Kristin Perry, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee,: KRISTIN M. PERRY, SANDRA B. STIER, PAUL T. KATAMI and JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Intervenor-Plaintiff,: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Defendant,: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California, EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Attorney General of California, MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as director of the California Department of Public Health and state registrar of vital statistics, LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as deputy director of health information & strategic planning for the California Department of Public Health, PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as clerk-recorder of the County of Alameda and DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as registrar-recorder/county-clerk for the County of Los Angeles
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee,: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH, GAIL J. KNIGHT, MARTIN F. GUTIERREZ, HAK-SHING WILLIAM TAM, MARK A. JANSSON and PROTECTMARRIAGE.COM - YES ON 8, A PROJECT OF CALIFORNIA RENEWAL, as official proponets of Proposition 8
Third Party - Appellant,: EQUALITY CALIFORNIA and NO ON PROPOSITION 8, CAMPAIGN FOR MARRIAGE EQUALITY, A PROJECT OF THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA
Third Party,: CALIFORNIANS AGAINST ELIMINATING BASIC RIGHTS
Case Number: 10-15649
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
April 12, 2010 Kristin Perry, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2010 19 MANDATE ISSUED. (KMW, RCF and MSB) [7328373] (TB)
April 14, 2010 18 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [10] submitted by Equality California and No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality, A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7300963] (FT)
April 14, 2010 17 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [12] submitted by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7300956] (FT)
April 12, 2010 15 Received Appellees Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth and Mark A. Jansson supplemental excerpt of record on appeal in 1 volumes. [7299769] (Case Closed) (FT)
April 12, 2010 14 Order FOR PUBLICATION filed (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MARSHA S. BERZON) For the foregoing reasons, we dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction and deny the petition for issuance of a writ of mandamus. Appellants’ motion to expedite the appeal is denied as moot. Each party shall bear its own costs of these proceedings. APPEAL DISMISSED. PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS DENIED.. [] [7298284] (RP)
April 12, 2010 13 Filed order MEDIATION (LJE): Case not selected for mediation program. Counsel interested in obtaining settlement assistance or program information should contact the Mediation Office. [7297062] (KKW)
April 9, 2010 16 Received Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry and Sandra B. Stier supplemental excerpt of record on appeal in 3 volumes. [7299808] ( Case Closed) (FT)
April 9, 2010 12 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Date of service: 04/09/2010. [7296590] (CJC)
April 9, 2010 11 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo response to Court order dated 05/31/2010. Date of service: 04/09/2010. [7296577] (TO)
April 9, 2010 10 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Equality California and No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality, A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Date of service: 04/09/2010. [7296570] (SVB)
March 31, 2010 9 Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MARSHA S. BERZON): No later than April 9, 2010, the parties shall file simultaneous briefs addressing solely the issues of whether this court has jurisdiction over this appeal and whether mandamus is appropriate. See Vizcaino v. U.S. Dist. Court, 173 F.3d 713 (9th Cir. 1999) (holding that this court may exercise mandamus jurisdiction when a district court does not comply with the mandate); In re Subpoena Served on Cal. Pub. Util. Comm’n, 813 F.2d 1473, 1476 (9th Cir. 1987) (holding that a nonparty ordinarily can obtain review of a discovery order by defying the order and appealing the ensuing contempt citation). Briefing on the remaining issues in this appeal is suspended pending further court order. [7284168] (AF)
March 26, 2010 8 Filed (ECF) Appellees Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal response to motion (,motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 03/26/2010. [7280057] (CJC)
March 26, 2010 7 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo response to motion (,motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 03/26/2010. [7279800] (TO)
March 26, 2010 6 Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RAYMOND C. FISHER and MARSHA S. BERZON) Appellants’ motion requesting assignment of this appeal to the panel that decided Perry v. Schwarzenegger, 591 F.3d 1147 (9th Cir. 2010), is granted for purposes of this motion. The motion is taken under submission with respect to assignment of the appeal on the merits. Appellants’ emergency motion for a stay of the district court’s March 22, 2010 order pending appeal is granted. Appellants’ motion to expedite the appeal will be addressed by separate order. [7279437] (KD)
March 26, 2010 5 Filed (ECF) Appellants Equality California and No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality, A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California Amended Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 03/26/2010. [7279390] (SVB)
March 25, 2010 4 Filed appendix of relevant documents from Appellants Equality California and No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality, A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. [7279100] (JFF)
March 25, 2010 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Equality California and No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality, A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 03/25/2010. [7278932] (SVB)
March 25, 2010 2 Filed Appellants Equality California and No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality, A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 03/24/2010. [7278912] (RT)
March 25, 2010 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript due 05/24/2010. Transcript ordered by 04/23/2010. Appellant Equality California and Appellant No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality, A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California opening brief due 07/02/2010. Appellee Martin F. Gutierrez, Appellee Dennis Hollingsworth, Appellee Mark A. Jansson, Appellee Paul T. Katami, Appellee Gail J. Knight, Appellee Kristin M. Perry, Appellee ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Appellee Sandra B. Stier, Appellee Hak-Shing William Tam and Appellee Jeffrey J. Zarrillo answering brief due 08/02/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7278850] (RT)
Search for this case: Kristin Perry, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: KRISTIN M. PERRY
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: SANDRA B. STIER
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: PAUL T. KATAMI
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-plaintiff,: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Erin Bernstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: Gordon Bruce Burns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as director of the California Department of Public Health and state registrar of vital statistics
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as deputy director of health information & strategic planning for the California Department of Public Health
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as clerk-recorder of the County of Alameda
Represented By: Claude Franklin Kolm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as registrar-recorder/county-clerk for the County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Judy Whitehurst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellee,: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellee,: GAIL J. KNIGHT
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellee,: MARTIN F. GUTIERREZ
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellee,: HAK-SHING WILLIAM TAM
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellee,: MARK A. JANSSON
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellee,: PROTECTMARRIAGE.COM - YES ON 8, A PROJECT OF CALIFORNIA RENEWAL, as official proponets of Proposition 8
Represented By: James Andrew Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party - appellant,: EQUALITY CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Stephen Victor Bomse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party - appellant,: NO ON PROPOSITION 8, CAMPAIGN FOR MARRIAGE EQUALITY, A PROJECT OF THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Stephen Victor Bomse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party,: CALIFORNIANS AGAINST ELIMINATING BASIC RIGHTS
Represented By: James Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]