Dennis Hollingsworth, et al v. USDCSF, et al Featured Case

Petitioner,: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH
Respondent,: USDC, SAN FRANCISCO
Real Party In Interest,: KRISTIN M. PERRY, SANDRA B. STIER, PAUL T. KATAMI, JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California, EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Attorney General of California, MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health & State Registrar of Vital Statistics, LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of Health Information & Strategic Planning for the California Department of Public Health, DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk for the County of Los Angeles, HAK-SHING WILLIAM TAM, NON-PARTY THE MEDIA COALITION and PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda
 
Case Number: 10-70063
Filed: January 8, 2010
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2010 12 Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 04/08/2010. Supreme Court Number 09-1238. [7309047] (GV)
January 19, 2010 11 Received a copy of Supreme Court of the United States Office of the Clerk Washington, DC notice re: the enclosed per curiam was issued. [7203616] (RL)
January 13, 2010 10 Received notification from Petitioner of payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 450.00. Date paid: 01/13/2010. [7195298] (RL)
January 11, 2010 9 Check number 16972 in the amount of $450.00 returned to Petitioner Dennis Hollingsworth c/o Cooper & Kirk @ 1523 New Hampshire Avenue, NW Washington DC, 20036. The check was endorsed with an erroneous amount in the written portion of the check. [7189256] (JR)
January 8, 2010 8 Order filed (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, RICHARD A. PAEZ and CARLOS T. BEA) Petitioners have not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. See Bauman v. United States Dist. Court, 557 F.2d 650 (9th Cir. 1977). Accordingly, the petition is denied. [7188589] (DAF)
January 8, 2010 7 Filed (ECF) Real Party in Interest Patrick O'Connell response to Court order dated 01/08/2010. Date of service: 01/08/2010. [7188383]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. 01/12/2010 by MA] (CFK)
January 8, 2010 6 Filed (ECF)Real Party in Interest Non-Party The Media Coalition Answer to Original Petition. Date of service: 01/08/2010. [7188336]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text, changed filing category. 01/08/2010 by MA]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced document with searchable version. 01/11/2010 by MA] (RLW)
January 8, 2010 5 Added attorneys Rochelle Lyn Wilcox and Thomas R. Burke for Non-Party The Media Coalition. [7188264] (RL)
January 8, 2010 4 Filed (ECF) Real Parties in Interest Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo response to motion ( Order , Order to set response by any party to anything). Date of service: 01/08/2010. [7188224] (TO)
January 8, 2010 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas R. Burke for Real Party in Interest Non-Party The Media Coalition. Date of service: 01/08/2009. [7188166] (TRB)
January 8, 2010 2 Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, RICHARD A. PAEZ and CARLOS T. BEA) The court hereby directs that real parties in interest shall file a response to the petition for a writ of mandamus by 3:00 p.m. PST on January 8, 2010. See Fed. R. App. P. 21(b). The district court may file a response if it so desires by 3:00 p.m. PST on January 8, 2010. [7187966] (DAF)
January 8, 2010 1 FILED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST OF FILING. [7187906] (HH)
Search for this case: Dennis Hollingsworth, et al v. USDCSF, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner,: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH
Represented By: James Andrew Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent,: USDC, SAN FRANCISCO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: KRISTIN M. PERRY
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: SANDRA B. STIER
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: PAUL T. KATAMI
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Therese Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: Gordon Bruce Burns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health & State Registrar of Vital Statistics
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of Health Information & Strategic Planning for the California Department of Public Health
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk for the County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Cortez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: HAK-SHING WILLIAM TAM
Represented By: Terry L. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: NON-PARTY THE MEDIA COALITION
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda
Represented By: Claude Franklin Kolm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]