Righthaven LLC v. Center For Intercultural Organ, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant,: RIGHTHAVEN LLC
Defendant - Appellee,: CENTER FOR INTERCULTURAL ORGANIZING and KAYSE JAMA
 
Case Number: 11-16358
Filed: June 2, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2012 26 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [20] filed by Digital Media Law Projects, EFF and Public Knowledge and Professors. [8038656] (SD)
January 18, 2012 25 Mail returned on 01/13/2011 addressed to Mr. Shawn Anthony Mangano, Esquire for Righthaven LLC, re: 12/08/11 Court notice. Resending to: 8367 West Flamingo Road, Suite 100 Las Vegas, Nevada 89147. [8035617] (JFF)
January 13, 2012 24 The amicus brief [20] submitted by Digital Media Law Projects, EFF and Public Knowledge and Professors is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. [8032004] [8032004] (GV)
January 13, 2012 23 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation , Digital Media Law Projects and Public Knowledge and Professors. [8031999] (GV)
January 13, 2012 22 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Google Inc.. Date of service: 01/13/2012. [8031992] (APB)
January 13, 2012 21 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [17] filed by Center For Intercultural Organizing and Kayse Jama. [8031891] (SD)
January 13, 2012 20 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Digital Media Law Project, Public Knowledge and Professors. Date of service: 01/13/2012. [8031869] (KO)
January 10, 2012 19 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [17] submitted by Center For Intercultural Organizing and Kayse Jama is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. [8026333] (GV)
January 9, 2012 18 Filed Appellees Center For Intercultural Organizing and Kayse Jama's supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8025859] (GV)
January 6, 2012 17 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Center For Intercultural Organizing and Kayse Jama. Date of service: 01/06/2012. [8023086] --[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of brief (now searchable and includes certificate of service). Resent NDA. 01/09/2012 by DB] (MES)
December 20, 2011 16 Filed (ECF) Appellees Center For Intercultural Organizing and Kayse Jama Correspondence: Letter to Court re: extension for answering brief. Date of service: 12/20/2011 [8006157] (JRO)
December 19, 2011 15 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellees Center For Intercultural Organizing and Kayse Jama brief. Appellees Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama answering brief due 01/06/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8005101] (TH)
December 15, 2011 14 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [11] filed by Righthaven LLC. [8002029] (SD)
December 7, 2011 13 Received Appellant Righthaven LLC excerpts of record in 1 volume. Deficiencies: no certificate of service. Notified counsel (see attached notice). [7994223] (LA)
November 23, 2011 12 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [11] submitted by Righthaven LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7978355] (GV)
November 22, 2011 11 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Righthaven LLC. Date of service: 11/22/2011. [7976816]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 11/23/2011 by GD] (SAM)
November 15, 2011 10 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Late Second Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Righthaven LLC Appellant Righthaven LLC opening brief due 11/22/2011. Appellees Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama answering brief due 12/23/2011 [7966002] (GS)
November 14, 2011 9 Filed (ECF) Appellant Righthaven LLC Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 11/22/2011 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 11/14/2011. [7964950] (SAM)
October 31, 2011 8 Filed (ECF) Appellant Righthaven LLC Correspondence: Letter advising of 14-day telephonic extension of time and related deadlines. Date of service: 10/31/2011 [7949025] (SAM)
October 27, 2011 7 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellant Righthaven LLC brief. Appellant Righthaven LLC opening brief due 11/14/2011. Appellees Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama answering brief due 12/14/2011. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [7945817] (CG)
August 24, 2011 6 Filed order MEDIATION (AJ): The court has determined that this appeal will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk’s office. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before October 28, 2011; appellees shall file an answering brief on or before January 6, 2012; appellant may file an optional reply brief on or before February 3, 2012. [7868847] (WL)
August 11, 2011 5 Filed order MEDIATION (AJ): The assessment conference scheduled for August 18, 2011 is rescheduled to 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. The court will initiate the call. [7853489] (WL)
August 10, 2011 4 Filed order MEDIATION (AJ): The assessment conference scheduled for August 18, 2011 is rescheduled to 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. The court will initiate the call [7850836] (WL)
July 18, 2011 3 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a telephone settlement assessment conference, with counsel only, on August 18, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time to discuss whether this case is appropriate for participation in the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before October 10, 2011; appellees shall file an answering brief on or before November 8, 2011; appellant may file an optional reply brief within fourteen (14) days from the service date of the answering brief. [7823637] (WL)
June 9, 2011 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Righthaven LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/09/2011. [7780826] (SAM)
June 2, 2011 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Righthaven LLC on 05/18/2011. Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/09/2011. Transcript ordered by 06/17/2011. Transcript due 07/18/2011. Appellant Righthaven LLC opening brief due 08/26/2011. Appellee Center For Intercultural Organizing and Appellee Kayse Jama answering brief due 09/26/2011. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7770264] (GR)
Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Center For Intercultural Organ, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: RIGHTHAVEN LLC
Represented By: Shawn Anthony Mangano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: CENTER FOR INTERCULTURAL ORGANIZING
Represented By: James R. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: KAYSE JAMA
Represented By: James R. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]