Raymond Stauffer v. Brooks Brothers, Inc.

Case Number: 13-1180
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Question)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
April 9, 2013 STAUFFER V. BROOKS BROTHERS, INC.
December 17, 2013 STAUFFER v. BROOKS BROTHERS, INC.
January 9, 2014 STAUFFER v. BROOKS BROTHERS, INC.
January 15, 2014 STAUFFER v. BROOKS BROTHERS, INC.
July 10, 2014 Summary Stauffer v. Brooks Brothers, Inc.
August 27, 2014 STAUFFER v. BROOKS BROTHERS
June 27, 2013 RAYMOND STAUFFER v. BROOKS BROTHERS, INC.
September 5, 2013 STAUFFER v. BROOKS BROTHERS, INC.
September 11, 2013 STAUFFER v. BROOKS BROTHERS, INC.
October 17, 2013 STAUFFER v. BROOKS BROTHERS, INC.
Search for this case: Raymond Stauffer v. Brooks Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.