitioner Ms. Amy Unknown [6431948-2] in 09-41238 [09-41238, 09-41254]
November 19, 2012 512058515 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [09-41238 Reversed (Granted) 09-41254 Vacated and Remanded] Judge: EMG , Judge: JLD , Judge: WED , Judge: LHS Mandate pull date is 01/10/2013 [09-41238, 09-41254]
Search for this case: In re: Amy Unknown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re: AMY UNKNOWN
Represented By: James R. Marsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - respondent: DOYLE RANDALL PAROLINE
Represented By: Fred Rimes Files
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Amanda Louise Griffith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]