Memorial Hermann Hospital v. Kathleen Sebeliu

Plaintiff - Appellant: MEMORIAL HERMANN HOSPITAL
Defendant - Appellee: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 12-20654
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Medicare

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
July 15, 2013 Summary Memorial Hermann Hospital v. Sebelius
July 22, 2013 Summary Memorial Hermann Hospital v. Kathleen Sebelius

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 502313865 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7409988-2] [12-20654]
July 12, 2013 512306333 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [12-20654 Affirmed ] Judge: EGJ , Judge: WED , Judge: ECP Mandate pull date is 09/03/2013 [12-20654]
Search for this case: Memorial Hermann Hospital v. Kathleen Sebeliu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: MEMORIAL HERMANN HOSPITAL
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Layne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.