Kristin Perry, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee,: KRISTIN M. PERRY, SANDRA B. STIER, PAUL T. KATAMI and JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Intervenor-Plaintiff - Appellee,: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Defendant,: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California, EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Attorney General of California, MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health & State Registrar of Vital Statistics, LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of Health Information & Strategic Planning for the California Department of Public Health, PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda and DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk for the County of Los Angeles
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellant,: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH, GAIL J. KNIGHT, MARTIN F. GUTIERREZ, MARK A. JANSSON, PROTECTMARRIAGE.COM - YES ON 8, A PROJECT OF CALIFORNIA RENEWAL, as official proponents of Proposition 8 and HAK-SHING WILLIAM TAM
 
Case Number: 10-16696
Filed: August 5, 2010
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 427 Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 07/30/2012. Supreme Court Number 12-144. [8278202] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RR)
June 11, 2012 426 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry is in cases 12-15388 and 12-15409. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by National Organization for Marriage. Date of service: 06/11/2012. [8209619] [10-16696, 11-16577] (WCD)
June 5, 2012 425 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) (Dissent by Judge O'Scannlain, Concurrence by Judge Reinhardt) A majority of the panel has voted to deny the petition for rehearing en banc. Judge N.R. Smith would grant the petition. The full court was advised of the petition for rehearing en banc. A judge requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. The matter failed to receive a majority of the votes of the non-recused active judges in favor of en banc consideration. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for rehearing en banc is DENIED. The mandate is stayed for ninety days pending the filing of a petition for writ of certiorari in the Supreme Court. If such a petition is filed, the stay shall continue until final disposition by the Supreme Court. [8202067] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RP)
June 4, 2012 424 NOTICE: An order regarding the petition for rehearing en banc will be filed Tuesday, June 5, 2012, at approximately 10:00 a.m. [8201363] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RP)
March 15, 2012 423 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [419] filed by Love Honor Cherish. (Sent to panel) [8105199] [10-16696, 11-16577] (SD)
March 9, 2012 422 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [415] filed by Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund in 10-16696. (Sent to panel) [8098022] [10-16696, 11-16577] (SD)
March 9, 2012 421 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [419] submitted by Love Honor Cherish on 3/9/2012 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8097483] [10-16696, 11-16577] (LC)
March 9, 2012 420 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Love Honor Cherish [8097481] [10-16696, 11-16577] (LC)
March 9, 2012 419 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Love Honor Cherish. Date of service: 03/09/2012. [8097304] [10-16696, 11-16577] (LFA)
March 6, 2012 418 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [415] submitted by Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund 3/5/2012 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8091876] [10-16696, 11-16577] (LC)
March 6, 2012 417 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund. [8091858] [10-16696, 11-16577] (LC)
March 6, 2012 416 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) The City and County of San Francisco’s motion for leave to file a corrected response to the petition for rehearing en banc is granted. The clerk is directed to circulate the corrected response. [8091425] [10-16696, 11-16577] (KKW)
March 5, 2012 415 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund. Date of service: 03/05/2012. [8091247] (LJJ)
March 5, 2012 414 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 10-16696, 11-16577 Motion for miscellaneous relief [CCSF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC]. Date of service: 03/05/2012. [8089621] [10-16696, 11-16577] (CV)
March 2, 2012 413 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 10-16696, 11-16577 Correspondence: Notice of Errata Correcting Table Of Contents Numbers And Adding Citation To Diaz V. Brewer At P. 15 to Response to CCSF's Petition for Rehearing En Banc. Date of service: 03/02/2012 [8088787] [10-16696, 11-16577] (CV)
March 2, 2012 412 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 10-16696, 11-16577 response to Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing) ,Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing) for rehearing by en banc only (all active, any interested senior judges). Date of service: 03/02/2012. [8088699]. [10-16696, 11-16577] (CV)
March 1, 2012 411 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 10-16696, 11-16577 response to Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing) ,Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing) for rehearing by en banc only (all active, any interested senior judges). Date of service: 03/01/2012. [8086855]. [10-16696, 11-16577] (CV)
March 1, 2012 410 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo in 11-16577 response to Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing) ,Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing) for rehearing by en banc only (all active, any interested senior judges). Date of service: 03/01/2012. [8086429]. [10-16696, 11-16577] (TO)
February 22, 2012 409 Terminated Intervenor - Pending Chuck Storey in 10-16696 and Intervenor - Pending Chuck Storey in 11-16577 [8077724] [10-16696, 11-16577] (LC)
February 22, 2012 408 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) Appellees shall file a response to Appellants’ petition for rehearing en banc. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4200 words and shall be filed within 21 days of the date of this order. Parties who are registered for ECF must file the response electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties who are not registered ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies.. [8077700] [10-16696, 11-16577] (KKW)
February 22, 2012 407 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) Appellants’ unopposed motion to file an oversize petition for rehearing en banc is granted. The clerk is directed to file and circulate Appellants’ petition for rehearing en banc.l [8077681] [10-16696, 11-16577] (KKW)
February 22, 2012 406 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) We deny as untimely the motion of Chuck Storey, County Clerk of Imperial County, to intervene as a Defendant-Appellant in these appeals. As a result, Storey is not entitled to petition for rehearing. See Day v. Apoliona, 505 F.3d 963, 964 (9th Cir. 2007) (“Under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 35(b), only a party to a matter before this court may petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.”). We therefore dismiss his petition for rehearing en banc. [8077667] [10-16696, 11-16577] (KKW)
February 21, 2012 405 Filed (ECF) Intervenor - Pending Chuck Storey in 11-16577 petition for rehearing en banc (from 02/07/2012 opinion). Date of service: 02/21/2012. [8076413] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RHT)
February 21, 2012 404 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 120.60 USD. Date of service: 02/21/2012 [8076407] (CV)
February 21, 2012 403 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending Chuck Storey [8075900] [10-16696, 11-16577] (LC)
February 21, 2012 402 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal in 11-16577 petition for rehearing en banc (from 02/07/2012 opinion). Date of service: 02/21/2012. [8075746] [10-16696, 11-16577] --[COURT UPDATE: Per counsel, amended document description for memorandum to reflect the correct date. Resent NDA. 02/21/2012 by DB] (CJC)
February 21, 2012 401 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal in 10-16696 Unopposed Motion to file oversized petition for rehearing and/or petition for rehearing en banc of 52 pages. Date of service: 02/07/2012. [8075722] [10-16696, 11-16577] (CJC)
February 21, 2012 400 Filed (ECF) Chuck Storey Motion to intervene. Date of service: 02/21/2012. [8075660] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RHT)
February 8, 2012 399 COURT DELETED ENTRY per Clerk of the Court. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Received letter from Robert Allgeyer dated 02/07/2012 re: decision. [8062475] [10-16696, 11-16577] (LC)
February 7, 2012 398 Featured Case FILED OPINION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) AFFIRMED. Judge: SR Authoring, Judge: NRS Concurring & dissenting FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8059031] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RP)
December 22, 2011 397 Received notice regarding certified copy of the opinion filed on 11/17/11. [8011866] [10-16696, 11-16577] (MT)
December 14, 2011 396 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco Correspondence: Request that the Court provide the parties advance notice when the decision of the appeal is forthcoming.. Date of service: 12/14/2011 [8001121] --[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to case number 11-16577. Resent NDA. 12/15/2011 by DB] (CV)
December 6, 2011 395 Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental brief [388] filed by City and County of San Francisco.(Sent to panel) [7990707] [10-16696, 11-16577] (SD)
December 6, 2011 394 Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental brief [387] filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, et al. (Sent to panel) [7989370] [10-16696, 11-16577] (SD)
December 5, 2011 393 Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental brief [389] filed by Paul T. Katami, et al. (Sent to panel) [7989351] [10-16696, 11-16577] (SD)
December 5, 2011 392 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [389] submitted by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a tan cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7987562] (WP)
December 5, 2011 391 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [388] submitted by City and County of San Francisco is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a tan cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7987556] (WP)
December 5, 2011 390 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [387] submitted by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a tan cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7987430] (WP)
December 2, 2011 389 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Date of service: 12/02/2011. [7987189] (TO)
December 2, 2011 388 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review. Submitted by Appellee City and County of San Francisco. Date of service: 12/02/2011. [7986988] (CV)
December 2, 2011 387 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Date of service: 12/02/2011. [7986765] (CJC)
November 23, 2011 384 Terminated Intervenor - Pending Media Coalition. [7977983] (HH)
November 22, 2011 383 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [7971189-2] filed by Defendants-Intervenors-Appellants. (Sent to panel) [7975917] [11-16577, 10-16696] (SD)
November 21, 2011 381 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) The motion to consolidate No. 10-16696 and No. 11-16577 is granted. [7974246] [10-16696, 11-16577] (SM)
November 21, 2011 380 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco reply to response (,motion to consolidate cases). Date of service: 11/18/2011. [7973726] (CV)
November 18, 2011 382 Received copy of Supreme Court Of California opinion dated 11/17/2011. [7975582] (RR)
November 18, 2011 379 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: Response to Court Request for Information. Date of service: 11/18/2011 [7971219] (CJC)
November 18, 2011 378 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Motion to consolidate cases 10-16696 11-16577. Date of service: 11/18/2011. [7971200] (CJC)
November 18, 2011 377 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) The parties are directed to submit supplemental briefs, no later than fourteen days from the date of this order, discussing the effect on this case of the California Supreme Court’s decision in Perry v. Brown, No. S189476, 2011 WL 5578873 (Cal. Nov. 17, 2011). The briefs shall not exceed twenty pages in length. No response or reply briefs will be permitted, and no motions for extension of time will be entertained. [7971159] (KKW)
November 3, 2011 376 Terminated Amicus Curiae - Pending Gage Raley in 10-16696 [7952847] (KKW)
November 3, 2011 375 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) Gage Raley’s motion to file an amicus curiae brief out of time is denied. [7952837] (KKW)
November 3, 2011 374 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: re motion to file untimely amicus brief. Date of service: 11/03/2011 [7952575] (TO)
November 1, 2011 373 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Gage Raley. [7950348] (LA)
November 1, 2011 372 COURT ENTERED FILING: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a) and filed Motion to file a late brief, Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Gage Raley. Date of service: 11/01/2011. [7950290] (DB)
September 14, 2011 371 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/14/2011. [7893451] (CJC)
September 9, 2011 370 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/09/2011. [7887931] (TO)
September 2, 2011 369 Received notice regarding Notice from supreme court of california; oral argument calendar. [7884023] (MT)
September 1, 2011 368 Terminated Jesse Panuccio for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Gail J. Knight, Mark A. Jansson, Dennis Hollingsworth and Martin F. Gutierrez in 10-16696 [7878809] (MT)
August 31, 2011 367 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel re Jesse M. Panuccio. Date of service: 08/31/2011 [7877730] (CJC)
August 11, 2011 366 Received notice regarding order from supreme court of california. [7856976] [7856976] (MT)
August 1, 2011 365 Received notice regarding From Supreme Court of California, notice of oral argument calendar. [7841293] (MT)
July 27, 2011 364 Received notice regarding from The Supreme Court of California; regarding the request for judicial notice filed by the City and County of San Francisco, is granted.. [7837027] (MT)
July 18, 2011 363 Terminated Sarah E. Piepmeier for Jeffrey J. Zarrillo, Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry and Paul T. Katami in 10-16696 [7824168] (EL)
July 18, 2011 362 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel re Sarah E. Piepmeier, Esq. Date of service: 07/18/2011 [7824156] (TO)
July 14, 2011 361 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Courtesy copy of correspondence to the California Supreme Court.. Date of service: 07/14/2011 [7820146] (JMG)
June 17, 2011 360 Received Supreme Court of California order dated 06/15/2011. [7790123] (LC)
May 13, 2011 359 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco Correspondence: Letter to court attaching courtesy amici briefs. Date of service: 05/13/2011 [7752316] --[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of letter at the request of counsel (to correct signature). Resent NDA. 05/13/2011 by DB] (MML)
May 12, 2011 358 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tamar Pachter for - Kamala D. Harris. Date of service: 05/12/2011. [7750324] (TP)
May 9, 2011 357 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Courtesy copy of Plaintiffs-Respondents’ Reply to Amicus Curiae Briefs. Date of service: 05/09/2011 [7745748] (EAM)
May 9, 2011 356 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: Courtesy Copy of Defendant-Intervenors and Appellants' Reply to Amicus Briefs filed in the Supreme Court of California, Case No. S189476. Date of service: 05/09/2011 [7745459] (CJC)
May 9, 2011 355 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco Correspondence: Courtesy Copy of Reply to Amicus Briefs. Date of service: 05/09/2011 [7744700] (MML)
May 4, 2011 354 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Jon. B. Eisenberg Correspondence: Courtesy Copy of [Proposed] Amici Curiae Brief of Jon B. Eisenberg and Laurie L. Levenson, submitted to the California Supreme Court. Date of service: 05/04/2011 [7739748] (LWB)
May 3, 2011 353 Filed (ECF) - Equality California Correspondence: Letter to Court regarding courtesy copy of California Supreme Court Amicus Curiae Brief; Application to File Amicus Curiae Brief; and Amicus Curiae Brief. Date of service: 05/03/2011 [7738569] (DCC)
May 3, 2011 352 Filed (ECF) - Kamala D. Harris Correspondence: Courtesy Copy of Attorney General's Amicus Brief to California Supreme Court. Date of service: 05/03/2011 [7738243] (TP)
May 2, 2011 351 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence Correspondence: Letter re courtesy copy of amicus curiae brief filed in the California Supreme Court. Date of service: 05/02/2011 [7737197] (JCE)
May 2, 2011 350 Filed (ECF) Amici Curiae CALIFORNIA FAITH FOR EQUALITY, California Council of Churches, GENERAL SYNOD OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST, PACIFIC ASSOCIATION OF REFORM RABBIS, Progressive Jewish Alliance, THE EPISCOPAL BISHOPS OF CALIFORNIA AND LOS ANGELES, UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST ASSOCIATION, UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST LEGISLATIVE MINISTRY CALIFORNIA and UNIVERSAL FELLOWSHIP OF METROPOLITAN COMMUNITY CHURCHES Correspondence: Letter re courtesy copy of amicus curiae brief filed in the California Supreme Court. Date of service: 05/02/2011 [7737133] (EAI)
April 28, 2011 349 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) The order of April 27, 2011 (Doc. No. 348) is amended to include <and the City and County of San Francisco’s opposition to Appellants’ motion (Doc. No. 341)> at page 3, at the end of the list of the other documents transferred to the district court for consideration. The clerk shall transfer San Francisco’s filing along with the other documents ordered transferred. [7732781] (KKW)
April 27, 2011 348 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH)Appellants have moved this court to order the Plaintiffs and former District Judge Vaughn Walker to return copies of the video recordings of the trial proceedings in this case. Plaintiffs oppose the motion and have moved to unseal the video recordings. We construe Appellants’ motion as a motion to enforce, against Plaintiffs and Judge Walker, the protective order entered by the district court, see Doc. No. 425 (at ¶ 7.3) & Doc. No. 672, Perry v. Schwarzengger, No. 3:09-cv-02292 (N.D. Cal.), and Plaintiffs’ cross-motion as a motion to lift that order. Although jurisdiction over the merits of the decision below, including the judgment, has passed to this court, the district court has not been divested of its jurisdiction over ancillary matters, such as protective orders. Cf. Griggs v. Provident Consumer Discount Co., 459 U.S. 56, 58 (1982) (per curiam) (“The filing of a notice of appeal is an event of jurisdictional significance – it confers jurisdiction on the court of appeals and divests the district court of its control over those aspects of the case involved in the appeal.”) (emphasis added); see, e.g., Campbell v. Blodgett, 982 F.2d 1356, 1357 (9th Cir. 1993) (district court retains jurisdiction to issue discovery order); Masalosalo v. Stonewall Ins. Co., 718 F.2d 955, 957 (9th Cir. 1983) (district court retains jurisdiction to consider motion for attorney’s fees). Because the district court issued the protective order and has the power to grant the parties all the relief they seek, should relief be warranted, we direct the Clerk to TRANSFER Appellants’ motion (Doc. No. 338), Plaintiffs’ opposition and cross-motion (Doc. No. 340), Appellants’ reply and opposition (Doc. No. 346), Plaintiffs’ reply (Doc. No. 347), Judge Walker’s letter (Doc. No. 339), and Media Coalition’s motion to intervene (Doc. No. 343) and joinder in Plaintiffs’ motion to unseal (Doc. No. 345), to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California, Case No. 3:09-cv-02292-JW. IT IS SO ORDERED. [7732263]--[Sent notice to Judge Ware on 04/28/2011 by ASW] (KKW)
April 25, 2011 347 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo reply to response (,motion to unseal document). Date of service: 04/25/2011. [7729225] (TO)
April 21, 2011 346 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal reply to response (,motion to unseal document, ). Date of service: 04/21/2011. [7725018] (CJC)
April 18, 2011 345 Filed (ECF) Intervenor - Pending Media Coalition Correspondence: Joinder of Non-Party Media Coalition in Plaintiffs-Appellees' Motion to Unseal. Date of service: 04/18/2011 [7720990] (TRB)
April 18, 2011 344 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending Media Coalition. [7720960] (MT)
April 18, 2011 343 Filed (ECF) Non-Party Media Coalition Motion to intervene. Date of service: 04/18/2011. [7720927] (TRB)
April 18, 2011 342 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: Reply Brief of Defendant-Intervenors and Appellants in the California Supreme Court, Case No. S189476. Date of service: 04/18/2011 [7720549] (CJC)
April 15, 2011 341 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco response opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 04/15/2011. [7719511] (CV)
April 15, 2011 340 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Motion to unseal document Trial Video and Response opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 04/15/2011. [7718979] (TO)
April 14, 2011 339 Received letter from Vaughn R. Walker dated 04/14/2011 re: Appellants' Motion for Order Compelling Return of Trial Recordings. [7717896] (SS)
April 13, 2011 338 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Motion for miscellaneous relief [For Order Compelling Return of Trial Recordings]. Date of service: 04/13/2011. [7715321] (CJC)
April 6, 2011 337 Received notice regarding courtesy copy of order filed in supreme court of california for the relief from default filed on 4/5/11 is granted.. [7709025]. [7709025] (MT)
April 5, 2011 336 Received notice regarding copy of order filed in supreme court of california. [7707503] (MT)
April 4, 2011 335 Recevied (ECF) courtesy copy of Answer Brief by Appellee City and County of San Francisco to California Supreme Court . Date of service: 04/04/2011. [7704443]--[COURT edited docket text to reflect filing - 04/05/2011 by SS] (CV)
April 4, 2011 334 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Plaintiffs' Answering Brief (Supreme Court of California, Case No. S189476). Date of service: 04/04/2011 [7704428] (EAM)
April 4, 2011 333 Terminated Jennifer Pizer for NCLR, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., GAY AND LESBIAN ADVOCATES AND DEFENDERS and ACLU FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA in 10-16696 [7702737] (CW)
April 1, 2011 332 Filed (ECF) Amici Curiae ACLU FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, Equality California, GAY AND LESBIAN ADVOCATES AND DEFENDERS, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. and NCLR Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Date of service: 04/01/2011 [7702615] (JP)
March 31, 2011 331 Received notice regarding courtesy copy of motion filed in supreme court of california. [7700903] (MT)
March 31, 2011 330 Received notice regarding courtesy copy of order from supreme court of california. [7700809] (MT)
March 23, 2011 329 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) Having considered all of the factors set forth in Nken v. Holder, 129 S. Ct. 1749, 1756 (2009), and all of the facts and circumstances surrounding Plaintiffs’ motion to vacate the stay pending appeal, as well as the standard for vacatur set forth in Southeast Alaska Conservation Council v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, 472 F.3d 1097, 1101 (9th Cir. 2006), we deny Plaintiffs’ motion at this time. [7691622] (KKW)
March 17, 2011 326 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo reply to response (). Date of service: 03/17/2011. [7685573] (TO)
March 15, 2011 328 Filed original and 7 copies of Gary William Hallford amicus brief of 6 pages. Served on 03/12/2011. [7687362] (GLS)
March 15, 2011 325 Mail returned on 03/14/2011 addressed to Michael F. Moses, Esquire for United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al, re: 3-2-11 order. Resending to: same address just to a different zip code: 20017-1194. [7681044] (MT)
March 15, 2011 324 Mail returned on 03/14/2011 addressed to Anthony R. Picarello, Jr., Esquire for United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al, re: 3-2-11 order. Resending to: same address, just changed the zip code to: 20017-1194. [7681034] (MT)
March 14, 2011 327 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Gary William Hallford in pro se. [7687345] (GLS)
March 14, 2011 322 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: Defendant-Intervenors-Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix to Opening Brief filed in the California Supreme Court, No. S189476.. Date of service: 03/14/2011 [7679814] (CJC)
March 14, 2011 321 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco reply to response (). Date of service: 03/14/2011. [7678933] (VC)
March 11, 2011 323 Received notice regarding from supreme court of california, application for admission pro hac vice to appear on behald of Dennis Hollingworth, Gail J. Knight, Martin F. Guitierrez, Mark A. Jansson, and ProtectMarriage.com is hereby granted.. [7680443] (MT)
March 7, 2011 320 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal response opposing motion (,motion to lift stay). Date of service: 03/07/2011. [7671343] (CJC)
March 2, 2011 319 Received notice regarding copy of order from supreme court of california. [7669463] (MT)
March 2, 2011 318 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending CALIFORNIA FAITH FOR EQUALITY. [7666009] (MT)
March 2, 2011 317 Filed (ECF) Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 03/02/2011. [7666000] (EAI)
March 2, 2011 316 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [312] submitted by Equality California, et al. is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7665924] (GLS)
March 2, 2011 315 Entered appearance of - Equality California, et al. [7665922] (GLS)
March 2, 2011 314 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Courtesy Copy Of California Supreme Court Order. Date of service: 03/02/2011 [7665710] (EAM)
March 1, 2011 313 COURT DOCKET UPDATE: Party substitution of new officials: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Governor of California; and KAMALA D. HARRIS, in her official capacity as Attorney General of California. [7664703] (RY)
March 1, 2011 312 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Equality California, et al.. Date of service: 03/01/2011. [7664627] (SPM)
March 1, 2011 311 Filed (ECF) - Edmund G. Brown, Jr. response supporting motion (, ,motion to lift stay). Date of service: 03/01/2011. [7664447] (TP)
March 1, 2011 310 Filed (ECF) - Arnold Schwarzeneggar response supporting motion (, ,motion to lift stay). Date of service: 03/01/2011. [7664010] (TP)
February 25, 2011 308 Received Appellee City and County of San Francisco letter dated 02/23/2011 re: appreciation of the process concerning prop 8. [7663622] (MT)
February 24, 2011 309 Received notice from Supreme Court of California regarding request for relief from default is denied as moot w/out prejudice to seeking permission to file an amicus curiae brief in the future pursuant to the schedule set forth in this court's order filed 2/16/11. [7663647] (MT)
February 24, 2011 307 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco response joining motion (,motion to lift stay). Date of service: 02/24/2011. [7659531] (CV)
February 23, 2011 303 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Motion to lift stay. Date of service: 02/23/2011. [7656998] (TO)
February 18, 2011 305 Received copy from supreme court of california notice regarding application to shorten time. [7657394] (MT)
February 18, 2011 304 Received letter dated 02/16/2011 re: supreme courts order granting the request for certification. [7657327] (MT)
February 17, 2011 306 Received notice regarding from supreme court of california, the request that the court decide a question of california law presented in a matter pending in the 9th circuit court of appeals is granted. [7657610] (MT)
February 9, 2011 302 Received Amicus Curiae Margie Reilly letter dated 02/06/2011 re: certification request pending. [7650484] (MT)
February 7, 2011 300 Received Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal letter dated 02/04/2011 re: letter in response to the letters submitted by Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenor City and County of San Francisco. [7640419] (MT)
February 3, 2011 301 Received Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo letter dated 02/02/2011 re: courtesy copy of letter to supreme court regarding certification. [7642122] (MT)
January 25, 2011 299 Received Attorney Theodore Olson for Appellees Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Paul T. Katami and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo letter dated 01/24/2011 re: letter in opposition to the rquest of the USCA that this Court answer a Certified Question. Served on 01/24/2011. (panel) [7624346] (EL)
January 24, 2011 298 Received from Appellants Dennis Hollingsworth, Gail J. Knight, Martin F. Gutierrez, Mark A. Jansson and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal letter dated 01/21/2011 re: letter in support of the USCA's 1/4/11 order certifiying a question to the Supreme Ct of CA. Served on 01/21/2011 [7624058] (panel) (EL)
January 24, 2011 297 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco Correspondence: Letter to Supreme Court re Certification request pending from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 10-16696. Date of service: 01/24/2011 [7622918] (CV)
January 4, 2011 296 Order Certifying Question and all supporting documents were hand delivered to the California State Supreme Court - 350 McAlister, SF (see order for list of documents included in filing) [7599903] (RP)
January 4, 2011 295 Filed MEMORANDUM REGARDING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY for PUBLICATION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT) Shortly before the hearing of this appeal, the defendants-intervenorsappellants (“Proponents”) requested that I recuse myself under 28 U.S.C. § 455(a) and § 455(b)(5)(iii). Under § 455(a), I must recuse myself if “a reasonable person with knowledge of all the facts would conclude that [my] impartiality might reasonably be questioned.” United States v. Nelson, 718 F.2d 315, 321 (9th Cir. 1983). Under § 455(b)(5)(iii), my recusal is required if my wife has an “interest” that could be “substantially affected” by the outcome of this proceeding. I denied Proponents’ motion with a brief statement and promised a further explanation in due course.1 Now that our panel has completed the immediately pressing matters regarding the appeal, I provide my further reasons. (see order for full text) is, indeed, important that judges be and appear to be impartial. It is also important, however, that judges not recuse themselves unless required to do so, or it would be too easy for those who seek judges favorable to their case to disqualify those that they perceive to be unsympathetic merely by publicly questioning their impartiality. See H.R. Rep. No. 93-1453 (1974) (providing legislative history of federal recusal statute) (“At the same time, in assessing the reasonableness of a challenge to his impartiality, each judge must be alert to avoid the possibility that those who would question his impartiality are in fact seeking to avoid the consequences of his expected adverse decision.”). Were I to be recused because of the facts Proponents cite, it would not be merely from serving on the present panel but from voting on whether to rehear the case en banc and taking part in any en banc proceedings held by this court. My wife has no tangible interest in this case’s outcome, and I do not believe that my impartiality in this case can reasonably be questioned on the basis of either her public statements or the ACLU/SC’s involvement in any judicial proceedings. For these reasons, I deny Proponents’ motion. [7599026] (RP)
January 4, 2011 294 Filed CONCURRENCE TO THE CERTIFICATION ORDER AND PER CURIAM OPINION for PUBLICATION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT) (See order for full text) [7599002] [10-16696, 10-16751] (RP)
January 4, 2011 293 Filed Memorandum Re: Additional Counsel (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) Per California Rule of Court 8.548(b)(1), the names and addresses of counsel for the parties, intervenors, and amici curiae are listed on the following pages: (see document for full text) [7598941] (RP)
January 4, 2011 292 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) for certification to California State Supreme Court. Before this panel of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit is an appeal concerning the constitutionality under the United States Constitution of Article I, § 7.5 of the California Constitution (“Proposition 8”). Because we cannot consider this important constitutional question unless the appellants before us have standing to raise it, and in light of Arizonans for Official English v. Arizona, 520 U.S. 43 (1997) (“Arizonans”), it is critical that we be advised of the rights under California law of the official proponents of an initiative measure to defend the constitutionality of that measure upon its adoption by the People when the state officers charged with the laws’ enforcement, including the Attorney General, refuse to provide such a defense or appeal a judgment declaring the measure unconstitutional. As we are aware of no controlling state precedent on this precise question, we respectfully ask the Supreme Court of California to exercise its discretion to accept and decide the certified question below. (See order for full text) The Clerk is hereby directed to transmit forthwith to the Court the original and ten copies of this order and accompanying memorandum, as well as a certificate of service on the parties. Cal. R. Ct. 8.548(d). The clerk shall also transmit the following along with this request: ten copies of the district court Findings of Fact / Conclusions of Law / Order (704 F. Supp. 2d. 921 (N.D. Cal. 2010)); ten copies of the Permanent Injunction issued by the district court (docket entry 728 in No. C 09-2292-VRW (N.D. Cal. Aug. 12, 2010)); a copy of the video recording of the oral argument heard in these appeals on December 6, 2010; the briefs of the parties and intervenors in this appeal; and the briefs amicus curiae filed by (1) the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and (2) Equality California in No. 10-16696. The Clerk shall provide additional record materials if so requested by the Supreme Court of California. Cal. R. Ct. 8.548(c). The case is withdrawn from submission, and further proceedings in this court are stayed pending final action by the Supreme Court of California. The parties shall notify the Clerk of this Court within three days after the Court accepts or rejects certification, and again within three days if the Court renders an opinion. The panel retains jurisdiction over further proceedings. IT IS SO ORDERED. [7598921] (RP)
December 28, 2010 291 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/28/2010. [7594414] (CV)
December 22, 2010 290 Received original and 6 copies of Amicus Curiae - Pending John Doe pro se amicus brief in 6 pages. Served on 12/22/2010. Major deficiencies: untimely, insufficient brief copies. Unable to notify prospective amicus of deficiencies because no acceptable or usable contact information provided. (To Panel) [7591455] (LA)
December 22, 2010 289 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending John Doe (no contact information provided). [7591453] (LA)
December 7, 2010 288 Attorney M. Edward Whelan III in 10-16696 substituted by Attorney Martin Edward Whelan III in 10-16696--Court had duplicate records for attorney. [7569932] (RY)
December 6, 2010 287 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH. [7568509] (CB)
December 3, 2010 286 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): PBS-Newshour applied to videotape for later broadcast and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. PBS-Newshour’s request to videotape for later broadcast and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7567118] (PA)
December 2, 2010 285 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) Plaintiffs-appellees and plaintiff-intervenor-appellee’s time within the second hour of oral argument is hereby reallocated pursuant to their jointly submitted letter of December 1, 2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. [7565125] [10-16696, 10-16751] (WL)
December 2, 2010 284 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT) I have before me defendants-intervenors-appellants’ motion to disqualify myself from this appeal. I have not hesitated to recuse from cases in the past when doing so was warranted by the circumstances. See Khatib v. County of Orange, 622 F.3d 1074, 1074 (9th Cir. 2010); Mohamed v. Jeppesen Dataplan, Inc., 586 F.3d 1108, 1109 (9th Cir. 2009); Buono v. Kempthorne, 527 F.3d 758, 760 (9th Cir. 2008); Sw. Voter Registration Educ. Project v. Shelley, 344 F.3d 913, 914 (9th Cir. 2003); Valeria v. Davis, 320 F.3d 1014, 1015 n.** (9th Cir. 2003); Alvarez-Machain v. United States, 284 F.3d 1039, 1039 n.1 (9th Cir. 2002); Coalition for Econ. Equity v. Wilson, 122 F.3d 692, 711 (9th Cir. 1997). Here, for reasons that I shall provide in a memorandum to be filed in due course, I am certain that “a reasonable person with knowledge of all the facts would [not] conclude that [my] impartiality might reasonably be questioned.” United States v. Nelson, 718 F.2d 315, 321 (9th Cir. 1983); see also Sao Paulo State of the Federated Republic of Brazil v. Am. Tobacco Co., 535 U.S. 229, 233 (2002) (per curiam). I will be able to rule impartially on this appeal, and I will do so. The motion is therefore DENIED. (Phoned Counsel 9:30 am) [7564262]--[Edited 12/02/2010 by BY] (BY)
December 1, 2010 283 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Plaintiffs-Appellees' and Plaintiff-Intervenor-Appellee's joint suggestion to reallocate time. Date of service: 12/01/2010 [7564235] (TO)
December 1, 2010 282 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Motion for miscellaneous relief [Appellants' Motion for Disqualification]. Date of service: 12/01/2010. [7564233] (CJC)
November 30, 2010 281 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera for the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Reuter’s is directed to contact Stephanie Mullen at smullen@ap.org concerning the Associated Press’ news media pooling guidelines. [7562525] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 30, 2010 280 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera for the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. . The Recorder is directed to contact Stephanie Mullen at smullen@ap.org concerning the Associated Press’ news media pooling guidelines. [7562521] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 30, 2010 279 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera for the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. . Rex Wockner (to include 25 LGRT Newspaper) is directed to contact Stephanie Mullen at smullen@ap.org concerning the Associated Press’ news media pooling guidelines. [7562508] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 30, 2010 278 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera for the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. . Critical Images, Inc., is directed to contact Stephanie Mullen at smullen@ap.org concerning the Associated Press’ news media pooling guidelines. [7562502] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 30, 2010 277 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KXTV-News10 applied to videotape for later broadcast and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KXTV-NEWS10’s request to videotape for later broadcast and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7562213] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 276 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): ....... . Non-Party Media Coalition’s request to televise live, video for later broadcast, radio broadcast live, audio-record for later broadcast and Webcast live is GRANTED. The Non-Party Media Coalition’s request to photograph with still camera is GRANTED. The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera. (See Order for full text)[7560738] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 275 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):CBS-5 (KPIX TV) applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. CBS-5’s request to videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7560637] (PA)
November 29, 2010 274 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KGO Radio applied to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KGO-Radio’s request to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7560572] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 273 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):CBS Network News (including CBS Evening News, The Early Show, Sunday Morning and CBS Newspath) applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. CBS Network News’ (including CBS Evening News, The Early Show, Sunday Morning and CBS Newspath) request is GRANTED. [7559990] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 272 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KCBS Radio applied to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KCBS-Radio’s request to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7559610] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 271 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):ABC News applied to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast, the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. ABC News’ request to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7559596] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 270 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): ABC News applied to televise live and videotaped for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. ABC News’ request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7559576] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 269 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):KTVU- Channel 2 News applied to televise live the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KTVU-Channel 2 News’ request to televise live is GRANTED. [7559504] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 26, 2010 268 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:KKW): For purposes of clarification, these appeals are consolidated for oral argument. Treating plaintiffs’ counsel’s letter of November 17, 2010, as a motion to reconsider this Court’s Order of November 15, 2010, the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The argument shall remain divided into two hour-long sessions as provided in this Court’s previously issued Order, and the allocation of time within the first hour remains the same. Time within the second hour, concerning the merits, is reallocated as follows: 30 minutes for the Proponents, 20 minutes for the Perry plaintiffs-appellees, and 10 minutes for the plaintiff-intervenor-appellee City and County of San Francisco. Until December 1, 2010, however, the Court will entertain any suggestion submitted jointly by counsel on plaintiffs’ side to reallocate the time between plaintiffs-appellees and plaintiff-intervenor-appellee, and similarly, any jointly submitted request relating to the time allocated to defendants-intervenors-appellants and movants-appellants. [7558727] [10-16696, 10-16751] (KKW)
November 24, 2010 267 Added attorney Richard B. Rosenthal for The American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers (Northern California Chapter) Justice Donald B. King, (Ret.), in case 10-16696. [7557462] (MT)
November 23, 2010 265 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KRON TV- Channel 4 News applied to televise live the case captioned above, scheduld to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KRON TV-Channel 4 News’ request to televise live is GRANTED. [7555471] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 19, 2010 264 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):KQED applied to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KQED’s request to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7551906] (PA)
November 19, 2010 263 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): The California Channel applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. The California Channel's request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7551850] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 18, 2010 266 Filed appearance notice of. Richard B. Rosenthal for amicus curiae Justice Donald B. King and The American Academy of Matriomonial Lawyers. Served on. [7555671] (MT)
November 17, 2010 262 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Plaintiffs-Appellees' objection to the allocation of time. Date of service: 11/17/2010 [7549484] (TO)
November 17, 2010 261 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):KGO-TV applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KGO- TV's request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED.[7549438] (PA)
November 17, 2010 260 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA)C-SPAN applied to televise live the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. C-SPAN's request to televise live is GRANTED. A maximum of two (2) video cameras will be permitted in the courtroom. C-SPAN will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application.[7549282] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 15, 2010 258 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:KKW): The Court orders that oral argument in these appeals be conducted in the following manner: The argument shall be divided into two hour-long sessions, with a brief recess in between. In the first hour, the parties shall address each appellant’s standing and any other procedural matters that may properly be raised. In the second hour, the parties shall address the constitutionality of Proposition 8. During the first hour, the Hollingsworth defendants-intervenors-appellants (“Proponents”) shall first have 15 minutes, and the Imperial County movants-appellants shall next have 15 minutes in which to present their opening arguments regarding standing and other procedural issues. The Perry plaintiffs-appellees shall then have 30 minutes in which to respond. Any time reserved by either appellant may be used for rebuttal, but only one rebuttal argument may be made and that by either appellant. During the second hour, the Proponents shall first have 30 minutes to present their opening argument on the merits of the constitutional question. The Perry plaintiffs-appellees shall then have 15 minutes, and the plaintiff-intervenor-appellee City and County of San Francisco shall have the next 15 minutes, in which to respond. Any time reserved by the Proponents may be used for rebuttal. No later than November 24, 2010, the parties shall advise the Court of any objection they have to the allocation of time within each hour or of any reallocation of time within each hour that they wish to propose, by electronically filing letters with the Clerk of the Court. If any party wishes to give its full allotted time within either hour to an amicus curiae, it may request that the Court reallocate that time accordingly. Otherwise, no motions for leave to participate in oral argument by amici curiae will be entertained.. [7545517] (KKW)
November 12, 2010 259 Received Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal letter dated 11/09/2010 re: asking for an additional 5 minutes. [7547596] (MT)
November 12, 2010 257 Terminated Louis P. Feuchtbaum for AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, CALIFORNIA in 10-16696 [7543745] (MT)
November 12, 2010 256 Added attorney Louis P. Feuchtbaum for The American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers (Northern California Chapter), in case 10-16696. [7543741] (MT)
November 12, 2010 255 Added attorney Louis P. Feuchtbaum for AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, CALIFORNIA Justice Donald B. King, (Ret.), in case 10-16696. [7543564] (MT)
November 11, 2010 253 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Louis P. Feuchtbaum for Amici Curiae Justice Donald B. King, (Ret.), Justice Donald B. King, (Ret.) and The American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers (Northern California Chapter). Date of service: 11/11/2010. [7543114] (LPF)
November 10, 2010 254 Received Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal letter dated 11/09/2010 re: time for oral argument. [7543525] (MT)
November 3, 2010 252 Received notice regarding service of letter of joinder to amicus brief on the interested parties in said action. [7536093] (MT)
November 3, 2010 251 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [152] filed by Bay Area Lawyers For Individual Freedom. (Sent to panel) [7534060] (SD)
November 3, 2010 250 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [243] filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Sent to panel) [7533584] (SD)
November 2, 2010 249 Filed Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume (including a portion on CD) (PANEL). [7533037] (GLS)
November 2, 2010 248 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [243] submitted by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal is filed. [7531603] (GLS)
November 2, 2010 247 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:KKW): Defendant-Intervenors-Appellants’ motion for leave to exceed the type-volume limitations is GRANTED. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7531505] (KKW)
November 2, 2010 245 Filed clerk order: The order filed November 2, 2010 is vacated as issue in error. The motion to file the oversized reply brief is referred to the panel for disposition. (Deputy Clerk:GLS): [7530903] (GLS)
November 2, 2010 244 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [243] submitted by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7530766] (GLS)
November 1, 2010 243 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Date of service: 11/01/2010. [7530588] (CJC)
November 1, 2010 242 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 11/01/2010. [7530587] (CJC)
November 1, 2010 241 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [183] filed by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc..(Sent to panel) [7529917] (SD)
October 29, 2010 246 Received notice of change of address dated 10/28/2010 from James F. Sweeney, Esquire for United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. Current new address: SWEENEY & GREENE LLP, 981 E. Stockton Boulevard, Suite 218, Elk Grove, Ca, 95624. [7531243] (KS)
October 29, 2010 240 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [188] filed by Constitutional Law and Civil Procedure Professors Erwin Chemerinsky et al.. (Sent to panel) [7529903] (SD)
October 29, 2010 239 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [200] filed by Equality California. (Sent to panel) [7527965] (SD)
October 28, 2010 238 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [196] filed by The Southern Poverty Law Center. (Sent to panel) [7526411] (SD)
October 28, 2010 237 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [198] filed by CALIFORNIA FAITH FOR EQUALITY et al. (Sent to panel) [7526396] (SD)
October 28, 2010 236 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [151] filed by Constitutional Accountability Center. (Sent to panel) [7526386] (SD)
October 28, 2010 235 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [197] filed by ACLU FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, GAY AND LESBIAN ADVOCATES AND DEFENDERS, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. and National Center for Lesbian Rights.(Sent to panel) [7526344] (SD)
October 28, 2010 234 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [166] filed by Jon. B. Eisenberg.(Sent to panel) [7526319] (SD)
October 28, 2010 233 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [187] filed by Bruce A. Ackerman, Rebecca L. Brown, William N. Eskridge, Jr., Daniel A. Farber, Kenneth L. Karst and Andrew Koppelman. (Sent to panel) [7526308] (SD)
October 27, 2010 232 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [181] filed by California Teachers Association. (Sent to panel) [7526286] (SD)
October 27, 2010 231 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [193] filed by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, CALIFORNIA, AMERICAN ANTHROPOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PSYCHOANALYTIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN SOCIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, CALIFORNIA CHAPTER and NASW. (Sent to panel) [7526276] (SD)
October 27, 2010 230 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [167] filed by California Professors of Family Law. (Sent to panel) [7524767] (SD)
October 27, 2010 229 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [172] filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State and Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic. (Sent to panel) [7524756] (SD)
October 27, 2010 228 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [158] filed by Legislators from United States Jurisdictions That Have Legalized Same-Sex Marriage. (Sent to panel) [7524744] (SD)
October 27, 2010 227 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [167] filed by California Professors of Family Law. (Sent to panel) [7524662] (SD)
October 27, 2010 226 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [182] filed by Anti-Defamation League. (Sent to panel) [7524649] (SD)
October 27, 2010 225 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [150] filed by Justice Donald B. King, (Ret.). and the American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers (Northern California Chapter). (Sent to panel) [7524629] (SD)
October 27, 2010 224 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [175] filed by National LGBT Bar Association. ( Sent to panel) [7524595] (SD)
October 26, 2010 223 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [145] filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Sent to panel) [7524156] (SD)
October 26, 2010 222 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [162] submitted by NATIONAL GAY AND LESBIAN TASK FORCE FOUNDATION, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7523542] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 221 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae NATIONAL GAY AND LESBIAN TASK FORCE FOUNDATION, et al.. [7523516] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 220 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [199] submitted by ASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7523469] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 219 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [196] submitted by The Southern Poverty Law Center is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7523455] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 218 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [188] submitted by Constitutional Law and Civil Procedure Professors Erwin Chemerinsky et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7523429] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 217 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:SS): All motions for leave to become amicus are dismissed as unnecessary. See Fed. R. App. P. 29(a); docket entries 16 & 17 (parties' consent to amicus briefs). The Clerk shall file the amicus briefs. [7523321] (HH)
October 26, 2010 216 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [150] submitted by Justice Donald B. King, (Ret.) and The American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers (Northern California Chapter) is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7523225] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 215 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [200] submitted by Equality California is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522944] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 214 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Equality California. [7522943] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 213 ENTRY UPDATED. Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae ASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER, et al.. [7522932] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 212 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [198] submitted by CALIFORNIA FAITH FOR EQUALITY, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522894] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 211 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae CALIFORNIA FAITH FOR EQUALITY, California Council of Churches, GENERAL SYNOD OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST, UNIVERSAL FELLOWSHIP OF METROPOLITAN COMMUNITY CHURCHES, THE EPISCOPAL BISHOPS OF CALIFORNIA AND LOS ANGELES, Progressive Jewish Alliance, PACIFIC ASSOCIATION OF REFORM RABBIS, UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST ASSOCIATION and UNITARIAN UNIVERSALIST LEGISLATIVE MINISTRY CALIFORNIA. [7522888] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 210 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [197] submitted by ACLU FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, GAY AND LESBIAN ADVOCATES AND DEFENDERS, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. and NCLR is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522858] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 209 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae ACLU FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, GAY AND LESBIAN ADVOCATES AND DEFENDERS, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. and NCLR. [7522855] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 208 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae The Southern Poverty Law Center. [7522842] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 207 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [193] submitted by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, CALIFORNIA, AMERICAN ANTHROPOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PSYCHOANALYTIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN SOCIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, CALIFORNIA CHAPTER and NASW is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522825] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 206 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae AMERICAN ANTHROPOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PSYCHOANALYTIC ASSOCIATION, NASW, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, CALIFORNIA CHAPTER, AMERICAN SOCIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION and AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, CALIFORNIA. [7522817] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 205 ENTRY UPDATED. Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Constitutional Law and Civil Procedure Professors Erwin Chemerinsky et al.. [7522660] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 204 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [187] submitted by Bruce A. Ackerman, Rebecca L. Brown, William N. Eskridge, Jr., Daniel A. Farber, Kenneth L. Karst and Andrew Koppelman is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522545] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 203 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae William N. Eskridge Jr., Rebecca L. Brown, Bruce A. Ackerman, Daniel A. Farber, Kenneth L. Karst and Andrew Koppelman. [7522504] (GLS)
October 26, 2010 202 COURT DELETED ENTRY: Reattached searchable documents to [162]. Original text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Susan M. Popik, Esq. Merri A. Baldwin, Esq. Chapman, Popik & White LLP Suzanne B. Goldberg Clinical Professor of Law and Director Sexuality & Gender Law Clinic Columbia Law School. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522263] (SMP)
October 26, 2010 201 Filed (ECF) Equality Federation et al. Motion to join in existing brief [152]. Date of service: 10/26/2010. [7522222]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text (relief) to reflect content of filing. 10/26/2010 by RY] (GB)
October 25, 2010 200 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Equality California. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522213] (DCC)
October 25, 2010 199 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Asian American Justice Center, et al.. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522185] (PO)
October 25, 2010 198 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Cal. Faith for Equality, Cal. Council of Churches, Gen’l Synod of the United Church of Christ, Metropolitan Community Churches, Episcopal Bishops of Cal. & Los Angeles, Prog. Jewish Alliance, Pac. Ass’n Reform Rabbis, Unitarian Universalist Ass’n & UULMCA. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522171] (EAI)
October 25, 2010 197 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by ACLU FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, GAY AND LESBIAN ADVOCATES AND DEFENDERS, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., AND NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522154] (JP)
October 25, 2010 196 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by The Southern Poverty Law Center. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522127] (SWD)
October 25, 2010 195 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [183] submitted by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522092] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 194 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.. [7522087] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 193 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by American Anthropological Association, American Psychoanalytic Association, National Association of Social Workers, National Association of Social Workers, California Chapter, American Sociological Association and American Academy of Pediatrics, California. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522077] (JDF)
October 25, 2010 192 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [182] submitted by Anti-Defamation League is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522067] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 191 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League. [7522065] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 190 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [181] submitted by California Teachers Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522052] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 189 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae California Teachers Association. [7522046] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 188 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Constitutional Law and Civil Procedure Professors. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522036] (EJC)
October 25, 2010 187 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Professors William N. Eskridge Jr., Rebecca L. Brown, Bruce A. Ackerman, Daniel A. Farber, Kenneth L. Karst, Andrew Koppelman. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522008] (KMO)
October 25, 2010 186 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [176] submitted by Commonwealth of Massachusetts is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7522007] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 185 COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY: Correct entry: [176]. Original text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522005] (JBM)
October 25, 2010 184 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Commonwealth of Massachusetts. [7522003] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 183 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521993] (DH)
October 25, 2010 182 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Anti-Defamation League. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521920] (VFM)
October 25, 2010 181 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by California Teachers Association. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521917] (CLL)
October 25, 2010 180 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [175] submitted by National LGBT Bar Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7521916] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 179 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae National LGBT Bar Association. [7521914] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 178 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [172] submitted by Americans United for Separation of Church and State and Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7521905] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 177 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic and Americans United for Separation of Church and State. [7521901] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 176 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521867] (JBM)
October 25, 2010 175 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by National LGBT Bar Association. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521850] (WD)
October 25, 2010 174 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [145] submitted by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7521819] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 173 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:KKW):Appellees’ motion for leave to exceed the type-volume limitation is GRANTED. The answering brief submitted by the appellees on October 18, 2010 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. The reply brief remains due November 1, 2010. [7521779] (KKW)
October 25, 2010 172 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by HOWARD UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW CIVIL RIGHTS CLINIC and AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521717] (BGS)
October 25, 2010 171 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [167] submitted by California Professors of Family Law is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7521683] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 170 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae California Professors of Family Law. [7521679] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 169 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [166] submitted by Jon. B. Eisenberg is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7521612] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 168 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Jon. B. Eisenberg. [7521601] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 167 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by California Professors of Family Law. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521471] (MSW)
October 25, 2010 166 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Jon B. Eisenberg. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521442] (LWB)
October 25, 2010 165 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [163] submitted by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR MARRIAGE AND FAMILY THERAPY, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, and CALIFORNIA PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7521430] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 164 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION and AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR MARRIAGE AND FAMILY THERAPY. [7521404] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 163 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The American Psychological Association, The California Psychological Association, The American Psychiatric Association, The American Association for Marriage and Family Therapy. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521351] (PMS)
October 25, 2010 162 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by NATIONAL GAY AND LESBIAN TASK FORCE FOUNDATION, HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, AND COURAGE CAMPAIGN INSTITUTE. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521276]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect correct filer (party, not counsel). Attached searchable version of motion, brief, and certificate of service. 10/26/2010 by RY] (SMP)
October 25, 2010 161 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alan E. Schoenfeld for Amicus Curiae Legislators from United States Jurisdictions That Have Legalized Same-Sex Marriage. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521138] (AES)
October 25, 2010 160 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [158] submitted by Legislators from United States Jurisdictions That Have Legalized Same-Sex Marriage is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7521094] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 159 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Legislators from United States Jurisdictions That Have Legalized Same-Sex Marriage. [7521083] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 158 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Amici Curiae Legislators from United States Jurisdictions that Have Legalized Same-Sex Marriage. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7520933] (AES)
October 25, 2010 157 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [151] submitted by Constitutional Accountability Center is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7520877] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 156 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Constitutional Accountability Center. [7520870] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 155 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [152] submitted by Bay Area Lawyers For Individual Freedom is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7520858] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 154 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Bay Area Lawyers For Individual Freedom. [7520852] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 153 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Justice Donald B. King, (Ret.) and The American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers (Northern California Chapter). [7520801] (GLS)
October 25, 2010 152 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by BAY AREA LAWYERS FOR INDIVIDUAL FREEDOM, ET AL.. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7520687] (JCR)
October 25, 2010 151 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Constitutional Accountability Center. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7520642] (EBW)
October 22, 2010 150 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Justice Donald B. King, Ret., California Court of Appeal; American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers (Northern California Chapter). Date of service: 10/22/2010. [7520301] (DER)
October 21, 2010 149 Notice of Oral Argument on DECEMBER 6, 2010 Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Attention: The Notice of Docket Activity may not list your case number. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7517712] [10-16696, 10-16751] (AM)
October 21, 2010 147 UPDATED CASE CALENDARED: 12/06/2010 10:00 AM San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 [7517596] [10-16696, 10-16751] (AM)
October 20, 2010 148 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [143] filed by City and County of San Francisco (sent to PANEL). [7517675] (YA)
October 18, 2010 146 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 4 volumes. (PANEL) [7516118] (GLS)
October 18, 2010 145 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Date of service: 10/18/2010. [7513128] (TO)
October 18, 2010 144 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [143] submitted by City and County of San Francisco is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7513066] (GLS)
October 18, 2010 143 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee City and County of San Francisco. Date of service: 10/18/2010. [7512863]--[Changed Reply to Answering - 10/18/2010 by SS] (CV)
October 18, 2010 142 Filed order MEDIATION (LJE): Based on a review of the Mediation Questionnaire, this case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel for any party interested in obtaining assistance from the court in pursuing settlement of the case on appeal or learning more about the Mediation Program is encouraged to contact the undersigned, by fax (415) 355-8566. The communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. Counsel are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. [7511700] (KKW)
October 12, 2010 141 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [72] filed by Catholics for the Common Good. (Sent to panel) [7505072] (SD)
October 7, 2010 140 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [73] filed by Ms. Tammy Cravit. (Sent to panel) [7504771] (SD)
October 6, 2010 139 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [72] submitted by Catholics for the Common Good is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7499013] (GLS)
October 5, 2010 134 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:AMT): The motion of Catholics for the Common Good for leave to file a late amicus brief is granted. The motion of Tamara L. Cravit for leave to file a late amicus brief is granted. [7497047] (KKW)
October 4, 2010 138 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [71] filed by American Civil Rights Union. [7497770] (SD)
October 4, 2010 137 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [50] filed by The American Center for Law and Justice. [7497745] (SD)
October 4, 2010 136 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [42] filed by The Ethics and Public Policy Center. [7497660] (SD)
October 4, 2010 135 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [68] filed by National Organization for Marriage, et al.. [7497652] (SD)
October 1, 2010 133 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [64] filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty. [7494144] (SD)
October 1, 2010 132 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [69] filed by Paul McHugh, M.D., et al.. [7494136] (SD)
October 1, 2010 131 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [65] filed by National Legal Foundation. [7494099] (SD)
October 1, 2010 130 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [70] filed by Mr. Eugene Dong, Esquire. [7494085] (SD)
September 30, 2010 129 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [31] filed by Family Research Council. [7493595] (SD)
September 30, 2010 128 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [41] filed by Desert Stream Ministries and Parents and Friends of Ex-Gays. [7493577] (SD)
September 30, 2010 127 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [58] filed by Robert P. George, Sherif Girgis, & Ryan T. Anderson. [7493571] (SD)
September 30, 2010 126 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [62] filed by American College of Pediatricians. [7493565] (SD)
September 30, 2010 125 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [67] filed by Concerned Women of America. [7493562] (SD)
September 30, 2010 124 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [61] filed by States of Indiana, Virginia, et al.. [7493557] (SD)
September 30, 2010 123 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [63] filed by Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence. [7493552] (SD)
September 30, 2010 122 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [43] filed by Campaign for Children and Families, JONAH, Inc. and Liberty Counsel. [7493547] (SD)
September 30, 2010 121 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [51] filed by The Hausvater Project. [7493527] (SD)
September 29, 2010 120 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending Catholics for the Common Good Motion to file a late brief. Date of service: 09/29/2010. [7491669]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached Certificate of Service. 10/01/2010 by RY] (RGK)
September 29, 2010 119 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [116] filed by Pacific Justice Institute. [7491434] (GLS)
September 29, 2010 115 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [57] filed by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. [7490957] (SD)
September 29, 2010 114 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [66] filed by Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund. [7490943] (SD)
September 28, 2010 113 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [59] filed by NARTH. [7490908] (SD)
September 28, 2010 112 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [32] filed by Liberty Institute, et al. [7490900] (SD)
September 28, 2010 111 Filed (ECF) Errata to Amicus Brief ([62] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing) ,[62] Motion (ECF Filing) ,[62] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus). Filed by Amicus Curiae American College of Pediatricians. Date of service: 09/28/2010. [7490398] (AJP)
September 28, 2010 110 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [71] submitted by American Civil Rights Union is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7490178] (GLS)
September 28, 2010 109 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending Ms. Tammy Cravit Motion to file a late brief. Date of service: 09/28/2010. [7490018]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected motion (includes Certificate of Service). 09/28/2010 by RY] (TC)
September 28, 2010 108 Terminated Gordon Bruce Burns for Arnold Schwarzenegger and Edmund G. Brown Jr. in 10-16751 [7489951] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PH)
September 28, 2010 107 Terminated Gordon Bruce Burns for Arnold Schwarzenegger and Edmund G. Brown Jr. in 10-16696 [7489942] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PH)
September 28, 2010 106 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Tammy Cravit. [7489829] (GLS)
September 28, 2010 105 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Catholics for the Common Good. [7489816] (GLS)
September 28, 2010 104 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [61] submitted by Indiana, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7489498] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 103 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae American Civil Rights Union. [7488316] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 102 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [70] submitted by Mr. Eugene Dong, Esquire is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488304] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 101 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Eugene Dong. [7488297] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 100 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [69] submitted by Paul McHugh, M.D., et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488274] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 99 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Paul McHugh, M.D., et al.. [7488270] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 98 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [68] submitted by National Organization for Marriage, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488258] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 97 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae National Organization for Marriage, et al.. [7488224] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 96 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [67] submitted by Concerned Women of America is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488120] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 95 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Concerned Women of America. [7488118] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 94 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [66] submitted by Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488110] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 93 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund. [7488109] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 92 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [65] submitted by National Legal Foundation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488102] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 91 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae National Legal Foundation. [7488100] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 90 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [64] submitted by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488091] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 89 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty. [7488089] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 88 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [63] submitted by Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488081] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 87 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence. [7488079] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 86 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [62] submitted by American College of Pediatricians is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7488069] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 85 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae American College of Pediatricians. [7488066] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 84 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Indiana, et al.. [7488056] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 83 Deleted Incorrect Docket Entry; brief filed in error--filer has been contacted to resubmit brief in correct case. (GLS)
September 27, 2010 82 Deleted Incorrect Docket Entry; entered Amicus party in error. (GLS)
September 27, 2010 81 Deleted Incorrect Docket Entry (GLS)
September 27, 2010 80 Deleted Incorrect Docket Entry (GLS)
September 27, 2010 79 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [59] submitted by NARTH is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7487988] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 78 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae NARTH. [7487984] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 77 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [58] submitted by Robert P. George, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7487975] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 76 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Robert P. George, et al.. [7487973] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 75 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [57] submitted by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7487969] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 74 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. [7487965] (GLS)
September 27, 2010 73 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Tamara L. Cravit. Date of service: 09/27/2010. [7487427]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief (footnotes). 09/28/2010 by RY] (TC)
September 25, 2010 72 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Catholics for the Common Good. Date of service: 9/27/2010. [7487171]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. Attached corrected brief (footnotes). 09/29/2010 by RY]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. Attached Motion to become amicus and Certificate of Service. 10/01/2010 by RY] (RGK)
September 24, 2010 118 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [116] submitted by Pacific Justice Institute is filed. Paper copies of the brief have been received with certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7491420] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 117 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Pacific Justice Institute. [7491415] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 71 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by American Civil Rights Union. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487169]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. Attached corrected brief (footnotes). 09/28/2010 by RY] (KAK)
September 24, 2010 70 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Eugene Dong. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487167]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (ED)
September 24, 2010 69 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by PAUL McHUGH, M.D., JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY DISTINGUISHED SERVICE PROFESSOR OF PYSCHIATRY. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487166]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (HGG)
September 24, 2010 68 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by National Organization for Marriage, et al.. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487163]--[COURT UPDATE: replaced PDF per request from filer Joshua Baker; resent notice. 09/25/2010 by ASW]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (JKB)
September 24, 2010 67 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Concerned Women of America. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487162]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (HC)
September 24, 2010 66 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487159]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (LJJ)
September 24, 2010 65 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by National Legal Foundation. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487155]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (SWF)
September 24, 2010 64 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487153]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (LHW)
September 24, 2010 63 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487151]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (JCE)
September 24, 2010 62 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by American College of Pediatricians. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487146]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (AJP)
September 24, 2010 61 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by STATES OF INDIANA, VIRGINIA et al.. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487142]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. Attached corrected brief (footnotes). 09/28/2010 by RY] (TMF)
September 24, 2010 116 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Pacific Justice Institute. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7491097]--[COURT UPDATE: Backdated entry to original submission date [60]. Corrected brief (caption title of cover) resubmitted. 09/29/2010 by RY] (KTS)
September 24, 2010 60 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY: Submitted in wrong case. Filer contacted to resubmit in correct case. Original text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Pacific Justice Institute. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487134] (KTS)
September 24, 2010 59 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH & THERAPY FOUNDATION FOR HOMOSEXUALITY. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487120]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (GGK)
September 24, 2010 58 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Robert P. George, Sherif Girgis, Ryan T. Anderson. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487115]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (KKW)
September 24, 2010 57 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al.. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7486765]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/27/2010 by RY] (AD)
September 24, 2010 56 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [35] filed by High Impact Leadership Coalition, The Center for Urban Renewal and Education and The Frederick Douglass Foundation. [7486743] (SD)
September 24, 2010 55 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [51] submitted by The Hausvater Project is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7486623] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 54 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae The Hausvater Project. [7486622] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 53 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [50] submitted by The American Center for Law and Justice is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7486614] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 52 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae The American Center for Law and Justice. [7486611] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 51 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by The Hausvater Project. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7486577]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/24/2010 by RY] (DM)
September 24, 2010 50 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by The American Center for Law and Justice. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7486510]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/24/2010 by RY] (WMW)
September 24, 2010 49 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [43] submitted by Campaign for Children and Families, JONAH, Inc. and Liberty Counsel is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7486432] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 48 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiaes Liberty Counsel, Campaign for Children and Families and JONAH, Inc.. [7486233] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 47 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [42] submitted by The Ethics and Public Policy Center is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7486207] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 46 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae The Ethics and Public Policy Center. [7486204] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 45 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [41] submitted by Desert Stream Ministries and Parents and Friends of Ex-Gays is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7486187] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 44 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiaes Parents and Friends of Ex-Gays and Desert Stream Ministries. [7486183] (GLS)
September 24, 2010 43 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Liberty Counsel JONAH Inc. Campaign for Children and Families. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7486098] (RL)
September 24, 2010 42 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Ethics and Public Policy Center. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7485767]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/24/2010 by RY] (MEW)
September 23, 2010 41 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by The Western Center for Law & Policy on Behalf of Parents and Friends of Ex-Gays and Desert Streams Ministries. Date of service: 09/23/2010. [7485556]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/24/2010 by RY] (DRB)
September 23, 2010 40 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [21] filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. [7485265] (SD)
September 23, 2010 39 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [35] submitted by High Impact Leadership Coalition, The Center for Urban Renewal and Education and The Frederick Douglass Foundation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7485042] (GLS)
September 23, 2010 38 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiaes High Impact Leadership Coalition, The Center for Urban Renewal and Education and The Frederick Douglass Foundation. [7485037] (GLS)
September 23, 2010 37 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [32] submitted by Liberty Institute, et al is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7485006] (GLS)
September 23, 2010 36 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiaes Liberty Institute, Association of Maryland Families, California Family Council, Center for Arizona Policy, Citizens for Community Values, Cornerstone Action, Cornerstone Family Council, Delaware Family Policy Council, Family Action Council of Tennessee, The Family Foundation, The Family Policy Council of West Virginia, Family Policy Institute of Washington, Florida Family Policy Council, Georgia Family Council, Illinois Family Institute, Independence Law Center, Iowa Family Policy Center, Louisiana Family Forum Action, Massachusetts Family Institute, Michigan Family Forum, Minnesota Family Council, Missouri Family Policy Council, Montana Family Foundation, New Jersey Family First, New Jersey Family Policy Council, North Carolina Family Policy Council, Oklahoma Family Policy Council, Oregon Family Council, Palmetto Family Council, Pennsylvania Family Institute, Wisconsin Family Action and Wywatch Family Action. [7484993] (GLS)
September 23, 2010 35 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by The High Impact Leadership Coalition, The Center for Urban Renewal and Education, and The Frederick Douglass Foundation, Inc.. Date of service: 09/23/2010. [7484878]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/23/2010 by RY] (SKE)
September 23, 2010 34 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [31] submitted by Family Research Council is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7484749] (GLS)
September 23, 2010 33 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Family Research Council. [7484746] (GLS)
September 23, 2010 32 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Liberty Institute, et al. Date of service: 09/23/2010. [7484702]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/23/2010 by RY] (KJS)
September 22, 2010 31 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Family Research Council. Date of service: 09/22/2010. [7484139]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of submission. 09/23/2010 by RY] (PBL)
September 22, 2010 29 Received 1 copy of excerpts of record of Volume 4 filed by Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (RECORDS) (GLS)
September 22, 2010 28 Added attorney Rosanne C. Baxter for Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Sandra B. Stier Kristin M. Perry Paul T. Katami, in case 10-16696. [7483726] (MT)
September 22, 2010 27 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rosanne C. Baxter for Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Date of service: 09/22/2010. [7483566] (RCB)
September 22, 2010 26 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [21] submitted by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7482898] (GLS)
September 22, 2010 25 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) Defendant-Intervenors-Appellants’ motion for leave to file an oversized opening brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the opening brief submitted by electronic filing on September 17, 2010. The answering brief remains due October 18, 2010. The motion of Margie Reilly for leave to file an amicus brief and any response is referred to the merits panel for resolution. (Pro Mo) [7482729] (MS)
September 20, 2010 30 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [22] submitted by Margie Reilly is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7484097] (GLS)
September 20, 2010 24 ENTRY UPDATED. Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Margie Reilly. [7480737] (GLS)
September 20, 2010 23 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal excerpts of record in 7 volumes: missing one copy of Volume 4. Within five (5) days, please submit an additional copy of Volume 4. Served on 09/17/2010. [7480635] (GLS)
September 20, 2010 22 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Margie Reilly. Date of service: 09/20/2010. [7479835]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of brief with amended version containing corrected cover only listing lead case number, correct size footnotes, and no motion, corrected docket text to reflect fact submission only contains a brief, resent NDA, 09/22/2010 by AWM] (JJL)
September 17, 2010 21 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Date of service: 09/17/2010. [7479041] (CJC)
September 17, 2010 20 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 09/17/2010. [7479040] (CJC)
September 15, 2010 19 Received letter from Robert Wooten dated8/30/10 re: motion to file an amicus brief. [7477030] (MT)
September 13, 2010 18 Filed (ECF) Appellee CCSF Correspondence: Notice of Consent to the Filing of Amicus Curiae Briefs. Date of service: 09/13/2010 [7472026] (CV)
September 13, 2010 17 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Plaintiffs-Appellees' Notice of Consent to the Filing of Amicus Curiae Briefs. Date of service: 09/13/2010 [7470824] (TO)
September 9, 2010 16 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: Notice of Consent to Amicus Briefs. Date of service: 09/09/2010 [7468385] [10-16696] (BWR)
September 2, 2010 15 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: District Court Transcript Designation Form. Date of service: 09/02/2010 [7461563] (CJC)
August 16, 2010 14 Filed order (EDWARD LEAVY, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and SIDNEY R. THOMAS) Appellants’ motion for a stay of the district court’s order of August 4, 2010 pending appeal is GRANTED. The court sua sponte orders that this appeal be expedited pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 2. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) (pertaining to grants of time extensions) shall not apply to this appeal. This appeal shall be calendared during the week of December 6, 2010, at The James R. Browning Courthouse in San Francisco, California. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. The opening brief is now due September 17, 2010. The answering brief is due October 18, 2010. The reply brief is due November 1, 2010. In addition to any issues appellants wish to raise on appeal, appellants are directed to include in their opening brief a discussion of why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of Article III standing. See Arizonans For Official English v. Arizona, 520 U.S. 43, 66 (1997). IT IS SO ORDERED. [7441574] (JS)
August 16, 2010 13 Added attorney Tamar Pachter for Edmund G. Brown Jr., in case 10-16696. [7440841] (EL)
August 16, 2010 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tamar Pachter for - Edmund G. Brown, Jr.. Date of service: 08/16/2010. [7440829] (TP)
August 16, 2010 11 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal reply to response (, ,motion to stay lower court action, , ). Date of service: 08/16/2010. [7440355] (CJC)
August 13, 2010 10 Filed (ECF) Appellee CCSF response to motion (,motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 08/13/2010. [7440235] (VC)
August 13, 2010 9 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo response opposing motion (,motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 08/13/2010. [7440233] (TO)
August 13, 2010 8 Filed (ECF) - Edmund G. Brown, Jr. response opposing motion (,motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 08/13/2010. [7440208] (DP)
August 13, 2010 7 Added attorney Daniel Powell for Edmund G. Brown Jr., in case 10-16696. [7439923] (EL)
August 13, 2010 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of for - Edmund G. Brown, Jr.. Date of service: 08/13/2010. [7439895] (DP)
August 13, 2010 5 Filed order (EDWARD LEAVY, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and SIDNEY R. THOMAS) Appellants’ motion to exceed page limitations is granted and the motion for stay pending appeal is deemed filed. Appellees’ response to the motion for stay pending appeal, not to exceed 35 pages, is due by 11:00 p.m. Pacific Time on August 13, 2010. Appellants reply, not to exceed 15 pages, is due by 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time on August 16, 2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. [7439641] (KD)
August 12, 2010 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 08/12/2010. [7438690] (CJC)
August 12, 2010 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Motion to file oversized brief (Oversized emergency motion). Date of service: 08/12/2010. [7438686]--[Edited 08/13/2010 by BY] (CJC)
August 12, 2010 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/12/2010. [7437554] (CJC)
August 5, 2010 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/12/2010. Transcript ordered by 09/03/2010. Transcript due 10/04/2010. Appellant Martin F. Gutierrez, Appellant Dennis Hollingsworth, Appellant Mark A. Jansson, Appellant Gail J. Knight, Appellant ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal and Appellant Hak-Shing William Tam opening brief due 11/12/2010. Appellee City and County of San Francisco, Appellee Paul T. Katami, Appellee Kristin M. Perry, Appellee Sandra B. Stier and Appellee Jeffrey J. Zarrillo answering brief due 12/13/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7429526] (WF)
Search for this case: Kristin Perry, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: KRISTIN M. PERRY
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: SANDRA B. STIER
Represented By: Theodore Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: PAUL T. KATAMI
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-plaintiff - appellee,: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Ronald P. Flynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California
Represented By: Gordon Bruce Burns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: Gordon Bruce Burns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health & State Registrar of Vital Statistics
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of Health Information & Strategic Planning for the California Department of Public Health
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda
Represented By: Claude Franklin Kolm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk for the County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Judy Whitehurst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellant,: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH
Represented By: Jesse Panuccio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellant,: GAIL J. KNIGHT
Represented By: Jesse Panuccio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellant,: MARTIN F. GUTIERREZ
Represented By: David Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellant,: MARK A. JANSSON
Represented By: David Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellant,: PROTECTMARRIAGE.COM - YES ON 8, A PROJECT OF CALIFORNIA RENEWAL, as official proponents of Proposition 8
Represented By: Jesse Panuccio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant - appellant,: HAK-SHING WILLIAM TAM
Represented By: Terry L. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]