Ken Aronson v. Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant,: KEN ARONSON
Defendant - Appellee,: DOG EAT DOG FILMS, INC.
Case Number: 10-35815
Filed: September 14, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2011 23 Order filed (Deputy Clerk: CG) Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [7673328] (KM)
March 7, 2011 22 Filed (ECF) Appellee Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. Stipulated Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 03/07/2011. [7671614] (NHK)
February 28, 2011 21 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedule previously established by the court is vacated. Unless appellant files a motion or stipulation for voluntary dismissal in the interim, on or before March 9, 2011, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7663087] (KM)
February 22, 2011 20 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): Unless appellant files a motion or stipulation for voluntary dismissal in the interim, on or before March 9, 2011, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7655795] (KM)
February 17, 2011 19 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): Unless appellant files a motion or stipulation for voluntary dismissal in the interim, on or before February 23, 2011, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7652683] (KM)
February 16, 2011 18 Filed order MEDIATION (CAG): Based on the cited circumstances, the appellant’s motion for a second extension of time in which to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due February 28, 2011; the answering brief is due March 30, 2011; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7651170] (AF)
February 15, 2011 17 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ken Aronson Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 02/28/2011 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 02/15/2011. [7650151] (PAT)
January 31, 2011 16 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellant Ken Aronson brief. Appellant Ken Aronson opening brief due 02/22/2011. Appellee Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. answering brief due 03/24/2011. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [7630433] (LW)
January 14, 2011 15 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The court has reviewed the response to the order to show cause, as well as the reply to the response. The order to show cause is discharged without prejudice to renewal of the arguments during briefing. In their briefs, the parties shall address whether the court has jurisdiction to review an order granting a defendant’s special motion to strike under the Washington Act Limiting Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation pursuant to the collateral order doctrine. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due February 7, 2011; the answering brief is due March 9, 2011; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. (MOATT) [7613424] (AF)
November 29, 2010 14 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [7560521] (KM)
November 19, 2010 13 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ken Aronson reply to response to order to show cause dated 10/19/2010. Date of service: 11/19/2010. [7552966]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text and event to reflect content of filing (reply, not response). Attached corrected Reply. Resent notice. 11/22/2010 by RY] (PAT)
November 12, 2010 12 Filed (ECF) Appellee Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. reply to response to order to show cause dated 10/19/2010. Date of service: 11/12/2010. [7543477] (BEJ)
November 12, 2010 11 Filed (ECF) Appellee Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 11/12/2010. [7543462] (BEJ)
November 4, 2010 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ken Aronson response to order to show cause dated 10/19/2010. Date of service: 11/04/2010. [7534107]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of Response and Declaration. Resent notice. 11/05/2010 by RY] (PAT)
October 29, 2010 9 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [7527986] (KM)
October 19, 2010 8 Filed order MOATT: (AW) 54(b) order to show cause...If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [7513406] (KD)
October 1, 2010 7 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [7494155] (KM)
September 27, 2010 6 Filed order MEDIATION (LW): The conference previously scheduled for October 21, 2010 has been rescheduled to October 8, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. [7487882] (KM)
September 23, 2010 5 Filed order MEDIATION (LW): Case referred to Mediation for assessment conference only. Telephone conference to be on 10/21/2010 at 09:30 am. (Pacific Standard Time) [7485583] (KM)
September 23, 2010 4 Check number 7601 in the amount of $455.00 returned to Appellant Ken Aronson c/o PFAU 911 Pacific Avenue, #200 Tacoma, WA 98402, per fee previously satisfied. [7485329] (JR)
September 21, 2010 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ken Aronson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/21/2010. [7482046] (PAT)
September 14, 2010 2 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD $455.00 Date paid: 09/14/2010. [7473895] (KM)
September 14, 2010 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/21/2010. Appellant Ken Aronson opening brief due 12/22/2010. Appellee Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc. answering brief due 01/21/2011. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7473880] (KM)
Search for this case: Ken Aronson v. Dog Eat Dog Films, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: KEN ARONSON
Represented By: James P. Amala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: DOG EAT DOG FILMS, INC.
Represented By: Bruce Edward Humble Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]