Stephen Gabarick v. Laurin Maritime (America) Inc., et al

Petitioner - Appellant Cross-Appellee: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL LINES, L.L.C., as owner of Barge DM-932, praying for exoneration or limitation of liability
Petitioner - Appellee Cross-Appellant: WHITEFIN SHIPPING COMPANY LIMITED, as owner and managing owner of the M/V Tintomara, petitioning for exoneration from or limitation of liability, LAURIN MARITIME (AMERICA), INCORPORATED, As owner and Managing owner of the M/V Tintomara, petitioning for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability, LAURIN MARITIME AB and ANGLO-ATLANTIC STEAMSHIP LIMITED
Claimant - Appellee: D.R.D. TOWING COMPANY, L.L.C.
Petitioner - Appellee: DRD TOWING COMPANY, INCORPORATED, as owner pro hac vice or alleged owner pro hac vice of the M/V Mel Oliver
Case Number: 12-31109
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
January 10, 2014 Stephen Gabarick v. Laurin Maritime (America) Inc.
January 20, 2014 Stephen Gabarick v. Laurin Maritime (America) Inc.
January 31, 2014 Stephen Gabarick v. Laurin Maritime (America) Inc.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2014 502518608 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7543313-2] [12-31109]
January 10, 2014 512496638 Opinion or Order of the Court UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [12-31109 Affirmed ] Judge: EGJ , Judge: LHS , Judge: CH Mandate pull date is 01/31/2014 [12-31109]
Search for this case: Stephen Gabarick v. Laurin Maritime (America) Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellant cross-appellee: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL LINES, L.L.C., as owner of Barge DM-932, praying for exoneration or limitation of liability
Represented By: Glenn G. Goodier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellee cross-appellant: WHITEFIN SHIPPING COMPANY LIMITED, as owner and managing owner of the M/V Tintomara, petitioning for exoneration from or limitation of liability
Represented By: David B. Lawton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellee cross-appellant: LAURIN MARITIME (AMERICA), INCORPORATED, As owner and Managing owner of the M/V Tintomara, petitioning for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Represented By: David B. Lawton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellee cross-appellant: LAURIN MARITIME AB
Represented By: David B. Lawton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellee cross-appellant: ANGLO-ATLANTIC STEAMSHIP LIMITED
Represented By: David B. Lawton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant - appellee: D.R.D. TOWING COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Randolph Jean Waits
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellee: DRD TOWING COMPANY, INCORPORATED, as owner pro hac vice or alleged owner pro hac vice of the M/V Mel Oliver
Represented By: Randolph Jean Waits
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]