CHS, Incorporated v. Plaquemines Holdings, L.L.C.

Plaintiff - Appellant: CHS INCORPORATED
Defendant - Appellee: PLAQUEMINES HOLDINGS, L.L.C.
Case Number: 13-30028
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
November 5, 2013 Summary CHS, Inc. v. Plaquemines Holdings, L.L.C.
November 26, 2013 Summary CHS, Incorporated v. Plaquemines Holdings, L.L.C.
January 20, 2014 Summary CHS, Incorporated v. Plaquemines Holdings, L.L.C.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 502453557 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7497877-2] [13-30028]
November 5, 2013 512430853 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-30028 Affirmed] Judge: CES , Judge: CDK , Judge: ECP. Mandate pull date is 11/26/2013 [13-30028]
Search for this case: CHS, Incorporated v. Plaquemines Holdings, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: CHS INCORPORATED
Represented By: Mark Alan Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: PLAQUEMINES HOLDINGS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Castoriano
Represented By: Stephen O. Scandurro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.