Benjamin Joffe, et al v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee,: BENJAMIN JOFFE, LILLA MARIGZA, RICK BENITTI, BERTHA DAVIS, JASON TAYLOR, ERIC MYHRE, JOHN E. REDSTONE, MATTHEW BERLAGE, PATRICK KEYES, KARL H. SCHULZ, JAMES FAIRBANKS, AARON LINSKY, DEAN M. BASTILLA, VICKI VAN VALIN, JEFFREY COLMAN, RUSSELL CARTER, STEPHANIE CARTER and JENNIFER LOCSIN
Defendant - Appellant,: GOOGLE INC.
 
Case Number: 11-17483
Filed: October 17, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
September 10, 2013 Summary Joffe v. Google, Inc.
December 27, 2013 BENJAMIN JOFFE V. GOOGLE INC.

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2014 71 The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 06/30/2014. Supreme Court number 13-1181. (Panel: AWT, JSB and WHS). [9156982] (RR)
April 1, 2014 70 Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 03/27/2014. Supreme Court Number 13-1181. [9039990] (RR)
January 7, 2014 69 MANDATE ISSUED.(AWT, JSB and WHS) [8927396] (RL)
December 27, 2013 68 Filed order and amended opinion (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, JAY S. BYBEE and WILLIAM H. STAFFORD, JR.).Appellant’s motion for leave to file a reply brief in support of its petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc, filed on November 6, 2013, is GRANTED. Appellant’s petition for rehearing, filed on September 24, 2013, is GRANTED IN PART. The court’s opinion, filed on September 10, 2013, and appearing at 729 F.3d 1362 (9th Cir. 2013), is hereby AMENDED. An amended opinion is filed concurrently with this order. Judge Bybee votes to deny Appellant’s petition for rehearing en banc, filed on September 24, 2013, and Judge Tashima and Judge Stafford so recommend. The full court has been advised of Appellant’s petition for rehearing en banc, and no request to vote on whether to rehear the case en banc has been made. Appellant’s petition for rehearing en banc is DENIED. No subsequent petitions for rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed by either party. [8917440] (RP)
November 14, 2013 67 Filed (ECF) Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin response opposing motion (,motion to file supplemental briefing for petition for rehearing). Date of service: 11/14/2013. [8862754] (EJC)
November 6, 2013 66 Filed (ECF) Appellant Google, Inc. Motion to file supplemental brief for petition for rehearing. Date of service: 11/06/2013. [8852671] (MHR)
October 30, 2013 65 Filed (ECF) Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin response to Combo PFR Panel and En Banc (ECF Filing) ,Combo PFR Panel and En Banc (ECF Filing) for panel and en banc rehearing, for panel and en banc rehearing (statistical entry). Date of service: 10/30/2013. [8844479]. (EJC)
October 9, 2013 63 Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, JAY S. BYBEE and WILLIAM H. STAFFORD, JR.) Appellees are directed to file a response to Appellant’s petition for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc filed on September 24, 2013. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4,200 words and shall be filed within 21 days of the date of this order. Parties who are registered for Appellate ECF must file the response electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties who are not registered Appellate ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies. [8814895] (SM)
October 8, 2013 64 Received 7 additional copies of Amicus Curiae IT&IF in support of petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. [8815661] (EL)
October 4, 2013 62 Added attorney Michael S. Kwun for IT&IF, in case 11-17483. [8809772] (RR)
October 4, 2013 61 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael S. Kwun for Amicus Curiae IT&IF. Date of service: 10/04/2013. [8809756] (AR)
October 4, 2013 60 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ashok Ramani for Amicus Curiae IT&IF. Date of service: 10/04/2013. [8809753] (AR)
October 4, 2013 59 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [57] submitted by IT&IF is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8809749] (RR)
October 4, 2013 58 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae IT&IF. [8809735] (RR)
October 4, 2013 57 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Information Technology & Innovation Foundation. Date of service: 10/04/2013. [8809684] (AR)
September 24, 2013 56 Filed (ECF) Appellant Google, Inc. petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 09/10/2013 opinion). Date of service: 09/24/2013. [8795557] (MHR)
September 23, 2013 55 Added attorney Seth P. Waxman for Google, Inc., in case 11-17483. [8792446] (EL)
September 23, 2013 54 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Seth P. Waxman for Appellant Google, Inc.. Date of service: 09/23/2013. [8792408] (SPW)
September 10, 2013 53 Featured Case FILED OPINION (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, JAY S. BYBEE and WILLIAM H. STAFFORD, JR.) AFFIRMED. Judge: JSB Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [8775648] (RP)
June 10, 2013 52 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO A. WALLACE TASHIMA, JAY S. BYBEE and WILLIAM H. STAFFORD, JR.. [8661637] (GB)
June 3, 2013 51 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: PA): KGO-TV applied to videotape and audio-record for later broadcast, the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, California, on Monday, June 10, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. KGO-TV’s request to videotape and audio-record for later broadcast is DENIED. [8652246] (PA)
May 16, 2013 50 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Michael H. Rubin for Appellant Google, Inc.. [8632105] (MHR)
May 16, 2013 49 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Elizabeth J. Cabraser for Appellees Jason Taylor, Benjamin Joffe, Lilla Marigza, Rick Benitti, Bertha Davis, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Matthew Berlage, Patrick Keyes, Karl H. Schulz, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky, Dean M. Bastilla, Vicki Van Valin, Jeffrey Colman, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter and Jennifer Locsin. [8631472] (EJC)
April 11, 2013 48 Filed (ECF) Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin Correspondence: Letter to the Clerk of Court : Excerpts of Record. Date of service: 04/11/2013 [8586474] (MAG)
April 2, 2013 47 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Google, Inc.. Date of service: 04/20/2012. [8574761] (MHR)
March 29, 2013 46 Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8570593] (SS)
March 29, 2013 45 Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, June 10, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 1, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8569799] (RB)
January 24, 2013 44 Filed (ECF) Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin Correspondence: request update of status. Date of service: 01/24/2013 [8486474] (JCS)
April 24, 2012 43 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [40] filed by Google Inc.. [8152786] (SD)
April 23, 2012 41 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [40] submitted by Google Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8148821] (RH)
April 20, 2012 42 Filed Appellant Google Inc. supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8148916] (RH)
April 20, 2012 40 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Google Inc.. Date of service: 04/20/2012. [8148608] (MHR)
April 6, 2012 39 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [36] filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center. [8130711] (SD)
April 2, 2012 38 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: amt): Motion of Electronic Privacy Information Center ("EPIC") (ECF Filing) to become amicus is referred to panel. The amicus brief of EPIC and any other related filings are referred to the merits panel for consideration. Within seven days of the filing of this order, EPIC is ordered to file seven copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Any further motion to file amicus curiae briefs shall be treated in the same fashion. [8124603] [11-17483] (AT)
April 2, 2012 37 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Electronic Privacy Information Center. [8123958] (RH)
March 30, 2012 36 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Electronic Privacy Information Center. Date of service: 03/30/2012. [8123338] (MR)
March 26, 2012 35 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [30] filed by appellees. [8119436] (SD)
March 26, 2012 34 Added attorney Jahan C. Sagafi for Karl H. Schulz John E. Redstone Matthew Berlage Bertha Davis Jeffrey Colman Eric Myhre Patrick Keyes Dean M. Bastilla Russell Carter Aaron Linsky Vicki Van Valin Rick Benitti James Fairbanks Lilla Marigza Jason Taylor Stephanie Carter Benjamin Joffe Jennifer Locsin, in case 11-17483. [8116816] (MT)
March 26, 2012 33 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jahan C. Sagafi for Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin. Date of service: 03/26/2012. [8116737] (JCS)
March 26, 2012 32 Filed (ECF) Appellant Google Inc. Correspondence: Confirmation of Extension of Time. Date of service: 03/26/2012 [8116340] (MHR)
March 26, 2012 31 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [30] submitted by Appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8116227] (RH)
March 23, 2012 30 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin. Date of service: 03/23/2012. [8115927] (EJC)
March 23, 2012 29 Oral extension by phone of time to file Google Inc. optional reply brief. Appellant Google Inc. reply brief due April 23, 2012. [8114951] (TH)
March 7, 2012 28 Filed (ECF) Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage and Russell Carter Correspondence: 14 Day Oral Request for Extension Granted. Date of service: 03/07/2012 [8094313] (EJC)
March 5, 2012 27 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellees' ans. brief. The answering brief is due 03/23/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellees' ans. brief. [8089671] (TH)
February 13, 2012 26 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [23] filed by Google Inc.. [8069876] (SD)
February 9, 2012 24 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [23] submitted by Google Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. [8063648] (RH)
February 8, 2012 25 Filed Appellant Google Inc. excerpts of record in 2 volumes. Served on 02/08/2012. [8063661] (RH)
February 8, 2012 23 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Google Inc.. Date of service: 02/08/2012. [8062181] (MHR)
January 13, 2012 22 Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): Case not selected for mediation program. Counsel interested in obtaining settlement assistance or program information should contact the Mediation Office. [8031374] (KKW)
January 11, 2012 21 Filed (ECF) Appellant Google Inc. Correspondence: Confirmation of Extension of Time. Date of service: 01/11/2012 [8028887] (MHR)
January 11, 2012 20 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file the opening brief. The opening brief due 02/08/2012. The answering brief due is 03/09/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8028783] (CG)
January 4, 2012 19 Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on January 13, 2012, at 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time (4:00 p.m. Eastern Time). [8018268] (AF)
December 13, 2011 18 Filed order MEDIATION (MAC):The further conference, previously set for December 12, 2011, is rescheduled to December 14, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time (1:00 p.m. Eastern Time). [7998917] (KKW)
November 21, 2011 17 Added attorney Mary Ann Giorno for Karl H. Schulz John E. Redstone Matthew Berlage Bertha Davis Jeffrey Colman Eric Myhre Patrick Keyes Dean M. Bastilla Russell Carter Aaron Linsky Vicki Van Valin Rick Benitti James Fairbanks Lilla Marigza Jason Taylor Stephanie Carter Benjamin Joffe Jennifer Locsin, in case 11-17483. [7974006] (MT)
November 21, 2011 16 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mary Ann Giorno for Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin. Date of service: 11/21/2011. [7973980] (MAG)
November 21, 2011 15 Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): On November 18, 2011, a telephone conference was held with Circuit Mediator Margaret A. Corrigan. Michael H. Rubin, Esq. participated on behalf of appellant; Jeffrey L. Kodroff, Esq. and Daniel A. Small, Esq. participated on behalf of appellees. By December 2, 2011, counsel for appellees shall provide to appellant’s counsel and the Circuit Mediator the information discussed during the November 18, 2011 conference call. The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on December 12, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time (2:00 p.m. Eastern Time). Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [7973902] (WL)
November 18, 2011 14 Added attorney Brian M. Willen for Google Inc., in case 11-17483. [7971108] (MT)
November 17, 2011 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian M. Willen for Appellant Google Inc.. Date of service: 11/17/2011. [7970883] (BMW)
November 17, 2011 12 Added attorney John A. Macoretta for Karl H. Schulz John E. Redstone Matthew Berlage Bertha Davis Jeffrey Colman Eric Myhre Patrick Keyes Dean M. Bastilla Russell Carter Aaron Linsky Vicki Van Valin Rick Benitti James Fairbanks Lilla Marigza Jason Taylor Stephanie Carter Benjamin Joffe Jennifer Locsin, in case 11-17483. [7970204] (MT)
November 17, 2011 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John A. Macoretta for Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin. Date of service: 11/17/2011. [7970106] (JAM)
November 14, 2011 10 Terminated Bart E. Volkmer for Google Inc. in 11-17483 [7964660] (KKW)
November 14, 2011 9 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT):Appellant Google Inc.’s motion to withdraw attorney Bart E. Volkmer is granted. Bart E. Volkmer, Esq. shall be removed from the court’s service list. Attorneys David H. Kramer, Michael H. Rubin, and Caroline E. Wilson continue to represent appellant Google, Inc. The briefing schedule established on October 17, 2011 shall remain in effect. [7964652] (KKW)
November 10, 2011 8 Filed (ECF) Appellant Google Inc. Motion for miscellaneous relief [Appellant Google Inc.'s Motion to Withdrawal Attorney Bart E. Volkmer ]. Date of service: 11/10/2011. [7962911] (MHR)
November 10, 2011 7 Filed order MEDIATION (BS): Case referred to Mediation for assessment conference only. Telephone conference to be on 11/18/2011 at 10:30 am. (Pacific Standard Time) [7961312] (KKW)
November 1, 2011 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant Google Inc. Correspondence: Letter re Representation Statement. Date of service: 11/01/2011 [7950556] (MHR)
October 25, 2011 5 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 455.00. Date paid: 10/24/2011. [7941260] (RT)
October 24, 2011 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Google Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/24/2011. [7940360] (MHR)
October 24, 2011 3 Terminated Michael Rubin for Google Inc. in 11-17483 [7939426] (HH)
October 24, 2011 2 Added attorney Michael H. Rubin for Google Inc., in case 11-17483. [7939424] (HH)
October 17, 2011 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Google Inc. on 10/17/2011. Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/24/2011. Transcript ordered by 11/16/2011. Transcript due 12/16/2011. Appellant Google Inc. opening brief due 01/25/2012. Appellees Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor, Vicki Van Valin answering brief due 02/24/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7930801] (RT)
Search for this case: Benjamin Joffe, et al v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: BENJAMIN JOFFE
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: LILLA MARIGZA
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: RICK BENITTI
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: BERTHA DAVIS
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JASON TAYLOR
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: ERIC MYHRE
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JOHN E. REDSTONE
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: MATTHEW BERLAGE
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: PATRICK KEYES
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: KARL H. SCHULZ
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JAMES FAIRBANKS
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: AARON LINSKY
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: DEAN M. BASTILLA
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: VICKI VAN VALIN
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JEFFREY COLMAN
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: RUSSELL CARTER
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: STEPHANIE CARTER
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JENNIFER LOCSIN
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]