Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Featured Case

 
Case Number: 12-1507
Filed: July 6, 2012
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Question)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
July 6, 2012 APPLE INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
July 13, 2012 APPLE, INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
July 20, 2012 APPLE INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
July 30, 2012 APPLE INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
October 11, 2012 Summary Apple Inc. v. Samsung Elec. Co., Ltd.

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 99 Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by John Quinn for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Mr. Mark Andrew Perry for Apple Inc.. Panel: Prost, Moore and Reyna. [21975]
August 20, 2012 98 Letter from Appellee Apple Inc. Letter re confidential material and oral argument. Service: 08/20/2012 by email. [21909]
August 13, 2012 97 Entry of appearance for John B. Quinn as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 08/08/2012 by email. [20931]
August 13, 2012 96 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to file Entry of Appearance of new counsel [91] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Attorney(s) John Quinn for party(s) Appellant Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Appellant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Appellant Samsung Electronics America, Inc., in case 12-1507 added to the case. Service: 08/13/2012 by clerk. [20911]
August 13, 2012 95 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: response Docket No. [94], ERROR: The document was not filed under the correct event. CORRECTION: No further action required. In the future, please file this document under the Response to Oral Argument Order event. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY.
August 10, 2012 94 RESPONSE of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to the court order [54] ,court order to expedite hearing [54]. Service: 08/10/2012 by email. [20814]
August 10, 2012 93 Response to oral argument order from the Appellee Apple Inc. stating that Perry, Mark Andrew added to arguing will argue. Service: 08/10/2012 by email. [20810]
August 9, 2012 92 6 paper copies of the amicus Brief [88] received from Amicus Curiae Business Software Alliance. [20511]
August 8, 2012 91 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to file Entry of Appearance of John B. Quinn. Response/Opposition due 08/23/2012. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 08/08/2012 by email, US mail. [20384]
August 8, 2012 90 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:3rd brief Brief Docket No. [77], ERROR: The paper copies of brief submitted have a yellow cover.. CORRECTION: The cover in future reply briefs should be Grey per FCR 28. The paper brief is accepted for distribution.. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY.
August 8, 2012 89 6 paper copies of the 3rd brief Brief [77] received from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [20363]
August 8, 2012 88 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Business Software Alliance [87]. Title: BRIEF OF BUSINESS SOFTWARE ALLIANCE AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF-APPELLEE IN FAVOR OF AFFIRMANCE, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 31. Service: 08/06/2012 by clerk, email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/13/2012. [20340]
August 8, 2012 87 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Business Software Alliance. Title: BRIEF OF BUSINESS SOFTWARE ALLIANCE AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF-APPELLEE IN FAVOR OF AFFIRMANCE. [20339]
August 8, 2012 86 6 paper copies of the amicus Brief [80] received from Amicus Curiae Sprint Spectrum, L.P.. [20338]
August 8, 2012 85 6 paper copies of the Confidential Joint Appendix [78] received from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [20335]
August 8, 2012 84 This entry was made in error and has been removed from the docket. (BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Sprint Spectrum, L.P. [80]. Title: Sprint Spectrum, L.P.'s Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Reversal of Preliminary Injunction, [Non-Confidential versions]. Number of Pages: 6. Service: 07/23/2012 by clerk, email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/13/2012. [20334])
August 8, 2012 83 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [72] Amicus Curiae Business Software Alliance added to the case. Service: 08/08/2012 by clerk. [20275]
August 8, 2012 82 Notice of Rejection to Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, the following document(s) cannot be filed: [81] attorney entry of appearance. Reason(s) Entry of Appearance was filed within 30 days of scheduled argument. Service: 08/08/2012 by clerk.
August 7, 2012 81 Entry of appearance for John B. Quinn as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 08/06/2012 by email. [20257] This document has been rejected. See Doc No.[82]
August 6, 2012 78 APPENDIX FILED for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [76], [75]. Title: Joint Appendix, [Confidential and Non-Confidential versions]. Number of Pages: 576. Service: 08/06/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format.. [20160]
August 6, 2012 77 BRIEF FILED for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [74], [73]. Title: Reply Brief of Defendants-Appellants, [Confidential and Non-Confidential versions]. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 08/06/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format.. [20155]
August 6, 2012 76 CONFIDENTIAL APPENDIX TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Joint Appendix - Confidential. Service: 08/06/2012 by email. [20152]
August 6, 2012 75 APPENDIX TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Joint Appendix - Public. Service: 08/06/2012 by email. [20151]
August 6, 2012 74 CONFIDENTIAL BRIEF TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Reply Brief of Defendants-Appellants - Confidential Version. Service: 08/06/2012 by email. [20150]
August 6, 2012 73 BRIEF TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Reply Brief of Defendants-Appellants - Public Version. Service: 08/06/2012 by email. [20149]
August 6, 2012 72 MOTION of Business Software Alliance for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Response/Opposition due 08/20/2012. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 08/06/2012 by email. [20137]
August 6, 2012 71 Entry of appearance for Michael G. Pattillo, Jr. as of counsel for Business Software Alliance. Service: 08/06/2012 by email. [20136]
August 6, 2012 70 Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken as principal counsel for Business Software Alliance. Service: 08/06/2012 by email. [20135]
August 3, 2012 80 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Sprint Spectrum, L.P. [79]. Title: SPRINT SPECTRUM, L.P.S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REVERSAL OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 24. Service: 08/03/2012 by email, clerk.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/13/2012. [20246]
August 3, 2012 79 TENDERED from Amicus Curiae Sprint Spectrum, L.P.. Title: SPRINT SPECTRUM, L.P.S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REVERSAL OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. [20245]
August 3, 2012 69 7 paper copies of the amicus Brief [68] received from Amicus Curiae Google Inc.. [20027]
August 3, 2012 68 BRIEF FILED (AMICUS) for Google Inc. [67]. Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Google Inc. in Support of Defendants-Appellants, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 13. Service: 08/02/2012 by US mail.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/13/2012. [20020]
August 3, 2012 67 TENDERED Title: Brief of Amicus Curiae Google Inc In support of Defendants-Appellants. [19979]
August 3, 2012 66 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [58] Amicus Curiae Sprint Spectrum, L.P. added to the case. Service: 08/03/2012 by clerk. [19883]
August 2, 2012 65 Entry of appearance for Kevin X. McGann as principal counsel for Amicus Curiae Google Inc.. Service: 08/02/2012 by email. [19812]
August 2, 2012 64 6 paper copies of the Confidential 2nd brief Brief [62] received from Appellee Apple Inc.. [19741]
August 2, 2012 63 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [56] Amicus Curiae Google Inc. added to the case. Google shall file six paper copies of the brief in accordance with the May 17, 2012, Administrative Order Regarding Electronic Case Filing, ECF-10. Service: 08/02/2012 by clerk. [19721]
July 30, 2012 62 BRIEF FILED for Appellee Apple Inc. [61], [60]. Title: PRINCIPAL BRIEF FOR APPLE INC., [Confidential and Non-Confidential versions]. Number of Pages: 66. Service: 07/30/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/06/2012. Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC reply brief due 08/6/2012. [19452]--[Edited 08/01/2012 by CC]
July 30, 2012 61 BRIEF TENDERED from Appellee Apple Inc.. Title: Principal Brief for Apple Inc. - Nonconfidential Version. Service: 07/30/2012 by email. [19312]
July 30, 2012 60 CONFIDENTIAL BRIEF TENDERED from Appellee Apple Inc.. Title: Principal Brief for Apple Inc. - Confidential Version. Service: 07/30/2012 by email. [19311]
July 30, 2012 59 Ordered: The motion for a stay pending appeal is held in abeyance. The temporary stay remains in effect. By: Motions Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 07/30/2012 by clerk. [19241]
July 23, 2012 58 MOTION of Sprint Spectrum, L.P. for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Response/Opposition due 08/06/2012, In Support of Reversal of Preliminary Injunction. Response/Opposition due 08/06/2012. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 07/23/2012 by email. [18515]
July 23, 2012 57 NOTICE OF CALENDARING issued. Panel: 1208I. Calendar date/location: Monday, 08/20/2012 Washington, D.C. Courtroom 201. Response to oral argument order due: 08/10/2012 [See entry # 54 for Oral Argument Order][18416]
July 20, 2012 56 MOTION of Google Inc. for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Response/Opposition due 08/02/2012. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 07/20/2012 by email. [18310]
July 20, 2012 55 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 07/20/2012 by email. [18261]
July 20, 2012 54 Featured Case ORDER filed granting the motion to expedite oral argument [4] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Oral argument will be held at 2 p.m. on August 20, 2012 in Courtroom 201. By: Motions Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 07/20/2012 by clerk. [18252]
July 18, 2012 53 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/18/2012 by email. [18062]
July 18, 2012 52 Notice of Rejection to Appellant Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., the following document(s) cannot be filed: [48] docketing statement. Reason(s) Not all parties are listed on the form. Docketing Statement due 07/30/2012. Service: 07/18/2012 by clerk.
July 18, 2012 51 6 paper copies of the 1st brief Brief [47] received from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. [18024] (Briefs distributed. CC 7/19/12)--[Edited 07/19/2012 by CC]
July 17, 2012 49 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 07/17/2012 by email. [17923]
July 17, 2012 48 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/17/2012 by email. [17921] This document has been rejected. See Doc No.[17979-1]
July 16, 2012 47 BRIEF FILED for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [46], [45]. Title: OPENING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS-APPELLANTS , [Confidential and Non-Confidential versions]. Number of Pages: 68. Service: 07/16/2012 by email.. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/23/2012. Appellee Apple Inc. brief due 07/30/2012. [17826]--[Edited 07/17/2012 by CC]
July 16, 2012 46 CONFIDENTIAL BRIEF TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Opening Brief of Defendants-Appellants - Confidential Version. Service: 07/16/2012 by email. [17803]
July 16, 2012 45 BRIEF TENDERED from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Title: Opening Brief of Defendants-Appellants - Public Version. Service: 07/16/2012 by email. [17802]
July 13, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER filed granting motion to expedite appeal [4] filed by Samsung; granting motions to file amicus response to motion [17], [26]; granting motion to file a surreply [43] filed by Appellee Apple Inc. Samsung's opening brief is due 7/16/12, Apple's brief is due 7/30/12, Samsung's reply brief and the joint appendix are due 8/6/12. Oral argument will be scheduled by subsequent order of the court. By: Motions Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 07/13/2012 by clerk. [17607]
July 13, 2012 43 MOTION of Appellee Apple Inc. for leave to file a response/reply to [39] reply. Response/Opposition due 07/26/2012. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17564]
July 13, 2012 42 Sealed or confidential document received [[Confidential Version] Reply Declaration of Derek L. Shaffer in Support of Motion for a Stay and Exhibit] (corresponding to Doc No. [41]) for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, placed in vault. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17489]
July 13, 2012 41 [Public Version] Reply Declaration of Derek L. Shaffer in Support of Motion for a Stay and Exhibit for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17488]
July 13, 2012 40 REPLY of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to response filed by Appellee in 12-1507 , Doc. No [33]. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17487]
July 13, 2012 39 REPLY of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to response filed by Appellee in 12-1507 , Doc. No [32]. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17486]
July 12, 2012 38 Letter from Appellee Apple Inc. Letter from Appellee Apple Inc. Regarding Letter from Samsung. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17479]
July 12, 2012 37 Sealed or confidential document received [Confidential Declaration of H. Mark Lyon and Confidential Exhibits] (corresponding to Doc No. [36]) for Appellee Apple Inc., placed in vault. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17478]
July 12, 2012 36 Non-Confidential Declaration of H. Mark Lyon and Non-Confidential Exhibits for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17475]
July 12, 2012 35 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion to file amicus response to motion [26]. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17471]
July 12, 2012 34 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion to file amicus response to motion [17]. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17468]
July 12, 2012 33 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion to expedite appeal [4] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 12-1507. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17466]
July 12, 2012 32 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [2] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 12-1507 , motion for other relief [2] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 12-1507. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17462]
July 12, 2012 31 Entry of appearance for Richard S.J. Hung as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17405]
July 12, 2012 30 Entry of appearance for Brian R. Matsui as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17397]
July 12, 2012 29 Entry of appearance for Michael A. Jacobs as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17395]
July 12, 2012 28 Entry of appearance for Harold J. McElhinny as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17394]
July 12, 2012 27 Notice of Appeal and Certified list received from the United States District Court for the Northern District of California (San Jose). Service: 07/06/2012 by US mail. Appellant/Petitioner's brief due 09/07/2012. [17390]
July 10, 2012 26 MOTION of Sprint Spectrum, L.P. for leave to file an amicus response in support of stay of --[Edited 07/11/2012 by SJ]preliminary injunction. Response/Opposition due 07/23/2012. [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 07/10/2012 by email. [17133]
July 10, 2012 25 Entry of appearance for Angel D. Mitchell as of counsel for Sprint Spectrum, L.P.. Service: 07/10/2012 by email. [17129]
July 10, 2012 24 Entry of appearance for Jonathan N. Zerger as principal counsel for Sprint Spectrum, L.P.. Service: 07/10/2012 by email. [17128]
July 9, 2012 23 CORRECTED certificate of service for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for confidential document , Doc No. [5], motion to expedite appeal, Doc No. [4]. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16951]
July 9, 2012 22 CORRECTED certificate of service for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for confidential document , Doc No. [3], motion for emergency stay pending appeal, Doc No. [2], motion for other relief, Doc No. [2]. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16948]
July 9, 2012 21 Entry of appearance for Patrick M. Shields as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/09/2012 by email. [16931]
July 9, 2012 20 Entry of appearance for Derek L. Shaffer as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/09/2012 by email. [16929]
July 9, 2012 19 Amended Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/09/2012 by email. [16928]
July 9, 2012 18 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to file amicus response to motion Docket No. [17], ERROR: Incorrect relief originally selected. Correct relief is 'amicus response to motion', not leave to file amicus brief. CORRECTION: No further action needed. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY.
July 6, 2012 17 MOTION of Google, Inc. for leave to file an amicus curiae response in support of appellants' motion to stay injunction--[Edited 07/09/2012 by SJ]. Response/Opposition due 07/19/2012. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 07/06/2012 by fax, email. [16819]
July 6, 2012 16 Entry of appearance for Christopher J. Glancy as principal counsel for Google, Inc.. Service: 07/06/2012 by fax, email. [16818]
July 6, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER filed granting motion [2] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to the extent that the preliminary injunction is temporarily stayed, pending this court's receipt of Apple Inc.'s response to the motion for a stay pending appeal and the court's consideration of the papers submitted. By: Motions Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 07/06/2012 by clerk. [16806]
July 6, 2012 14 Notice from Appellee Apple Inc. - Statement of Related Cases. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16804]
July 6, 2012 13 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Apple Inc. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16801]
July 6, 2012 12 Entry of appearance for Josh A. Krevitt as principal counsel for Appellee Apple Inc. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16798]
July 6, 2012 11 Entry of appearance for Mark A. Perry as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16795]
July 6, 2012 10 Entry of appearance for H. Mark Lyon as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16794]
July 6, 2012 9 Entry of appearance for William C. Price as principal counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16793]
July 6, 2012 8 Letter from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC regarding letter from counsel for Apple. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16791]
July 6, 2012 7 Letter from Appellee Apple Inc. regarding Rule 8 motion filed by Samsung parties. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16790]
July 6, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER filed requesting a response to [2] motion for emergency stay pending appeal. Apple's response is due no later than 5 p.m. on July 12, 2012. By: Motions Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 07/06/2012 by clerk. [16772]
July 6, 2012 5 Confidential document received [Confidential motion to expedite appeal] (corresponding to Doc No. [4]) for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, placed in vault. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16769]
July 6, 2012 4 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to expedite case. Response/Opposition due 07/19/2012. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16768]
July 6, 2012 3 Confidential document received [Confidential motion for an interim stay and stay pending appeal] (corresponding to Doc No. [2]), (corresponding to Doc No. [2]) for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, placed in vault. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16760]
July 6, 2012 2 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for an interim stay and an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16756]
July 6, 2012 1 Appeal docketed. [16752] Entry of Appearance due 07/20/2012. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/20/2012. Docketing Statement due 07/20/2012. Certified List due on 08/15/2012.
Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]