Paul Holman, et al v. Apple, Inc., et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Petitioner,: PAUL HOLMAN, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated, LUCY RIVELLO, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated, SCOTT SESSO, DENNIS V. MACASADDU, MARK G. MORIKAWA, TIMOTHY P. SMITH, MICHAEL G. LEE and HERBERT H. KLIEGERMAN
Defendant - Respondent,: APPLE, INC. and AT&T MOBILITY, LLC
 
Case Number: 12-80012
Filed: February 9, 2012
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2012 7 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY and RICHARD C. TALLMAN): Petitioners’ request to file a reply brief in support of the petition for permission to appeal is granted. The reply has been filed. The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is denied. [8155974] (AF)
March 2, 2012 6 Filed (ECF) Respondent AT&T Mobility, LLC response opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 03/02/2012. [8089206] (EMT)
March 2, 2012 5 Filed (ECF) Respondent Apple, Inc. response opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 03/02/2012. [8088772] (DMW)
February 29, 2012 4 Filed (ECF) Petitioners Paul Holman, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Michael G. Lee, Dennis V. Macasaddu, Mark G. Morikawa, Lucy Rivello, Scott Sesso and Timothy P. Smith Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief and [Proposed] Reply Brief In Support of Petition for Permission to Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) the District Court's Order Compelling Arbitration]. Date of service: 02/29/2012. [8085042] (RRR)
February 24, 2012 3 Filed (ECF) Respondent AT&T Mobility, LLC answer to 1292b petition. Date of service: 02/24/2012. [8081292] (EMT)
February 24, 2012 2 Filed (ECF) Respondent Apple, Inc. answer to 1292b petition. Date of service: 02/24/2012. [8081243] (DMW)
February 9, 2012 1 FILED ON 02/09/2012 PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 1292(b). SERVED ON 02/09/2012. [8063765] (HC)
Search for this case: Paul Holman, et al v. Apple, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - petitioner,: PAUL HOLMAN, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - petitioner,: LUCY RIVELLO, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - petitioner,: SCOTT SESSO
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - petitioner,: DENNIS V. MACASADDU
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - petitioner,: MARK G. MORIKAWA
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - petitioner,: TIMOTHY P. SMITH
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - petitioner,: MICHAEL G. LEE
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - petitioner,: HERBERT H. KLIEGERMAN
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - respondent,: APPLE, INC.
Represented By: James Scott Ballenger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - respondent,: AT&T MOBILITY, LLC
Represented By: Donald Manwell Falk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]