Bennett Marine, Inc. v. Lenco Marine, Inc.

 
Case Number: 12-1336
Filed: April 18, 2012
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Question)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
May 24, 2012 BENNETT MARINE, INC. V. LENCO MARINE, INC.
June 14, 2012 BENNETT MARINE, INC. V. LENCO MARINE, INC.
December 27, 2012 BENNETT MARINE, INC. V. LENCO MARINE, INC.
September 19, 2013 BENNETT MARINE, INC. v. LENCO MARINE, INC.
Search for this case: Bennett Marine, Inc. v. Lenco Marine, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]