In Re: Deepwater Horizon

Defendant - Appellant: BP PIPE LINE COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Plaintiff - Appellee: BRAD FRILOUX, RONALD LUNDY, WILLIAM SELLERS, KATHLEEN IRWIN, HENRY HUTTO, MICHAEL GUIDRY, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, JOHN TESVICH, PANAMA CITY BEACH DOLPHIN TOURS & MORE, L.L.C., BON SECOUR FISHERIES, INCORPORATED, LFBP 1, L.L.C., doing business as GW Fins, LAKE EUGENIE LAND & DEVELOPMENT, INCORPORATED, FORT MORGAN REALTY, INCORPORATED, JERRY J. KEE, CORLISS GALLO and ZEKES CHARTER FLEET, L.L.C.
 
Case Number: 13-30315
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
October 2, 2013 Summary In Re: Deepwater Horizon
November 5, 2013 In Re: Deepwater Horizon
March 3, 2014 In Re: Deepwater Horizon
May 20, 2014 In Re: Deepwater Horizon

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 502430729 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7497091-2] [13-30315, 13-30329]
March 3, 2014 502549612 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-30315 Affirmed, 13-30329 Affirmed, 13-31220 Affirmed, 13-31316 Affirmed] Judge: JLD , Judge: EBC , Judge: LHS. Mandate pull date is 03/24/2014 [13-30315, 13-30329, 13-31220, 13-31316]
October 2, 2013 512394834 Opinion or Order of the Court NON DISPOSITIVE PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-30315 Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part, Remanded 13-30329 Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part, Remanded] Judge: JLD , Judge: EBC , Judge: LHS [13-30315, 13-30329] Awaiting District Court Action deadline due on 12/02/2013 Cases 13-30315,13-30329 placed in abeyance for limited remand in 2:10-MD-2179 from the Eastern District of Louisiana [13-30315, 13-30329]
Search for this case: In Re: Deepwater Horizon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: BP PIPE LINE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert C. Mike Brock
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Richard Cartier Godfrey
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Andrew Tanner Karron
Represented By: James Andrew Langan
Represented By: Jeffrey Lennard
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Robert C. Mike Brock
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Richard Cartier Godfrey
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Mark Holstein
Represented By: Andrew Tanner Karron
Represented By: Jeffrey Lennard
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: Robert C. Mike Brock
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Richard Cartier Godfrey
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Mark Holstein
Represented By: Andrew Tanner Karron
Represented By: Jeffrey Lennard
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: BRAD FRILOUX
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: RONALD LUNDY
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: WILLIAM SELLERS
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: KATHLEEN IRWIN
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: HENRY HUTTO
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: MICHAEL GUIDRY, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: JOHN TESVICH
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: PANAMA CITY BEACH DOLPHIN TOURS & MORE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: BON SECOUR FISHERIES, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: LFBP 1, L.L.C., doing business as GW Fins
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: LAKE EUGENIE LAND & DEVELOPMENT, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: FORT MORGAN REALTY, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: JERRY J. KEE
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: CORLISS GALLO
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: ZEKES CHARTER FLEET, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephen Jay Herman
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]