Rodney Reed v. Rick Thaler, Director

Respondent - Appellee: RICK THALER, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION
Petitioner - Appellant: RODNEY REED
 
Case Number: 13-70009
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
January 10, 2014 Summary Reed v. Stephens
January 20, 2014 Rodney Reed v. William Stephens, Director
February 10, 2014 Rodney Reed v. William Stephens, Director

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 502527115 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7543391-2] [13-70009]
January 10, 2014 512496780 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-70009 Affirmed ] Judge: CDK , Judge: EBC , Judge: SAH Mandate pull date is 01/31/2014; granting motion to file brief in excess of word count filed by Appellant Mr. Rodney Reed [7477482-4]; denying motion for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Mr. Rodney Reed [7405429-2] [13-70009]
Search for this case: Rodney Reed v. Rick Thaler, Director
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent - appellee: RICK THALER, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Ottoway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellant: RODNEY REED
Represented By: Andrew Fairles MacRae
Represented By: Bryce Benjet
Represented By: Elizabeth Detweiler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]