Francis Barker, Jr. v. Hercules Offshore, Inc., et al

Plaintiff - Appellant: FRANCIS BARKER, JR.
Defendant - Appellee: HALL-HOUSTON EXPLORATION II, L.P., HALL-HOUSTON EXPLORATION PARTNERS, L.L.C. and HALL-HOUSTON EXPLORATION COMPANY
Case Number: 12-20150
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Liability

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
February 1, 2013 Summary Barker, Jr. v. Hercules Offshore, Inc., et al
March 22, 2013 Summary Francis Barker, Jr. v. Hercules Offshore, Inc., et

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2013 502182926 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7285745-2] [12-20150]
February 1, 2013 512132708 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [12-20150 Affirmed] Judge: PEH , Judge: EBC , Judge: CH Mandate pull date is 02/22/2013 [12-20150]
Search for this case: Francis Barker, Jr. v. Hercules Offshore, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: FRANCIS BARKER, JR.
Represented By: James Edward Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: HALL-HOUSTON EXPLORATION II, L.P.
Represented By: Robert D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: HALL-HOUSTON EXPLORATION PARTNERS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: HALL-HOUSTON EXPLORATION COMPANY
Represented By: Robert D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.